Common Cause v. David Lewis
Plaintiff: MARY ANN PEDEN-COVIELLO
Defendant: JOHN LEWIS, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement, JOSHUA MALCOLM, Vice-Chair of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement, KEN RAYMOND, Secretary of the North Carolina Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement, DAMON CIRCOSTA, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement, ROBERT CORDLE, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement, ANDY PENRY, Chairman of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement, STELLA ANDERSON, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement, VALERIE JOHNSON, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement, STACY "FOUR" EGGERS, IV, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement, JAY HEMPHILL, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement and THE NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND ETHICS ENFORCEMENT
Defendant / Appellee: PRESIDENT PRO TEMPORE OF THE NORTH CAROLINA SENATE PHILIP E. BERGER, SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE TIMOTHY K. MOORE, THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, SENATOR RALPH E, HISE, JR., in his official capacity as Chairman of the Senate Committee on Redistricting and REPRESENTATIVE DAVID R. LEWIS, in his official capacity as Senior Chairman of the House Select Committee on Redistricting
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEPHEN DOUGLAS MCGRIGOR, JACKSON THOMAS DUNN, JR., REBECCA JOHNSON, ANN MCCRACKEN, KAREN SUE HOLBROOK, DERRICK MILLER, JOHN MARK TURNER, PAULA ANN CHAPMAN, DAVID DWIGHT BROWN, COMMON CAUSE, WILLIAM SERVICE, KATHLEEN BARNES, LEON CHARLES SCHALLER, ELECTA E. PERSON, KRISTIN PARKER JACKSON, PAMELA MORTON, GEORGE DAVID GAUCK, DEBORAH ANDERSON SMITH, MARK S. PETERS, JOSHUA BROWN, CARLTON E. CAMPBELL, SR., VINOD THOMAS, DWIGHT JORDAN, JULIE ANN FREY, ROSALYN SLOAN, VIRGINIA WALTERS BRIEN, JOHN BALLA, LILY NICOLE QUICK, JAMES MACKIN NESBIT, HOWARD DUBOSE, REBECCA HARPER, DONALD RUMPH, JOSEPH THOMAS GATES, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY, NANCY BRADLEY, AARON WOLFF, AMY CLARE OSEROFF, ALYCE MACHAK and LESLEY BROOK WISCHMANN
Amicus Curiae: REGINALD REID
Case Number: 19-1094
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 90 Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 89 ] Judgment Order , [ # 88 ] published authored Opinion. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00589-FL.. [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 05/08/2020 07:11 AM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 89 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00589-FL. Entered on Docket Date: 04/16/2020. [1000722230] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 04/16/2020 08:32 AM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 88 PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion administratively terminating motion to dismiss appeal [ # 1000628300-2 ] in 19-1091. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00589-FL. [1000722219]. [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 04/16/2020 08:28 AM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 87 ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable Roger L. Gregory, Diana Gribbon Motz and Julius N. Richardson. Attorneys arguing case: Paul Mason Cox for Appellant The State of North Carolina, Richard Bryan Raile for Appellants The State of North Carolina, Philip E. Berger, David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and Ralph E, Hise, Jr. and Elisabeth S. Theodore for Appellees Derrick Miller, Rebecca Johnson, Common Cause, Paula Ann Chapman, Howard Dubose, George David Gauck, James Mackin Nesbit, Dwight Jordan, Joseph Thomas Gates, Mark S. Peters, Pamela Morton, Virginia Walters Brien, John Mark Turner, Leon Charles Schaller, Rebecca Harper, Lesley Brook Wischmann, David Dwight Brown, Amy Clare Oseroff, Kristin Parker Jackson, John Balla, Aaron Wolff, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kathleen Barnes, Ann McCracken, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Alyce Machak, William Service, Donald Rumph, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Nancy Bradley, Vinod Thomas, Electa E. Person, Deborah Anderson Smith, Rosalyn Sloan, Julie Ann Frey, Lily Nicole Quick, Joshua Brown and Carlton E. Campbell, Sr. in 19-1091, Elisabeth S. Theodore for - Mary Ann Peden-Coviello and Appellants Derrick Miller, Rebecca Johnson, Common Cause, North Carolina Democratic Party, Paula Ann Chapman, Howard Dubose, George David Gauck, James Mackin Nesbit, Dwight Jordan, Joseph Thomas Gates, Mark S. Peters, Pamela Morton, Virginia Walters Brien, John Mark Turner, Leon Charles Schaller, Rebecca Harper, Lesley Brook Wischmann, David Dwight Brown, Amy Clare Oseroff, Kristin Parker Jackson, John Balla, Aaron Wolff, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kathleen Barnes, Ann McCracken, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Alyce Machak, William Service, Donald Rumph, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Nancy Bradley, Vinod Thomas, Electa E. Person, Deborah Anderson Smith, Rosalyn Sloan, Julie Ann Frey, Lily Nicole Quick, Joshua Brown and Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Elisabeth S. Theodore for Appellants Derrick Miller, Rebecca Johnson, Common Cause, North Carolina Democratic Party, Paula Ann Chapman, Howard Dubose, George David Gauck, James Mackin Nesbit, Dwight Jordan, Joseph Thomas Gates, Mark S. Peters, Pamela Morton, Virginia Walters Brien, John Mark Turner, Leon Charles Schaller, Rebecca Harper, Lesley Brook Wischmann, David Dwight Brown, Amy Clare Oseroff, Kristin Parker Jackson, John Balla, Aaron Wolff, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kathleen Barnes, Ann McCracken, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Alyce Machak, William Service, Donald Rumph, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Nancy Bradley, Vinod Thomas, Electa E. Person, Deborah Anderson Smith, Rosalyn Sloan, Julie Ann Frey, Lily Nicole Quick, Joshua Brown and Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paul Mason Cox for Appellee The State of North Carolina and Richard Bryan Raile for Appellees The State of North Carolina, Philip E. Berger, David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and Ralph E, Hise, Jr. in 19-1094. Courtroom Deputy: Joy Moore. [1000673908] [19-1091, 19-1094] JHM [Entered: 01/31/2020 11:34 AM]
