R. Acosta v. Benefits Consulting Group
Defendant: MARILYN WARD, CHIMES INTERNATIONAL, LTD., MARTIN LAMPNER, ALBERT BUSSONE, GARY BECKMAN, FCE BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, INC., THE CHIMES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, INCORPORATED, CHIMES D.C. INC. HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN and STEPHEN PORTER
Plaintiff / Appellant: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, Secretary of Labor
Defendant / Appellee: BENEFITS CONSULTING GROUP and JEFFREY RAMSEY
Case Number: 19-1122
Filed: January 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000471871] granting Motion to suspend [ # 7 ] Copies to all parties. [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:43 AM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by R. Alexander Acosta to suspend Briefing Order. Date and method of service: 03/06/2019 ecf. [1000471476] [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 03/06/2019 06:08 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by R. Alexander Acosta to place case in abeyance.. Date and method of service: 02/11/2019 ecf. [1000455681] [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 02/11/2019 05:21 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/20/2019. Response Brief due 04/19/2019 [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:32 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKETING STATEMENT by R. Alexander Acosta. [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 02/07/2019 05:35 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Isidro Mariscal for R. Alexander Acosta. [1000452617] [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:23 AM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03315-RDB.. [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:58 AM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03315-RDB. Case manager: RSewell. [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. Acosta v. Benefits Consulting Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARILYN WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIMES INTERNATIONAL, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN LAMPNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT BUSSONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY BECKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCE BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHIMES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIMES D.C. INC. HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN PORTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, Secretary of Labor
Represented By: Isidro Mariscal
Represented By: Katrina T. Liu
Represented By: Geoffrey Forney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BENEFITS CONSULTING GROUP
Represented By: Athan Theodore Tsimpedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY RAMSEY
Represented By: Athan Theodore Tsimpedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?