Frank Heindel v. Marci Andino
Defendant / Appellee: SCOTT MOSELY, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in his official capacity, BILLY WAY, JR., Chair of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in his official capacity, MARCI ANDINO, Executive Director of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in her official capacity, MARK A. BENSON, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in his official capacity, CLIFFORD J. ELDER, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in his official capacity, JOHN WELLS, Chair of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in his official capacity, AMANDA LOVEDAY, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in her official capacity, NICOLE SPAIN WRIGHT, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in her official capacity and MARILYN BOWERS, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in her official capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRANK HEINDEL and PHIL P. LEVENTIS
Amicus Curiae: MAGGIE TOULOUSE OLIVER, Secretary of State for New Mexico, DUNCAN A. BUELL, Professor, Department of Computer Science and Engineering and NCR Chair of Computer Science and Engineering, University of South Carolina, JOSEPH R. KINIRY, Principal Scientist, Galois, and Principled CEO and Chief Scientist, Free & Fair, OONA A. HATHAWAY, Served as Special Counsel to the General Counsel for National Security Law at the Department of Defense, DAN S. WALLACH, Professor of Computer Science and Rice Scholar, Baker Institute for Public Policy, Rice University, TRACY HOWARD, General Registrar of Radford, Virginia and Former President of the Voter Registrar Association of Virginia, JOSHUA A. GELTZER, Served as Senior Director for Counterterrorism and Deputy Legal Advisor at the National Security Council and Counsel to the Assistant Attorney General for National Security, MATTHEW G. OLSEN, Served as Director of the National Counterterrorism Center at the Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Deputy Assistant Attorney General for the National Security Division at the Department of Justice, and Special Counse, JAMES C. TRAINOR, Served as Assistant Director for the Cyber Division at the Federal Bureau of Investigation, PATRICK BARRY, Served as Counselor for Counterterrorism and Intelligence in the Office of the Secretary at the Department of Homeland Security, HILLARY HALL, Former Clerk and Recorder for Boulder County, Colorado, EDGARDO CORTES, Former Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Elections and Former Chair, Vice Chair, and Secretary of the U.S. Election Assistance Commission Standards Board, LISA JEFFERS, General Registrar of Waynesboro, Virginia, DANIEL ROSENTHAL, Served as Director for Counterterrorism at the National Security Council, Senior Counsel to the Assistant Attorney General for National Security, and Senior Legal Counsel in the Office of the Director of National Intelligence, MERRITT BAER, Served as Senior Technology Advisor to the Department of Homeland Security and Lead Cyber Advisor to the Federal Communications Commission, KAMMI FOOTE, Clerk-Recorder & Registrar of Voters in Inyo County, California, DOUGLAS W. JONES, Associate Professor, Department of Computer Science, University of Iowa, MARY B. MCCORD, Served as Acting Assistant Attorney General for National Security and Principal Deputy Assistant Attorney General for National Security, RAND BEERS, Served as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security and UnderSecretary of the National Protection and Programs Directorate at the Department of Homeland Security, ROBERT KNAKE, Served as Director for Cybersecurity Policy at the National Security Council, DIPAYAN GHOSH, Served as Senior Advisor on Technology Policy at the Office of Science and Technology Policy and National Economic Council, PHIL STUPAK, Served as Elections Counsel to the House of Representatives, Staff Attorney to the New York City Board of Elections, and Senior Advisor to the Deputy Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, PHILIP B. STARK, Associate Dean, Division of Mathematical and Physical Sciences, and Professor of Statistics, University of California, TREY GRAYSON, Former Secretary of State for the Commonweath of Kentucky and President of the National Association of Secretaries of State, and the Chair of the Republican Secretaries of State Assocation, J. MICHAEL DANIEL, Served as Special Assistant to the President and Cybersecurity Coordinator at the National Security Council, MARIAN SCHNEIDER, Former Deputy Secretary for Elections and Administration in the Pennsylvania Department of State, CHRISTOPHER PAINTER, Served as Coordinator for Cyber Issues at the Department of State, POORVI L. VORA, Professor of Computer Science, The George Washington University, CHRIS SWOPE, City Clerk of Lansing, Michigan, BRUCE SCHNEIER, Adjunct Lecturer in Public Policy, Harvard Kennedy School, and Fellow at the Berkman Klein Center for Internet & Society, Harvard University, DOUGLAS A. KELLNER, Co-Chair of the New York State Board of Elections, NATIONAL ELECTION DEFENSE COALITION, RICHARD DEMILLO, Professor, Charlotte B. and Roger C. Warren Chair of Computing, and Director of the Center for 21st Century Universities, Georgia Institute of Technology, LORI EDWARDS, Supervisor of Elections for Polk County, Florida, ADRIAN FONTES, Recorder in Maricopa County, Arizona, LINDA STOVER, Bernalillo County Clerk, New Mexico, PETER G. NEUMANN, Chief Scientist, SRI International Computer Science Lab and FRANCIS TAYLOR, Served as Undersecretary of the Office of Intelligence and Analysis at the Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 19-1204