January 28, 2020 Filing 86 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000671697]. [19-1091, 19-1094] Richard Raile [Entered: 01/28/2020 03:51 PM]
January 27, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE re: erroneous citation in Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion to dismiss the appeal in 19-1091 by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [19-1091, 19-1094] Elisabeth Theodore [Entered: 01/27/2020 04:36 PM]
January 24, 2020 Filing 84 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000669751]. [19-1091, 19-1094] Elisabeth Theodore [Entered: 01/24/2020 07:04 PM]
December 24, 2019 Filing 83 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000651205]. [19-1091, 19-1094] Richard Raile [Entered: 12/24/2019 04:34 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 82 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000650063]. [19-1091, 19-1094] Elisabeth Theodore [Entered: 12/20/2019 04:53 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 81 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000650061]. [19-1091, 19-1094] Elisabeth Theodore [Entered: 12/20/2019 04:51 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 80 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000650057]. [19-1091, 19-1094] Elisabeth Theodore [Entered: 12/20/2019 04:50 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 79 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. Counsel arguing: Elisabeth Theodore Answering argument time: 14 Rebuttal argument time: 2 . [1000645732] [19-1091, 19-1094] Elisabeth Theodore [Entered: 12/16/2019 09:15 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 78 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. Counsel arguing: Paul M. Cox Opening argument time: 4 . [1000645623] [19-1091, 19-1094] Paul Cox [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:08 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 77 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. Counsel arguing: Mr. Richard B. Raile Opening argument time: 16 minutes. Rebuttal argument time: 4 minutes. Counsel present but not arguing in criminal case: (or civil case): Mr. Phillip J. Strach. [1000645345] [19-1091, 19-1094] Richard Raile [Entered: 12/16/2019 01:02 PM]
December 9, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094 to response [ # 71 ].. [19-1091, 19-1094] Elisabeth Theodore [Entered: 12/09/2019 06:44 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 75 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 01/31/2020. Registration Time: 7:45 - 8:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 8:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 10 days. [19-1091, 19-1094] JLC [Entered: 12/06/2019 05:38 PM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 74 Three additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Reginald Reid in 19-1091. [19-1091, 19-1094] AWW [Entered: 12/05/2019 08:41 AM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 73 COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to Reginald Reid in 19-1091 requesting three additional copies of Amicus Brief. Additional copies due no later then: 12/06/2019. [19-1091, 19-1094] AD [Entered: 12/03/2019 01:20 PM]
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER filed deferring action on Motion to dismiss appeal filed by Appellees Derrick Miller, Rebecca Johnson, Common Cause, North Carolina Democratic Party, Paula Ann Chapman, Howard Dubose, George David Gauck, James Mackin Nesbit, Dwight Jordan, Joseph Thomas Gates, Mark S. Peters, Pamela Morton, Virginia Walters Brien, John Mark Turner, Leon Charles Schaller, Rebecca Harper, Lesley Brook Wischmann, David Dwight Brown, Amy Clare Oseroff, Kristin Parker Jackson, John Balla, Aaron Wolff, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kathleen Barnes, Ann McCracken, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Alyce Machak, William Service, Donald Rumph, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Nancy Bradley, Vinod Thomas, Electa E. Person, Deborah Anderson Smith, Rosalyn Sloan, Julie Ann Frey, Lily Nicole Quick, Joshua Brown and Carlton E. Campbell, Sr. [ # 1000628300-2 ] in 19-1091 Copies to all parties.. [1000636486] [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 12/03/2019 08:23 AM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 71 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094 to Motion [ # 1000628300-2 ], notice requesting response [ # 70 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-1091, 19-1094] Efrem Braden [Entered: 12/02/2019 07:02 PM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE ISSUED to Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094 requesting response to motion to dismiss appeal [ # 1000628300-2 ]12/02/2019.[1000628698]. [19-1091, 19-1094] TW [Entered: 11/19/2019 10:08 AM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 69 Three additional copies of the OPENING BRIEF, RESPONSE/REPLY BRIEF, and JOINT APPENDIX received from Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. [19-1091, 19-1094] TB [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:06 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 68 Three additional copies of the RESPONSE BRIEF and REPLY BRIEF received from John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [19-1091, 19-1094] TB [Entered: 11/13/2019 10:49 AM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 67 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 1/28/20 - 1/31/20 argument session. Additional copies due: 11/13/2019. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 11/18/2019. [19-1091, 19-1094] JLC [Entered: 11/07/2019 11:19 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 65 Receipt of paper copy of REPLY BRIEF filed at [ # 64 ] by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. Number of pages: [39]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of Copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 04/12/2019. [1000495294] [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 04/17/2019 09:35 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 64 BRIEF by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1094 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/09/2019. [1000489714] [19-1091, 19-1094] R. Jones [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:33 PM]
