John Dickson, Jr. v. Former FBI Director
Defendant / Appellee: NURSE DOE JOHNSON, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, ANNALISA SCHAEPERKOETTER, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, FBI AGENT MRS./MS. KATHERINE ANDREWS, Former Special Agent in Charge of the Newport News Field office, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of federal and State Law, FBI NEWPORT NEWS FIELD OFFICE, JOHN/JANE DOE(S), In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of federal and State Law, LISA TAYLOR, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, CHIEF OF POLICE MR. TERRY SULT, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, MARISSA CLAIBORNE, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE CORPORAL JANE DOE, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, TIFFANY THOMPSON, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, JOHN/JANE DOE(S), In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS VIRGINIA POLICE OFFICERS JOHN/JANE DOE(S), In their individual capacities as persons, acting under Color of State Law, NORTHAMPTON COMMUNITY CENTER, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, NAJEAH EASMELL, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, JOHN/JANE DOE(S) (EMPLOYEES) OF FARM FRESH SUPERMARKETS INCORPORATED, In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of State Law, FARM FRESH SUPERMARKETS INCORPORATED, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, EASTERN STATE HOSPITAL, DEJA VINSTON, KOREY BALLARD, In his individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, CHARLES ERDMAN, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, HOPE IN HOME CARE PERSONAL CARE DIVISION, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, HELP PROGRAM, DEREK CURRAN, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, WALMART CORPORATION, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, FORMER FBI DIRECTOR JAMES BRIEN COMEY, JR., In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of federal and State Law, SHANITA SMITH, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, MR. MRS./MS. JOHN JANE DOE, In their individual capacities as persons acting under Color of State Law, MRS. DEJA VINSTON (EMPLOYEE) OF OCTAPHARMA PLASMA, INC., In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE LIEUTENANT F. EDMONDS, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, GREGORY BRISCOE, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE OFFICER R. FOOTE, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, JOHN/JANE DOE(S) (EMPLOYEES) OF OCTAPHARMA PLASMA, INC., In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE OFFICERS JOHN/JANE DOE(S), In their individual capacities as persons acting under Color of State Law, SCOTT RUTLAND, In his individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE OFFICER JONATHAN DONKER, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, REGINA O'HALLORAN, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, DIRECTOR MATTHEW STEARN, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE DEPARTMENT, In his/her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, JANE DOE, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, HASMUKH VYAS, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, MR. JOHN E. SMITH (OWNER) JSI FOODS, INC., In his individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, MCDONALDS INC., MELANEY COX, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law, FORMER CHIEF OF POLICE OF THE CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS RICHARD W. MYERS, In his individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, DOE SQUIRE, CITY OF HAMPTON, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE DEPARTMENT, In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE DEPARTMENT, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, BARBARA ROBINSON, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, WALMART EMPLOYEE, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law, CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE OFFICER J. DYE, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law and SOCIAL WORKER, MR. MICHAEL FRAZIER, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN M. DICKSON, JR.
Case Number: 19-1430
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 18, 2019 John Dickson, Jr. v. Former FBI Director

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by John M. Dickson, Jr. [19-1430] CT [Entered: 05/16/2019 11:38 AM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: J. Dickson. Informal Opening Brief due 05/16/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1430] CT [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:12 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 4:18-cv-00002-AWA-DEM. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1430] CT [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:11 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 4:18-cv-00002-AWA-DEM. Case manager: CathyHerb. [19-1430] CT [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Dickson, Jr. v. Former FBI Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NURSE DOE JOHNSON, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANNALISA SCHAEPERKOETTER, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FBI AGENT MRS./MS. KATHERINE ANDREWS, Former Special Agent in Charge of the Newport News Field office, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of federal and State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FBI NEWPORT NEWS FIELD OFFICE, JOHN/JANE DOE(S), In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of federal and State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA TAYLOR, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIEF OF POLICE MR. TERRY SULT, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARISSA CLAIBORNE, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE CORPORAL JANE DOE, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIFFANY THOMPSON, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN/JANE DOE(S), In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS VIRGINIA POLICE OFFICERS JOHN/JANE DOE(S), In their individual capacities as persons, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTHAMPTON COMMUNITY CENTER, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NAJEAH EASMELL, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN/JANE DOE(S) (EMPLOYEES) OF FARM FRESH SUPERMARKETS INCORPORATED, In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FARM FRESH SUPERMARKETS INCORPORATED, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EASTERN STATE HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEJA VINSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KOREY BALLARD, In his individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES ERDMAN, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOPE IN HOME CARE PERSONAL CARE DIVISION, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HELP PROGRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEREK CURRAN, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALMART CORPORATION, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FORMER FBI DIRECTOR JAMES BRIEN COMEY, JR., In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of federal and State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHANITA SMITH, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. MRS./MS. JOHN JANE DOE, In their individual capacities as persons acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MRS. DEJA VINSTON (EMPLOYEE) OF OCTAPHARMA PLASMA, INC., In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE LIEUTENANT F. EDMONDS, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY BRISCOE, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE OFFICER R. FOOTE, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN/JANE DOE(S) (EMPLOYEES) OF OCTAPHARMA PLASMA, INC., In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE OFFICERS JOHN/JANE DOE(S), In their individual capacities as persons acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT RUTLAND, In his individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE OFFICER JONATHAN DONKER, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REGINA O'HALLORAN, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIRECTOR MATTHEW STEARN, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE DEPARTMENT, In his/her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOE, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HASMUKH VYAS, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. JOHN E. SMITH (OWNER) JSI FOODS, INC., In his individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCDONALDS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELANEY COX, In her individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FORMER CHIEF OF POLICE OF THE CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS RICHARD W. MYERS, In his individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOE SQUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HAMPTON, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE DEPARTMENT, In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE DEPARTMENT, In its individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARBARA ROBINSON, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALMART EMPLOYEE, In her individual capacity as a person, acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HAMPTON VIRGINIA POLICE OFFICER J. DYE, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOCIAL WORKER, MR. MICHAEL FRAZIER, In his individual capacity, as a person acting under Color of State Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN M. DICKSON, JR.
Represented By: John M. Dickson Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?