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER filed [1000495049] granting filing of amicus curiae brief. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/16/2019 03:49 PM]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER filed [1000495039] granting filing of amicus curiae brief. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/16/2019 03:44 PM]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER filed [1000495008] granting filing of amicus curiae brief. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? N/A. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/16/2019 03:31 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 32 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Philip S. May for Duncan A. Buell, Richard DeMillo, Douglas W. Jones, Joseph R. Kiniry, National Election Defense Coalition, Peter G. Neumann, Bruce Schneier, Philip B. Stark, Poorvi L. Vora and Dan S. Wallach. [1000494874] [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:21 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 31 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kwaku Akowuah for Merritt Baer, Patrick Barry, Rand Beers, J. Michael Daniel, Joshua A. Geltzer, Dipayan Ghosh, Oona A. Hathaway, Robert Knake, Mary B. McCord, Matthew G. Olsen, Christopher Painter, Daniel Rosenthal, Phil Stupak, Francis Taylor and James C. Trainor. [1000494738] [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:49 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 30 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Katherine Harihar and Gerald E. Porter for Edgardo Cortes, Lori Edwards, Adrian Fontes, Kammi Foote, Trey Grayson, Hillary Hall, Tracy Howard, Lisa Jeffers, Douglas A. Kellner, Maggie Toulouse Oliver, Marian Schneider, Linda Stover and Chris Swope. [1000494544] [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/16/2019 11:02 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 38 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 29 ] by Duncan A. Buell, Richard DeMillo, Douglas W. Jones, Joseph R. Kiniry, National Election Defense Coalition, Peter G. Neumann, Bruce Schneier, Philip B. Stark, Poorvi L. Vora and Dan S. Wallach. . Number of pages: [33]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 04/17/2019. [1000495980] [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:44 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 37 Receipt of paper copy of AMENDED AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 28 ] by Merritt Baer, Patrick Barry, Rand Beers, J. Michael Daniel, Joshua A. Geltzer, Dipayan Ghosh, Oona A. Hathaway, Robert Knake, Mary B. McCord, Matthew G. Olsen, Christopher Painter, Daniel Rosenthal, Phil Stupak, Francis Taylor and James C. Trainor. . Number of pages: [35]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 04/17/2019. [1000495972] [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:39 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 36 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 26 ] by Edgardo Cortes, Lori Edwards, Adrian Fontes, Kammi Foote, Trey Grayson, Hillary Hall, Tracy Howard, Lisa Jeffers, Douglas A. Kellner, Maggie Toulouse Oliver, Marian Schneider, Linda Stover and Chris Swope. . Number of pages: [38]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 04/17/2019. [1000495966] [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:35 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 29 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by National Election Defense Coalition; Duncan A. Buell; Richard DeMillo; Douglas W. Jones; Joseph R. Kiniry; Peter G. Neumann; Bruce Schneier; Philip B. Stark; Poorvi L. Vora; Dan S. Wallach, Amici Curiae in support of Plaintiff-Appellants in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/16/2019. [1000494157] [19-1204] Philip May [Entered: 04/15/2019 07:54 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 28 Amended AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by National Security Professionals as Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/16/2019. [1000494136] [19-1204] Kwaku Akowuah [Entered: 04/15/2019 05:25 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 27 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by National Security Professionals as Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/16/2019. [1000494123] [19-1204]--[Edited 04/16/2019 by DL - See Amended Brief at ECF 28] Kwaku Akowuah [Entered: 04/15/2019 05:06 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 26 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by 13 Election Officials in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/15/2019. [1000494106] [19-1204] Katherine Harihar [Entered: 04/15/2019 04:52 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 25 Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 23 ] by Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [752]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 04/09/2019. [1000490197] [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:55 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 22 ] by Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis. Number of pages: [59]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 04/09/2019. [1000490194] [19-1204] DL [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:52 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 23 FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/08/2019. [1000489699] [19-1204] Laurence Schwartztol [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:22 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF by Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/08/2019. [1000489697] [19-1204] Laurence Schwartztol [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:20 PM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 COURT ORDER filed [1000481924] denying Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 15 ] Copies to all parties. [19-1204] DL [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:11 AM]