March 25, 2019 Filing 63 Receipt of paper copy of RESPONSE/REPLY BRIEF filed at [ # 62 ] by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. Number of pages: [70]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of Copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/27/2019. [1000483787] [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:18 AM]
March 25, 2019 Filing 62 BRIEF by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., Timothy K. Moore, The State of North Carolina and David R. Lewis in 19-1091, 19-1094 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE/REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/26/2019. [1000481560] [19-1091, 19-1094] Efrem Braden [Entered: 03/25/2019 08:32 PM]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER filed [1000478238] granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 42 ]. Amicus brief due 04/03/2019 (paper copies). Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [19-1091, 19-1094] TW [Entered: 03/19/2019 01:34 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094 to Motion [ # 42 ]. [19-1091, 19-1094] Efrem Braden [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:57 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE/ANSWER by The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094 to Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 42 ]. [19-1091, 19-1094] Paul Cox [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:10 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 42 ], notice requesting response [ # 48 ]. Response due on 03/28/2019. .. [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:12 AM]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER filed [1000477094] granting Motion to dismiss party [ # 53 ]. Copies to all parties.. [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:03 AM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094 to dismiss party. Date and method of service: 03/13/2019 ecf. [1000475214] [19-1091, 19-1094] Sara D'Amico [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:26 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 54 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING/RESPONSE BRIEF filed at [ # 51 ] by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. Number of pages: [84]. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/13/2019. [1000475531] [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:38 AM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 52 DOCUMENT referencing [ # 51 ] brief by The State of North Carolina and The North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement, Andy Penry, Joshua Malcolm, Ken Raymond, Stella Anderson, Damon Circosta, Stacy "Four" Eggers, IV, Jay Hemphill, Valerie Johnson, John Lewis and Robert Cordle in 19-1091. [1000473775] [19-1091, 19-1094] Stephanie Brennan [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:30 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 51 BRIEF by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann, Aaron Wolff, Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore, The State of North Carolina and Reginald Reid in 19-1091, 19-1094 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING/RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/12/2019. [1000473774] [19-1091, 19-1094] R. Jones [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:40 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE/ANSWER by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann, Aaron Wolff and North Carolina Democratic Party in 19-1091, 19-1094 to notice requesting response [ # 48 ]. [19-1091, 19-1094] Sara D'Amico [Entered: 03/11/2019 01:08 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 49 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for The State of North Carolina in 19-1094, 19-1091. [1000470179] [19-1094, 19-1091] Paul Cox [Entered: 03/05/2019 03:36 PM]
February 28, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE ISSUED to Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore, The State of North Carolina and John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann, Aaron Wolff and Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1094 requesting response to Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 42 ]Response due: 03/11/2019.[1000466659].. [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 02/28/2019 07:08 AM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 47 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jason Torchinsky for Reginald Reid in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000466180] [19-1091, 19-1094] Jason Torchinsky [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:43 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 46 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) - AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Reginald Reid in 19-1094 in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/27/2019. [1000466024] [19-1091, 19-1094] --[Edited 02/27/2019 by MR] Jason Torchinsky [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:35 AM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 45 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) - MOTION by Jason Torchinsky, counsel to Amicus Curiae Reginald Reid for leave to file Brief of Amicus Curiae. Date and method of service: 02/27/2019 ecf. [1000466014] [19-1091, 19-1094] --[Edited 02/27/2019 by MR] Jason Torchinsky [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:32 AM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 61 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 43 ] by Reginald Reid in 19-1091, 19-1094. . Number of pages: [31]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/27/2019. [1000478718] [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 03/20/2019 09:32 AM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 44 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Reginald Reid in 19-1091, 19-1094. