Mars, Incorporated v. J.M. Smucker Company

Plaintiff / Appellee: MARS, INCORPORATED and MARS PETCARE US, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: BIG HEART PET, INC and J.M. SMUCKER COMPANY
Case Number: 19-1026
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed [1000458943] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 04/19/2019. Number of days granted: 31. Opening brief and appendix due 04/19/2019. . Response brief due 05/16/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1026] MR [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:01 PM]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed [1000452803] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 03/19/2019. Number of days granted: 28. Opening brief and appendix due 03/19/2019. Response brief due 04/15/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1026] MR [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:11 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1026] LP [Entered: 01/24/2019 02:51 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKETING STATEMENT by J.M. Smucker Company and Big Heart Pet, Inc. [19-1026] Angela Gott [Entered: 01/17/2019 05:11 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Big Heart Pet, Inc. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000441264] [19-1026] Angela Gott [Entered: 01/17/2019 05:07 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by J.M. Smucker Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000441263] [19-1026] Angela Gott [Entered: 01/17/2019 05:06 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Timothy P. Fraelich for J.M. Smucker Company and Big Heart Pet, Inc. [1000441262] [19-1026] Timothy Fraelich [Entered: 01/17/2019 05:03 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Mars Petcare US, Inc. and Mars, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000441257] [19-1026] David Barger [Entered: 01/17/2019 05:00 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David G. Barger for Mars Petcare US, Inc. and Mars, Incorporated. [1000441253] [19-1026] David Barger [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:58 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Angela R. Gott for J.M. Smucker Company and Big Heart Pet, Inc. [1000441195] [19-1026] Angela Gott [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:23 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 PARTIAL ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed pleadings 221-242 only). Originating case number: 1:16-cv-01451-CMH-MSN. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1026] MR [Entered: 01/07/2019 10:11 AM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/19/2019. Response Brief due 03/18/2019 [19-1026] MR [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:59 AM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:16-cv-01451-CMH-MSN.. [19-1026] MR [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:57 AM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-01451-CMH-MSN. Case manager: MRadday. [19-1026] MR [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:48 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mars, Incorporated v. J.M. Smucker Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: David G. Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARS PETCARE US, INC.
Represented By: David G. Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BIG HEART PET, INC
Represented By: Timothy P. Fraelich
Represented By: Angela R. Gott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: J.M. SMUCKER COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy P. Fraelich
Represented By: Angela R. Gott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?