March 22, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, Amanda Loveday, Scott Mosely and John Wells to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 15 ], notice requesting response [ # 16 ]. [19-1204] Wesley Vorberger [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:15 PM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 19 Returned mail received from Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis re. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? None. Counsel terminated [1000478368] [19-1204] DL [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:56 PM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jessica A. Marsden for Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis. [1000474878] [19-1204] Jessica Marsden [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:08 AM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Laurence M. Schwartztol for Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis. [1000474868] [19-1204] Laurence Schwartztol [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:05 AM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE ISSUED to Marci Andino, Clifford J. Elder, Amanda Loveday, Scott Mosely and John Wells requesting response to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 15 ]Response due: 03/25/2019.[1000474710]. Mailed to: Samantha V. Ettari, Nancy Gertner, Anne Harden Tindall, Alan Wilson, William Jeffrey Young. [19-1204] DL [Entered: 03/13/2019 08:50 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis to accelerate case processing.. Date and method of service: 03/12/2019 ecf. [1000474558] [19-1204] David Frankel [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:52 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Phil P. Leventis. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000474556] [19-1204] David Frankel [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:50 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Frank Heindel. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000474554] [19-1204] David Frankel [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:49 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis. [19-1204] David Frankel [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:48 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jamila G. Benkato for Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis. [1000474549] [19-1204] Jamila Benkato [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:45 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Harry P. Morgenthau for Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis. [1000474506] [19-1204] Harry Morgenthau [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:09 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David Stanley Frankel for Frank Heindel and Phil P. Leventis. [1000474504] [19-1204] David Frankel [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:07 PM]
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Harley Littleton Kirkland for Marci Andino, John Wells, Clifford J. Elder, Amanda Loveday and Scott Mosely. [1000472732] [19-1204] Harley Kirkland [Entered: 03/08/2019 01:45 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Marci Andino, John Wells, Clifford J. Elder, Amanda Loveday and Scott Mosely. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000466399] [19-1204] Wesley Vorberger [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:58 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Wesley Aaron Vorberger for Marci Andino, John Wells, Clifford J. Elder, Amanda Loveday and Scott Mosely. [1000466379] [19-1204] Wesley Vorberger [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:48 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jamila Goldkamp Benkato, Samantha V. Ettari, Nancy Gertner, Harley Littleton Kirkland, Jessica Ann Marsden, Harry P. Morgenthau, Laurence Michael Schwartztol, Anne Harden Tindall, Wesley Aaron Vorberger, Alan Wilson, William Jeffrey Young. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/08/2019. Response Brief due 05/08/2019 [19-1204] DL [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:27 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption modified. Mailed to: Jamila Goldkamp Benkato, Samantha V. Ettari, Nancy Gertner, Harley Littleton Kirkland, Jessica Ann Marsden, Harry P. Morgenthau, Laurence Michael Schwartztol, Anne Harden Tindall, Wesley Aaron Vorberger, Alan Wilson, William Jeffrey Young. [19-1204] DL [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:23 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:18-cv-01887-JMC. Mailed to: Jamila Goldkamp Benkato, Samantha V. Ettari, Nancy Gertner, Harley Littleton Kirkland, Jessica Ann Marsden, Harry P. Morgenthau, Laurence Michael Schwartztol, Anne Harden Tindall, Wesley Aaron Vorberger, Alan Wilson, William Jeffrey Young. [19-1204] DL [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:03 PM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas Parkin Hunter for Marci Andino, Billy Way, Jr., Marilyn Bowers, Mark A. Benson and Nicole Spain Wright. [1000466142] [19-1204] Thomas Hunter [Entered: 02/27/2019 11:57 AM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-01887-JMC. Case manager: DLett. [19-1204] DL [Entered: 02/26/2019 09:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Heindel v. Marci Andino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT MOSELY, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in his official capacity
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Wesley Aaron Vorberger
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Parkin Hunter
