Wendy Carroll v. Oakley Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellee: WENDY G. CARROLL, Administrator of the Estate of Thomas Anthony Carroll, deceased
Defendant / Appellant: OAKLEY TRUCKING, INC. and THAD AUSTIN PITTMAN
Case Number: 19-1054
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/08/2019. Response Brief due 05/08/2019. [19-1054] EB [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:06 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 Mediation conference data modified. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1054] LP [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:32 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1054] LP [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:57 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jonathan W. Massell for Oakley Trucking, Inc. and Thad Austin Pittman. [1000444857] [19-1054] Jonathan Massell [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:08 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Oakley Trucking, Inc. and Thad Austin Pittman. [19-1054] James Bryan [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:45 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Thad Austin Pittman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000442671] [19-1054] James Bryan [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:13 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Wendy G. Carroll. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000442445] [19-1054] Guy Crabtree [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:14 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Guy W. Crabtree for Wendy G. Carroll. [1000442300] [19-1054] Guy Crabtree [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:49 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kristina B. Thompson for Wendy G. Carroll. [1000442001] [19-1054] Kristina Thompson [Entered: 01/22/2019 08:21 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Oakley Trucking, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000441791] [19-1054] James Bryan [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:54 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Michelle A. McGirr. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Opening Statement (Plaintiff)- 11/26/2018; Opening Statement (Defendant)- 11/26/2018; Closing Argument (Plaintiff)- 11/28/2018; Closing Argument (Defendant)- 11/28/2018; Opinion of the Court- 11/26/2018, 11/27/2018, 11/28/2018; Testimony- 11/26/2018, 11/27/2018, 11/28/2018- See Attachment A; Complete transcript of all other statements in open session. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Oakley Trucking, Inc. and Thad Austin Pittman. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00357-BR. Transcript due from Michelle A. McGirr, Official Court Reporter on 03/26/2019. [19-1054] EB [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:11 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Oakley Trucking, Inc. and Thad Austin Pittman for Michelle McGirr. [19-1054] James Bryan [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:28 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Leonard T. Jernigan, Jr. for Wendy G. Carroll. [1000441558] [19-1054] Leonard Jernigan [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:39 AM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James W. Bryan for Oakley Trucking, Inc. and Thad Austin Pittman. [1000439484] [19-1054] James Bryan [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:23 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00357-BR. Mailed to: Jonathan W. Massell; Kristina B. Thompson. [19-1054] EB [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:50 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00357-BR. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-1054] EB [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wendy Carroll v. Oakley Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WENDY G. CARROLL, Administrator of the Estate of Thomas Anthony Carroll, deceased
Represented By: Leonard T. Jernigan Jr.
Represented By: Guy W. Crabtree
Represented By: Kristina Brown Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OAKLEY TRUCKING, INC.
Represented By: James W. Bryan
Represented By: Jonathan William Massell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: THAD AUSTIN PITTMAN
Represented By: James W. Bryan
Represented By: Jonathan William Massell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?