Joyce McKiver v. Murphy-Brown, LLC
Plaintiff: TERESA LLOYD, EDWARD OWENS, LAJUNE JESSUP, DENNIS MCKIVER, JR., TANECHIA LLOYD, DON LLOYD, Administrator of the Estate of Fred Lloyd, CARL LEWIS, ANNETTE MCKIVER, A. SON, KAREN MCKIVER, DAISY LLOYD, BRIONNA MCKIVER and A. DAUGHTER
Plaintiff / Appellee: JOYCE MCKIVER, ANTONIO KEVIN MCKOY, ALEXANDRIA MCKOY, TAMMY LLOYD, ARCHIE WRIGHT, JR., DELOIS LEWIS, PRISCILLA DUNHAM, DEBORAH JOHNSON, ETHEL DAVIS and DAPHNE MCKOY
Defendant / Appellant: MURPHY-BROWN, LLC, d/b/a Smithfield Hog Production Division
Case Number: 19-1019
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 31 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amici Curiae Joey D. Carter, Joey Carter Farms, William R. Kinlaw, Kinlaw Farms, LLC, Paul Stanley, Pagle Corp., and Greenwood Livestock, LLC in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/07/2019. [1000471417] [19-1019] Matthew Leerberg [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:38 PM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 30 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amici Curiae: North American Meat Institute, National Association of Manufacturers, Grocery Manufacturers Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Turkey Federation, and National Chicken Council in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/06/2019. [1000471373] [19-1019] Sean Marotta [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:11 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 28 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amici Curiae: American Farm Bureau Federation, National Pork Producers Council, North Carolina Farm Bureau Federation and North Carolina Council in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/05/2019. [1000470332] [19-1019] Timothy Bishop [Entered: 03/05/2019 05:26 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 29 Receipt of paper copy of CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 27 ] by Murphy-Brown, LLC. Number of pages [75]. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/28/2019. [1000471222] [19-1019] KH [Entered: 03/06/2019 02:20 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 27 Corrected BRIEF by Murphy-Brown, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/28/2019. [1000466591] [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:22 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 26 BRIEF by Murphy-Brown, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/28/2019. [1000466525] [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:29 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 25 Joint SEALED APPENDIX VOLUME(S) (court access only) by Ethel Davis, Priscilla Dunham, Deborah Johnson, Delois Lewis, Tammy Lloyd, Joyce McKiver, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Daphne McKoy, Archie Wright, Jr. and Murphy-Brown, LLC in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to court: 02/27/2019.. Filed Ex parte: N. [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:44 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Ethel Davis, Priscilla Dunham, Deborah Johnson, Delois Lewis, Tammy Lloyd, Joyce McKiver, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Daphne McKoy, Archie Wright, Jr. and Murphy-Brown, LLC. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Joint Appendix Volume 22 of 22. [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:42 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 23 Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Ethel Davis, Priscilla Dunham, Deborah Johnson, Delois Lewis, Tammy Lloyd, Joyce McKiver, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Daphne McKoy, Archie Wright, Jr. and Murphy-Brown, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/27/2019. [1000466360] [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:41 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 22 Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Ethel Davis, Priscilla Dunham, Deborah Johnson, Delois Lewis, Tammy Lloyd, Joyce McKiver, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Daphne McKoy, Archie Wright, Jr. and Murphy-Brown, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/27/2019. [1000466349] [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:33 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Ethel Davis, Priscilla Dunham, Deborah Johnson, Delois Lewis, Tammy Lloyd, Joyce McKiver, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Daphne McKoy, Archie Wright, Jr. and Murphy-Brown, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/27/2019. [1000466344] [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:28 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 COURT ORDER filed [1000462430] denying Motion to schedule oral argument [ # 13 ] Copies to all parties. [19-1019] KH [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:08 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY by Murphy-Brown, LLC to Motion [ # 13 ].. [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:47 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Murphy-Brown, LLC that a reply will be filed. [1000458820].. [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/15/2019 10:47 AM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Ethel Davis, Priscilla Dunham, Deborah Johnson, Delois Lewis, Tammy Lloyd, Joyce McKiver, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Daphne McKoy and Archie Wright, Jr. to Motion to schedule oral argument [ # 13 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-1019] Tillman Breckenridge [Entered: 02/15/2019 08:40 AM]
February 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption modified. [19-1019] KH [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:38 PM]
