RXD Media, LLC v. IP Application Development LLC
Defendant / Appellee: APPLE, INC. and IP APPLICATION DEVELOPMENT LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: RXD MEDIA, LLC
Case Number: 19-1461
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 COURT ORDER filed [1000528566] granting Motion for abeyance [ # 14 ], requesting case status report. Status report due 07/11/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1461] RE [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:59 PM]
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by RXD Media, LLC to place case in abeyance.. Date and method of service: 05/31/2019 ecf. [1000522757] [19-1461] Cecil Key [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:12 PM]
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1461] LP [Entered: 05/31/2019 02:25 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by RXD Media, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000513420] [19-1461] Cecil Key [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:14 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Cecil E. Key for RXD Media, LLC. [1000513418] [19-1461] Cecil Key [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:12 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jayna Genti. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/24/2019. Response Brief due 07/24/2019. [19-1461] RE [Entered: 05/15/2019 07:12 AM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE ISSUED to Cecil E. Key, Jr. re: change of address. [19-1461] RE [Entered: 05/15/2019 07:02 AM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to RXD Media, LLC re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 05/20/2019 from Bernard Joseph DiMuro, Jayna Genti and Cecil E. Key Jr., filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from RXD Media, LLC on 05/20/2019, filing of docketing statement Docketing statement due from RXD Media, LLC on 05/20/2019. Mailed to: Jayna Genti. [19-1461] RE [Entered: 05/15/2019 06:54 AM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Apple, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000512663] [19-1461] Dale Cendali [Entered: 05/14/2019 05:27 PM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by IP Application Development LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000512661] [19-1461] Dale Cendali [Entered: 05/14/2019 05:26 PM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dale M. Cendali for Apple, Inc. and IP Application Development LLC. [1000512660] [19-1461] Dale Cendali [Entered: 05/14/2019 05:24 PM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKETING STATEMENT by RXD Media, LLC. [19-1461] Cecil Key [Entered: 05/14/2019 08:57 AM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 Returned mail received from RXD Media, LLC re [ # 2 ] docketing Notice. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? address updated [1000513134] [19-1461] RE [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:21 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00486-LO-TCB. Mailed to: Cecil Key and Jayna Genti. [19-1461] RE [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:50 AM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00486-LO-TCB. Case manager: REdwards. [19-1461] RE [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RXD Media, LLC v. IP Application Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLE, INC.
Represented By: Robert Emmett Scully Jr.
Represented By: Nathan S. Mammen
Represented By: Dale Margaret Cendali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IP APPLICATION DEVELOPMENT LLC
Represented By: Robert Emmett Scully Jr.
Represented By: Nathan S. Mammen
Represented By: Dale Margaret Cendali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RXD MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro Esq.
Represented By: Jayna Genti
Represented By: Cecil E. Key Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?