SC Coastal Conservation v. Andrew Wheeler
Undetermined: NATIONAL PORK PRODUCERS COUNCIL, AMERICAN ROAD AND TRANSPORTATION BUILDERS ASSOCIATION, U.S. POULTRY AND EGG ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL CATTLEMEN'S BEEF ASSOCIATION, LEADING BUILDERS OF AMERICA, SOUTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU, NATIONAL MINING ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL CORN GROWERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS, PUBLIC LANDS COUNCIL, NATIONAL STONE, SAND & GRAVEL ASSOCIATION, MATAGORDA COUNTY FARM BUREAU, AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE, NATIONAL ALLIANCE OF FOREST OWNERS, TEXAS FARM BUREAU, AMERICAN FOREST AND PAPER ASSOCIATION and AMERICAN FARM BUREAU FEDERATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: NORTH CAROLINA COASTAL FEDERATION, FRIENDS OF THE RAPPAHANNOCK, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, AMERICAN RIVERS, NORTH CAROLINA WILDLIFE FEDERATION, SOUTH CAROLINA COASTAL CONSERVATION LEAGUE, CLEAN WATER ACTION, CHARLESTON WATERKEEPER and CHATTAHOOCHEE RIVERKEEPER
Defendant / Appellant: ANDREW WHEELER, in his official capacity as Acting Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, RYAN FISHER, in his official capacity as Acting Assistant Secretary of the Army (Civil Works), UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS and E. SCOTT PRUITT, in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 19-1136
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00330-DCN. [18-1988, 19-1136] KH [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:23 PM]
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000472926] granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 7 ] Copies to all parties. [18-1988, 19-1136] KH [Entered: 03/08/2019 04:21 PM]
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by EPA, Ryan Fisher, United States Army Corps of Engineers and Andrew Wheeler in 18-1988, 19-1136 to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [7]. Date and method of service: 03/08/2019 ecf. [1000472755] [18-1988, 19-1136] Robert Lundman [Entered: 03/08/2019 02:18 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Ryan Fisher, United States Army Corps of Engineers, EPA and Andrew Wheeler re: filing of docketing statement Docketing statement due from Ryan Fisher, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler on 03/08/2019. [19-1136] KH [Entered: 03/05/2019 08:53 AM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Amended BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Joan Wash Hartley. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/19/2019. Response Brief due 04/18/2019 [18-1988, 19-1136] KH [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:59 AM]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER filed [1000453545] consolidating case 19-1136 with 18-1988(L). Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Joan Wash Hartley. [18-1988, 19-1136] KH [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:53 AM]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER filed [1000453531] substituting party Andrew Wheeler substituted for E. Scott Pruitt. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Joan Wash Hartley. [19-1136] KH [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:47 AM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00330-DCN. Mailed to: Joan Wash Hartley. [19-1136] KH [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:39 AM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00330-DCN. Case manager: KHancock. [19-1136] KH [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SC Coastal Conservation v. Andrew Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NATIONAL PORK PRODUCERS COUNCIL
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: AMERICAN ROAD AND TRANSPORTATION BUILDERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: U.S. POULTRY AND EGG ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NATIONAL CATTLEMEN'S BEEF ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LEADING BUILDERS OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SOUTH CAROLINA FARM BUREAU
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NATIONAL MINING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NATIONAL CORN GROWERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: PUBLIC LANDS COUNCIL
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NATIONAL STONE, SAND & GRAVEL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MATAGORDA COUNTY FARM BUREAU
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NATIONAL ALLIANCE OF FOREST OWNERS
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TEXAS FARM BUREAU
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: AMERICAN FOREST AND PAPER ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: AMERICAN FARM BUREAU FEDERATION
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Represented By: William Thomas Lavender Jr.
Represented By: Joan Wash Hartley
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NORTH CAROLINA COASTAL FEDERATION
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Gisler
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Represented By: Frank S. Holleman III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRIENDS OF THE RAPPAHANNOCK
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Gisler
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Represented By: Frank S. Holleman III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Gisler
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Represented By: Frank S. Holleman III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN RIVERS
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Gisler
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Represented By: Frank S. Holleman III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NORTH CAROLINA WILDLIFE FEDERATION
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Gisler
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Represented By: Frank S. Holleman III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SOUTH CAROLINA COASTAL CONSERVATION LEAGUE
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Gisler
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Represented By: Frank S. Holleman III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLEAN WATER ACTION
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Gisler
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Represented By: Frank S. Holleman III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLESTON WATERKEEPER
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Gisler
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Represented By: Frank S. Holleman III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHATTAHOOCHEE RIVERKEEPER
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Gisler
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Represented By: Frank S. Holleman III
Represented By: Kelly Frances Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANDREW WHEELER, in his official capacity as Acting Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Represented By: Robert Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RYAN FISHER, in his official capacity as Acting Assistant Secretary of the Army (Civil Works)
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Represented By: Robert Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Represented By: Robert Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Represented By: Robert Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: E. SCOTT PRUITT, in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?