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE ISSUED to Ethel Davis, Priscilla Dunham, LaJune Jessup, Deborah Johnson, Delois Lewis, Daisy Lloyd, Don Lloyd, Tammy Lloyd, Tanechia Lloyd, Teresa Lloyd, Annette McKiver, Brionna McKiver, Dennis McKiver, Jr., Joyce McKiver, Karen McKiver, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Daphne McKoy, Edward Owens and Archie Wright, Jr. requesting response to Motion to schedule oral argument [ # 13 ] Response due: 02/15/2019.[1000456210]. [19-1019] KH [Entered: 02/12/2019 11:57 AM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Murphy-Brown, LLC to schedule oral argument. Argument Date or Session:.. Date and method of service: 02/11/2019 ecf. [1000455663] [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:41 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1019] LP [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:02 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Returned mail received from Murphy-Brown, LLC re [ # 2 ] docketing Notice. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? Confirmed with Mr. Waylett he is still with McGuireWoods-resent to address. [1000449118] [19-1019] KH [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:31 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Returned mail received from Murphy-Brown, LLC re [ # 2 ] docketing Notice. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? Jakarra Jones is no longer with McGuireWoods. Unable to re-serve. [1000444961] [19-1019] KH [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:37 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Lisa Baron, Lynn Bradsahaw, Valyce Davis, Christian Henneke, Jakarra Jones, Michael Kaeske, Jr., Eric Manchin, Eugene Mathews, III, Christopher Trible, Darin Waylett. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/27/2019. Response Brief due 03/29/2019 [19-1019] DL [Entered: 01/18/2019 12:41 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Murphy-Brown, LLC. [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 01/18/2019 12:14 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Murphy-Brown, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000441596] [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 01/18/2019 12:13 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ethel Davis, Priscilla Dunham, LaJune Jessup, Deborah Johnson, Delois Lewis, Daisy Lloyd, Don Lloyd, Tammy Lloyd, Tanechia Lloyd, Teresa Lloyd, Annette McKiver, Brionna McKiver, Dennis McKiver, Jr., Joyce McKiver, Karen McKiver, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Daphne McKoy, Edward Owens and Archie Wright, Jr.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000439644] [19-1019] Tillman Breckenridge [Entered: 01/15/2019 06:12 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Trevor S. Cox for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000434317] [19-1019] Trevor Cox [Entered: 01/07/2019 02:28 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stuart A. Raphael for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000434089] [19-1019] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 01/07/2019 12:07 PM]
January 5, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tillman J. Breckenridge for Ethel Davis, Priscilla Dunham, LaJune Jessup, Deborah Johnson, Delois Lewis, Daisy Lloyd, Don Lloyd, Tammy Lloyd, Tanechia Lloyd, Teresa Lloyd, Annette McKiver, Brionna McKiver, Dennis McKiver, Jr., Joyce McKiver, Karen McKiver, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Daphne McKoy, Edward Owens and Archie Wright, Jr.. [1000433604] [19-1019] Tillman Breckenridge [Entered: 01/05/2019 05:15 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 7:14-cv-00180-BR. Mailed to: Darin K. Waylett, Christopher Edward Trible, Eugene Edward Mathews III, Eric Manchin, Michael Kaeske Jr., Jakarra Jenise Jones, Christian E. Henneke, Valyce M. Davis, Lynn Bradshaw, Lisa Blue Baron. [19-1019] KH [Entered: 01/04/2019 03:00 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:14-cv-00180-BR. Case manager: KHancock. [19-1019] KH [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joyce McKiver v. Murphy-Brown, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA LLOYD
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD OWENS
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAJUNE JESSUP
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS MCKIVER, JR.
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANECHIA LLOYD
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DON LLOYD, Administrator of the Estate of Fred Lloyd
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNETTE MCKIVER
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. SON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN MCKIVER
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAISY LLOYD
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIONNA MCKIVER
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. DAUGHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOYCE MCKIVER
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANTONIO KEVIN MCKOY
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALEXANDRIA MCKOY
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TAMMY LLOYD
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARCHIE WRIGHT, JR.
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DELOIS LEWIS
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PRISCILLA DUNHAM
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEBORAH JOHNSON
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ETHEL DAVIS
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAPHNE MCKOY
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MURPHY-BROWN, LLC, d/b/a Smithfield Hog Production Division
Represented By: Richard Charles Beaulieu
Represented By: Trevor Stephen Cox
Represented By: Mark E. Anderson Esq.
Represented By: Stuart Alan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?