Passport Health, LLC v. Avance Health System, Inc.

Defendant / Appellee: AVANCE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: PASSPORT HEALTH, LLC
Case Number: 19-1061
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Michelle A. McGirr. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Other: motion hearing: Cross motions for summary judgment 10/18/2018. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Passport Health, LLC.Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00187-BO. Transcript due from Michelle A. McGirr, Official Court Reporter on 04/15/2019. [19-1061] KH [Entered: 02/07/2019 03:57 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 15 OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Avance Health System, Inc.. [19-1061] Anthony Biller [Entered: 02/07/2019 03:16 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 Corrected TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Passport Health, LLC for Michelle McGirr. [19-1061] Charles Burke [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:37 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1061] LP [Entered: 02/05/2019 02:54 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James R. Lawrence, III for Avance Health System, Inc.. [1000448904] [19-1061] James Lawrence [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:50 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Docket correction requested from Passport Health, LLC. [19-1061] KH [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:14 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Passport Health, LLC. [19-1061]--[Edited 02/07/2019 by KH- See ECF 14 for corrected transcript order form.] Charles Burke [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:11 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Passport Health, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446834] [19-1061] Charles Burke [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:05 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Charles A. Burke for Passport Health, LLC. [1000446832] [19-1061] Charles Burke [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:03 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen F. Shaw for Passport Health, LLC. [1000446828] [19-1061] Stephen Shaw [Entered: 01/28/2019 04:55 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Emily M. Haas for Avance Health System, Inc.. [1000446411] [19-1061] Emily Haas [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:12 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Avance Health System, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000446409] [19-1061] Anthony Biller [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:10 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Anthony J. Biller for Avance Health System, Inc.. [1000446402] [19-1061] Anthony Biller [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:08 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Anthony J. Biller, Ms. Emily Michele Haas, James R Lawrence, III re: change of address. Mailed to: John D. Wooten. [19-1061] KH [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:22 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00187-BO. Mailed to: John D. Wooten. [19-1061]--[Edited 01/14/2019 by KH- Docket text modified] KH [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:17 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00187-BO. Case manager: KHancock. [19-1061] KH [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Passport Health, LLC v. Avance Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AVANCE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: James R. Lawrence III
Represented By: Anthony J. Biller
Represented By: Emily Michele Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PASSPORT HEALTH, LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Burke
Represented By: Stephen Forest Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?