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000465970] [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:14 AM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 43 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Reginald Reid in 19-1091, 19-1094 in electronic format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: n/a [1000465964] [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:11 AM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION by Reginald Reid in 19-1091, 19-1094 to file amicus curiae brief without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 02/27/2019 ecf. [1000465961] [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:07 AM]
February 20, 2019 Filing 39 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sara Murphy D'Amico for John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000460900] [19-1091, 19-1094] Sara D'Amico [Entered: 02/20/2019 08:14 AM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 41 Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 37 ] by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [711]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 12/21/2019. [1000462375] [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:04 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 40 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 38 ] by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. Number of pages: [99]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/21/2019. [1000462374] [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:01 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 38 BRIEF by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/20/2019. [1000460841] [19-1091, 19-1094] Efrem Braden [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:57 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 37 Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/20/2019. [1000460840] [19-1091, 19-1094] Efrem Braden [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:38 PM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 36 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Trevor M. Stanley for Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000457556] [19-1091, 19-1094] Trevor Stanley [Entered: 02/13/2019 07:10 PM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 35 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by E. Mark Braden for Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000457554] [19-1091, 19-1094] Efrem Braden [Entered: 02/13/2019 07:00 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 34 Amended APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William Perdue for John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000455203] [19-1091, 19-1094] William Perdue [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:36 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 33 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Aria C. Branch for John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Lily Nicole Quick, Mark S. Peters, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091. [1000454920] [19-1091, 19-1094] Aria Branch [Entered: 02/08/2019 06:56 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 32 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marc E. Elias for John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091. [1000454100] [19-1091, 19-1094] Marc Elias [Entered: 02/07/2019 06:05 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 31 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000454094] [19-1091, 19-1094] Stephanie Brennan [Entered: 02/07/2019 05:26 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 30 OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. [19-1091, 19-1094] Amar Majmundar [Entered: 02/07/2019 05:23 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000454092] [19-1091, 19-1094] Amar Majmundar [Entered: 02/07/2019 05:18 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 28 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000454088] [19-1091, 19-1094] Amar Majmundar [Entered: 02/07/2019 05:06 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 27 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Abha Khanna for John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000454021] [19-1091, 19-1094] Abha Khanna [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:13 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by North Carolina Democratic Party in 19-1091, 19-1094. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000453599] [19-1091, 19-1094] Caroline Mackie [Entered: 02/07/2019 12:28 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 25 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Caroline P. Mackie for John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000453592] [19-1091, 19-1094] Caroline Mackie [Entered: 02/07/2019 12:24 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 24 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Edwin M. Speas, Jr. for John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000453586] [19-1091, 19-1094] Edwin Speas [Entered: 02/07/2019 12:19 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 23 DOCKETING STATEMENT by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff. [19-1094] R. Jones [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:45 AM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann, Aaron Wolff, Rebecca Johnson, Ann McCracken and Mary Ann Peden-Coviello in 19-1091, John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1094. