Jerry Lamb v. Richard Spencer

Defendant: RICHARD PAQUETTE, TERRENCE O'CONNELL, DONNA BIBEE, KATHERINE MATTSON, STEVEN A. NICKELS, Department Head AIR 2.3, Director of Air ASW, Assault and Special Programs, Naval Air Systems Command, PAUL GROSKLAGS, Commander, Naval Airs Systems Command, KELLEY GRACE BEAN and MICHELLE WEBB
Plaintiff / Appellant: JERRY GORALSKI LAMB
Defendant / Appellee: RICHARD V. SPENCER, Secretary of the Navy
Case Number: 19-1049
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed [1000462890] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 8 ] Number of days granted: 30.,extending informal briefing order deadlines. Any Informal Response Brief due 03/21/2019. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jerry Lamb. [19-1049] JH [Entered: 02/22/2019 09:21 AM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kelly M. Marzullo for Richard V. Spencer. [1000462584] [19-1049] Kelly Marzullo [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:29 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Richard V. Spencer re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 02/25/2019 from Kelly Marie Marzullo. Mailed to: Jerry Lamb. [19-1049] TW [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:32 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Richard V. Spencer to extend filing time for response brief until March 21, 2019.. Date and method of service: 02/21/2019 US mail. [1000462387] [19-1049] Kelly Marzullo [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:25 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jerry Goralski Lamb. [19-1049] RHS [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:25 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:16-cv-02705-PX. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1049] RHS [Entered: 02/07/2019 03:52 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jerry Goralski Lamb. [19-1049] RHS [Entered: 02/07/2019 03:50 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jerry Goralski Lamb. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000449213] [19-1049] RHS [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:40 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/25/2019. [19-1049] RHS [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:51 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jerry Lamb. Informal Opening Brief due 02/04/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1049] RHS [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:49 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:16-cv-02705-PX. Case manager: RSewell. [19-1049] RHS [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerry Lamb v. Richard Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JERRY GORALSKI LAMB
Represented By: Jerry Goralski Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD PAQUETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRENCE O'CONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA BIBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE MATTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN A. NICKELS, Department Head AIR 2.3, Director of Air ASW, Assault and Special Programs, Naval Air Systems Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL GROSKLAGS, Commander, Naval Airs Systems Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLEY GRACE BEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE WEBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD V. SPENCER, Secretary of the Navy
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?