Represented By: William Jeffrey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILLY WAY, JR., Chair of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in his official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARCI ANDINO, Executive Director of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in her official capacity
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Wesley Aaron Vorberger
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Parkin Hunter
Represented By: William Jeffrey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK A. BENSON, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in his official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLIFFORD J. ELDER, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in his official capacity
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Wesley Aaron Vorberger
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Parkin Hunter
Represented By: William Jeffrey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN WELLS, Chair of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in his official capacity
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Wesley Aaron Vorberger
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Parkin Hunter
Represented By: William Jeffrey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMANDA LOVEDAY, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in her official capacity
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Wesley Aaron Vorberger
Represented By: Robert D. Cook
Represented By: Harley Littleton Kirkland
Represented By: Thomas Parkin Hunter
Represented By: William Jeffrey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICOLE SPAIN WRIGHT, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in her official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARILYN BOWERS, Member of the South Carolina State Election Commission, in her official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANK HEINDEL
Represented By: Nancy Gertner
Represented By: Victoria LaMonte Eslinger
Represented By: Anne Harden Tindall
Represented By: Marcus Angelo Manos
Represented By: David Stanley Frankel
Represented By: Jessica Ann Marsden
Represented By: Samantha V. Ettari
Represented By: Laurence Michael Schwartztol
Represented By: Harry P. Morgenthau
Represented By: Jamila Goldkamp Benkato
Represented By: Harry Pattridge Morgenthau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PHIL P. LEVENTIS
Represented By: Nancy Gertner
Represented By: Victoria LaMonte Eslinger
Represented By: Anne Harden Tindall
Represented By: Marcus Angelo Manos
Represented By: David Stanley Frankel
Represented By: Jessica Ann Marsden
Represented By: Samantha V. Ettari
Represented By: Laurence Michael Schwartztol
Represented By: Harry P. Morgenthau
Represented By: Jamila Goldkamp Benkato
Represented By: Harry Pattridge Morgenthau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAGGIE TOULOUSE OLIVER, Secretary of State for New Mexico
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DUNCAN A. BUELL, Professor, Department of Computer Science and Engineering and NCR Chair of Computer Science and Engineering, University of South Carolina
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Philip Scott May
Represented By: John D. Graubert
Represented By: Jessica Jensen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Adam G. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOSEPH R. KINIRY, Principal Scientist, Galois, and Principled CEO and Chief Scientist, Free & Fair
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Philip Scott May
Represented By: John D. Graubert
Represented By: Jessica Jensen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Adam G. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OONA A. HATHAWAY, Served as Special Counsel to the General Counsel for National Security Law at the Department of Defense
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAN S. WALLACH, Professor of Computer Science and Rice Scholar, Baker Institute for Public Policy, Rice University
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Philip Scott May
Represented By: John D. Graubert
Represented By: Jessica Jensen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Adam G. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TRACY HOWARD, General Registrar of Radford, Virginia and Former President of the Voter Registrar Association of Virginia
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOSHUA A. GELTZER, Served as Senior Director for Counterterrorism and Deputy Legal Advisor at the National Security Council and Counsel to the Assistant Attorney General for National Security
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MATTHEW G. OLSEN, Served as Director of the National Counterterrorism Center at the Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Deputy Assistant Attorney General for the National Security Division at the Department of Justice, and Special Counse
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES C. TRAINOR, Served as Assistant Director for the Cyber Division at the Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PATRICK BARRY, Served as Counselor for Counterterrorism and Intelligence in the Office of the Secretary at the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HILLARY HALL, Former Clerk and Recorder for Boulder County, Colorado
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EDGARDO CORTES, Former Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Elections and Former Chair, Vice Chair, and Secretary of the U.S. Election Assistance Commission Standards Board
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LISA JEFFERS, General Registrar of Waynesboro, Virginia
