Heather Hoffman v. P. Tanner
Defendant / Appellee: J. EDWARD ALLEN, Beaufort County Coroner, ERIC CALENDINE, P. J. TANNER, Beaufort County Sheriff, JERRI ANN ROSENEAU, Beaufort County Magistrate Court Clerk of Court, CATHERINE E. HEIGEL, Director, SC Department of Health and Environmental Control, MICHAEL HATFIELD, STEPHANIE SMART-GITTINGS, Circuit Defender, Beaufort County Public Defender's Office, AT&T, SUSAN ERIN PRESNELL, MUSC Medical Examiner, ANDREW CALORE and DUFFIE STONE, Fourteenth Circuit Court Solicitor
Plaintiff / Appellant: HEATHER C. HOFFMAN
Case Number: 19-1095
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 30, 2019 Heather Hoffman v. P. Tanner

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:40 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MEMORANDUM RESPONSE BRIEF by Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [19-1095]--[Edited 03/05/2019 by CB - See Informal Response Brief at ECF 17.] Barbara Showers [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:30 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by AT&T. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000466528] [19-1095] Andrew Hand [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:29 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew R. Hand for AT&T. [1000466522] [19-1095] Andrew Hand [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:24 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Heather C. Hoffman. [19-1095] CB [Entered: 02/21/2019 05:06 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Hervery Young for Stephanie Smart-Gittings. [1000460238] [19-1095] Hervery Young [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:23 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000454561] [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:57 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ms. Catherine E. Heigel. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000454559] [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:55 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [1000454557] [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:53 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by J. Edward Allen, Eric Calendine, Andrew Calore, Michael Hatfield, Jerri Ann Roseneau, Duffie Stone and P. J. Tanner. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000454473] [19-1095] Mary Lohr [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:34 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary Bass Lohr for J. Edward Allen, Eric Calendine, Andrew Calore, Michael Hatfield, Jerri Ann Roseneau, Duffie Stone and P. J. Tanner. [1000454471] [19-1095] Mary Lohr [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:33 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [1000454409] [19-1095] Elloree Ganes [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:50 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT - copy of Notice of Appeal by Heather C. Hoffman. [1000447083] [19-1095] CB [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:39 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Heather Hoffman, William Britt, Andrew Hand, Hervery Young. Informal Opening Brief due 02/19/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1095] CB [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:33 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 9:18-cv-01146-RMG-BM. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1095] CB [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:09 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:18-cv-01146-RMG-BM. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1095] CB [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heather Hoffman v. P. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. EDWARD ALLEN, Beaufort County Coroner
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC CALENDINE
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: P. J. TANNER, Beaufort County Sheriff
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRI ANN ROSENEAU, Beaufort County Magistrate Court Clerk of Court
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATHERINE E. HEIGEL, Director, SC Department of Health and Environmental Control
Represented By: Elloree Ann Ganes
Represented By: Barbara Wynne Showers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL HATFIELD
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHANIE SMART-GITTINGS, Circuit Defender, Beaufort County Public Defender's Office
Represented By: Hervery B. O. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AT&T
Represented By: Andrew Richard Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN ERIN PRESNELL, MUSC Medical Examiner
Represented By: Elloree Ann Ganes
Represented By: Barbara Wynne Showers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW CALORE
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DUFFIE STONE, Fourteenth Circuit Court Solicitor
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HEATHER C. HOFFMAN
Represented By: Heather C. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?