Roy Cockrum v. Donald J. Trump for President
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROY COCKRUM, ERIC SCHOENBERG, c/o United to Protect Democracy and SCOTT COMER
Defendant / Appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.
Case Number: 19-1398
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER filed [1000522979] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 15 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 07/15/2019. Response brief due 08/12/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1398] AB [Entered: 06/03/2019 09:18 AM]
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Roy Cockrum, Scott Comer and Eric Schoenberg to extend filing time for Plaintiffs-Appellants' Opening Brief and Joint Appendix and Defendant-Appellee's Answering Brief (with consent) until July 24, 2019 and August 23, 2019, respectively.. Date and method of service: 05/31/2019 ecf. [1000522827] [19-1398] Jessica Marsden [Entered: 05/31/2019 05:08 PM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/24/2019. Response Brief due 07/22/2019. [19-1398] AB [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:28 AM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Eric Schoenberg. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000503920] [19-1398] Cameron Kistler [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:08 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Scott Comer. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000503918] [19-1398] Cameron Kistler [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:08 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Roy Cockrum. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000503917] [19-1398] Cameron Kistler [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:07 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Roy Cockrum, Scott Comer and Eric Schoenberg. [19-1398] Cameron Kistler [Entered: 04/30/2019 03:06 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard Primus for Roy Cockrum, Scott Comer and Eric Schoenberg. [1000503836] [19-1398] Richard Primus [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:17 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Danielle Leonard for Roy Cockrum, Scott Comer and Eric Schoenberg. [1000503652] [19-1398] Danielle Leonard [Entered: 04/30/2019 12:24 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000503118] [19-1398] Michael Carvin [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:11 AM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael A. Carvin for Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.. [1000503112] [19-1398] Michael Carvin [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:10 AM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen P. Berzon for Roy Cockrum, Scott Comer and Eric Schoenberg. [1000502788] [19-1398] Stephen Berzon [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:31 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jessica Marsden for Roy Cockrum, Scott Comer and Eric Schoenberg. [1000502638] [19-1398] Jessica Marsden [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:07 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Cameron Oatman Kistler for Roy Cockrum, Scott Comer and Eric Schoenberg. [1000502525] [19-1398] Cameron Kistler [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:06 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00484-HEH. Mailed to: Jeffrey Dewan Baltruzak, Ian Bassin, Benjamin L. Berwick, Kelly J. Bundy, Elizabeth Childress Burneson, Barbara Jane Chisholm, William Dennis Coglianese, Nancy Gertner, Steven A. Hirsch, Cameron Oatman Kistler, Nikki Lynn McArthur, Richard Primus, Anne Harden Tindall. [19-1398] AB [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:35 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00484-HEH. Case manager: ABrownlee. [19-1398] AB [Entered: 04/16/2019 12:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy Cockrum v. Donald J. Trump for President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROY COCKRUM
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Danielle E. Leonard
Represented By: Jessica Ann Marsden
Represented By: Justin Florence
Represented By: Cameron O. Kistler
Represented By: Richard Abraham Primus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC SCHOENBERG, c/o United to Protect Democracy
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Danielle E. Leonard
Represented By: Jessica Ann Marsden
Represented By: Justin Florence
Represented By: Cameron O. Kistler
Represented By: Richard Abraham Primus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTT COMER
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Danielle E. Leonard
Represented By: Jessica Ann Marsden
Represented By: Justin Florence
Represented By: Cameron O. Kistler
Represented By: Richard Abraham Primus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.
Represented By: Michael Carvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?