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DANIEL ROSENTHAL, Served as Director for Counterterrorism at the National Security Council, Senior Counsel to the Assistant Attorney General for National Security, and Senior Legal Counsel in the Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MERRITT BAER, Served as Senior Technology Advisor to the Department of Homeland Security and Lead Cyber Advisor to the Federal Communications Commission
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KAMMI FOOTE, Clerk-Recorder & Registrar of Voters in Inyo County, California
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOUGLAS W. JONES, Associate Professor, Department of Computer Science, University of Iowa
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Philip Scott May
Represented By: John D. Graubert
Represented By: Jessica Jensen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Adam G. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARY B. MCCORD, Served as Acting Assistant Attorney General for National Security and Principal Deputy Assistant Attorney General for National Security
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RAND BEERS, Served as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security and UnderSecretary of the National Protection and Programs Directorate at the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT KNAKE, Served as Director for Cybersecurity Policy at the National Security Council
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DIPAYAN GHOSH, Served as Senior Advisor on Technology Policy at the Office of Science and Technology Policy and National Economic Council
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHIL STUPAK, Served as Elections Counsel to the House of Representatives, Staff Attorney to the New York City Board of Elections, and Senior Advisor to the Deputy Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHILIP B. STARK, Associate Dean, Division of Mathematical and Physical Sciences, and Professor of Statistics, University of California
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Philip Scott May
Represented By: John D. Graubert
Represented By: Jessica Jensen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Adam G. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TREY GRAYSON, Former Secretary of State for the Commonweath of Kentucky and President of the National Association of Secretaries of State, and the Chair of the Republican Secretaries of State Assocation
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: J. MICHAEL DANIEL, Served as Special Assistant to the President and Cybersecurity Coordinator at the National Security Council
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARIAN SCHNEIDER, Former Deputy Secretary for Elections and Administration in the Pennsylvania Department of State
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRISTOPHER PAINTER, Served as Coordinator for Cyber Issues at the Department of State
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: POORVI L. VORA, Professor of Computer Science, The George Washington University
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Philip Scott May
Represented By: John D. Graubert
Represented By: Jessica Jensen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Adam G. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRIS SWOPE, City Clerk of Lansing, Michigan
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRUCE SCHNEIER, Adjunct Lecturer in Public Policy, Harvard Kennedy School, and Fellow at the Berkman Klein Center for Internet & Society, Harvard University
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Philip Scott May
Represented By: John D. Graubert
Represented By: Jessica Jensen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Adam G. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOUGLAS A. KELLNER, Co-Chair of the New York State Board of Elections
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ELECTION DEFENSE COALITION
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Philip Scott May
Represented By: John D. Graubert
Represented By: Jessica Jensen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Adam G. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RICHARD DEMILLO, Professor, Charlotte B. and Roger C. Warren Chair of Computing, and Director of the Center for 21st Century Universities, Georgia Institute of Technology
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Philip Scott May
Represented By: John D. Graubert
Represented By: Jessica Jensen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Adam G. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LORI EDWARDS, Supervisor of Elections for Polk County, Florida
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ADRIAN FONTES, Recorder in Maricopa County, Arizona
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LINDA STOVER, Bernalillo County Clerk, New Mexico
Represented By: Lawrence Norden
Represented By: Katherine Harihar
Represented By: Magnus Essunger
Represented By: Gerald Eames Porter
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard
Represented By: Maximillian L. Feldman
Represented By: Daniel A. Ladow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PETER G. NEUMANN, Chief Scientist, SRI International Computer Science Lab
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Megan O'Neill
Represented By: Philip Scott May
Represented By: John D. Graubert
Represented By: Jessica Jensen
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Adam G. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FRANCIS TAYLOR, Served as Undersecretary of the Office of Intelligence and Analysis at the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Mary B. McCord
Represented By: Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
Represented By: David William McAloon
Represented By: Gabriel Schonfeld
Represented By: Christopher C. Fonzone
Represented By: Joshua A. Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?