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000453326] [19-1091, 19-1094] R. Jones [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:36 AM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Common Cause in 19-1091, 19-1094. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000453320] [19-1091, 19-1094] R. Jones [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:30 AM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by R. Stanton Jones for John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000453092] [19-1091, 19-1094] R. Jones [Entered: 02/06/2019 06:20 PM]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER filed [1000450545] granting Motion for other relief [ # 14 ]. SEE ORDER ENTERED AT ECF #18. Description of relief sought: expedited briefing schedule. Copies to all parties.. [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 02/04/2019 11:01 AM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 (EXPEDITED CROSS-APPEAL) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: David R. Lewis, et al.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/19/2019. Opening/Response Brief Due: 03/11/2019. Response/Reply Brief Due 03/25/2019. Any final reply brief due 04/08/2019. [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 02/04/2019 10:58 AM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William Perdue for John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, North Carolina Democratic Party, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000449896] [19-1091, 19-1094] William Perdue [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:19 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Elisabeth S. Theodore for John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Jackson Thomas Dunn, Jr., Julie Ann Frey, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000448997] [19-1091, 19-1094] Elisabeth Theodore [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:50 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel F. Jacobson for Julie Ann Frey in 19-1091, John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Nancy Bradley, Virginia Walters Brien, David Dwight Brown, Joshua Brown, Carlton E. Campbell, Sr., Paula Ann Chapman, Common Cause, Howard Dubose, Joseph Thomas Gates, George David Gauck, Rebecca Harper, Karen Sue Holbrook, Kristin Parker Jackson, Rebecca Johnson, Dwight Jordan, Alyce Machak, Ann McCracken, Stephen Douglas McGrigor, Derrick Miller, Pamela Morton, James Mackin Nesbit, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mary Ann Peden-Coviello, Electa E. Person, Mark S. Peters, Lily Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Leon Charles Schaller, William Service, Rosalyn Sloan, Deborah Anderson Smith, Vinod Thomas, John Mark Turner, Lesley Brook Wischmann and Aaron Wolff in 19-1094. [1000447173] [19-1091, 19-1094] Daniel Jacobson [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:20 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, The State of North Carolina and Timothy K. Moore in 19-1091, 19-1094 to To Expedite... Date and method of service: 01/28/2019 ecf. [1000446840] [19-1091, 19-1094] Richard Raile [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:27 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Phillip J. Strach for Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091. [1000446618] [19-1091, 19-1094] Phillip Strach [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:51 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael D. McKnight for Philip E. Berger, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., David R. Lewis, Timothy K. Moore and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091. [1000446613] [19-1091, 19-1094] Michael McKnight [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:45 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alyssa M. Riggins for Timothy K. Moore, David R. Lewis, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., Philip E. Berger and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091. [1000446609] [19-1091, 19-1094] Alyssa Riggins [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:41 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446213] [19-1091, 19-1094] Richard Raile [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:08 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Timothy K. Moore in 19-1091, 19-1094. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446212] [19-1091, 19-1094] Richard Raile [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:07 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by David R. Lewis in 19-1091, 19-1094. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446209] [19-1091, 19-1094] Richard Raile [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:06 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ralph E, Hise, Jr. in 19-1091, 19-1094. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446204] [19-1091, 19-1094] Richard Raile [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:04 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Philip E. Berger in 19-1091, 19-1094. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446202] [19-1091, 19-1094] Richard Raile [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:03 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard B. Raile for David R. Lewis, Ralph E, Hise, Jr., Timothy K. Moore, Philip E. Berger and The State of North Carolina in 19-1091, 19-1094. [1000445538] [19-1091, 19-1094] Richard Raile [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:56 AM]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER filed [1000444581] consolidating case 19-1094 with 19-1091(L). Cross-appeal appellant: David R. Lewis, Ralph E. Hise, Jr., Timothy K. Moore, Philip E. Berger, and the State of North Carolina (appellants in lead case 19-1091).. Copies to all parties.. [19-1091, 19-1094] MR [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:07 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 2 ] case Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00589-FL.. [19-1094] MR [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:53 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00589-FL. Case manager: MRadday. [19-1094] MR [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Common Cause v. David Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN LEWIS, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA MALCOLM, Vice-Chair of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN RAYMOND, Secretary of the North Carolina Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMON CIRCOSTA, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CORDLE, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDY PENRY, Chairman of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STELLA ANDERSON, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALERIE JOHNSON, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACY "FOUR" EGGERS, IV, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY HEMPHILL, Member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and Ethics Enforcement
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND ETHICS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRESIDENT PRO TEMPORE OF THE NORTH CAROLINA SENATE PHILIP E. BERGER
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Richard Bryan Raile
Represented By: Phillip John Strach
Represented By: Alyssa Riggins
Represented By: Efrem Mark Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE TIMOTHY K. MOORE
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Richard Bryan Raile
Represented By: Phillip John Strach
Represented By: Trevor M. Stanley
Represented By: Alyssa Riggins
Represented By: Efrem Mark Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Richard Bryan Raile
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Phillip John Strach
Represented By: Trevor M. Stanley
Represented By: Alyssa Riggins
Represented By: Efrem Mark Braden
Represented By: Paul Mason Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SENATOR RALPH E, HISE, JR., in his official capacity as Chairman of the Senate Committee on Redistricting
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Richard Bryan Raile
Represented By: Phillip John Strach
Represented By: Trevor M. Stanley
Represented By: Alyssa Riggins
Represented By: Efrem Mark Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REPRESENTATIVE DAVID R. LEWIS, in his official capacity as Senior Chairman of the House Select Committee on Redistricting
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Richard Bryan Raile
Represented By: Phillip John Strach
Represented By: Trevor M. Stanley
Represented By: Alyssa Riggins
Represented By: Efrem Mark Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN DOUGLAS MCGRIGOR
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACKSON THOMAS DUNN, JR.
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REBECCA JOHNSON
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANN MCCRACKEN
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAREN SUE HOLBROOK
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DERRICK MILLER
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN MARK TURNER
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAULA ANN CHAPMAN
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID DWIGHT BROWN
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: COMMON CAUSE
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM SERVICE
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHLEEN BARNES
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEON CHARLES SCHALLER
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELECTA E. PERSON
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KRISTIN PARKER JACKSON
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAMELA MORTON
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE DAVID GAUCK
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBORAH ANDERSON SMITH
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK S. PETERS
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSHUA BROWN
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLTON E. CAMPBELL, SR.
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VINOD THOMAS
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DWIGHT JORDAN
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIE ANN FREY
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSALYN SLOAN
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VIRGINIA WALTERS BRIEN
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN BALLA
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LILY NICOLE QUICK
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES MACKIN NESBIT
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HOWARD DUBOSE
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REBECCA HARPER
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD RUMPH
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH THOMAS GATES
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY BRADLEY
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AARON WOLFF
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMY CLARE OSEROFF
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALYCE MACHAK
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LESLEY BROOK WISCHMANN
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY ANN PEDEN-COVIELLO
Represented By: David P. Gersch
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Sara Murphy D'Amico
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas Jr.
Represented By: William Perdue
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Aria Christine Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REGINALD REID
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?