R. Acosta v. Benefits Consulting Group
Defendant: MARILYN WARD, STEPHEN PORTER, GARY BECKMAN, ALBERT BUSSONE, FCE BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, INC. and MARTIN LAMPNER
Plaintiff / Appellant: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, Secretary of Labor
Defendant / Appellee: BENEFITS CONSULTING GROUP, CHIMES D.C. INC. HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN, THE CHIMES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, INCORPORATED, CHIMES INTERNATIONAL, LTD. and JEFFREY RAMSEY
Case Number: 19-1468
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER filed [1000534729] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 17 ] Number of days granted: 30., updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 08/15/2019. Response brief due 09/16/2019 Copies to all parties.. [19-1122, 19-1468] RHS [Entered: 06/21/2019 11:43 AM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by R. Alexander Acosta in 19-1122 to extend filing time for opening brief until August 15, 2019.. Date and method of service: 06/21/2019 ecf. [1000534684] [19-1122, 19-1468] Katrina Liu [Entered: 06/21/2019 11:08 AM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chimes D.C. Inc. Health & Welfare Plan in 19-1468. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000529109] [19-1468, 19-1122] Mark Meredith [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:17 PM]
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Benefits Consulting Group and Jeffrey Ramsey in 19-1122, 19-1468. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000528668] [19-1122, 19-1468] Athan Tsimpedes [Entered: 06/11/2019 08:40 PM]
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Athan Tsimpedes for Jeffrey Ramsey in 19-1122, Benefits Consulting Group in 19-1468. [1000528667] [19-1122, 19-1468] Athan Tsimpedes [Entered: 06/11/2019 08:37 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Benefits Consulting Group in 19-1122, Jeffrey Ramsey in 19-1468 re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 06/10/2019 from Athan Theodore Tsimpedes. [19-1122, 19-1468] RHS [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:46 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 07/16/2019. Response Brief due 08/15/2019 [19-1122, 19-1468] RHS [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:31 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 CORRECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by R. Alexander Acosta. [19-1468] Katrina Liu [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:10 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by R. Alexander Acosta. [19-1468] Katrina Liu [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:03 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chimes D.C. Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Chimes International, Ltd. and The Chimes District of Columbia, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000517606] [19-1468] Brian Cousin [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:29 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by The Chimes District of Columbia, Incorporated, Chimes D.C. Inc. Health & Welfare Plan and Chimes International, Ltd.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000517605] [19-1468] Brian Cousin [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:27 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christina Dumitrescu for The Chimes District of Columbia, Incorporated, Chimes International, Ltd. and Chimes D.C. Inc. Health & Welfare Plan. [1000517604] [19-1468] Christina Dumitrescu [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:23 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark Meredith for Chimes D.C. Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Chimes International, Ltd. and The Chimes District of Columbia, Incorporated. [1000517603] [19-1468] Mark Meredith [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:21 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard Scharlat for Chimes International, Ltd., The Chimes District of Columbia, Incorporated and Chimes D.C. Inc. Health & Welfare Plan. [1000517602] [19-1468] Richard Scharlat [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:18 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian Cousin for The Chimes District of Columbia, Incorporated, Chimes International, Ltd. and Chimes D.C. Inc. Health & Welfare Plan. [1000517601] [19-1468] Brian Cousin [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:14 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03315-RDB.. [19-1468] RHS [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:39 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Katrina Liu for R. Alexander Acosta. [1000509794] [19-1468] Katrina Liu [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:08 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03315-RDB. Case manager: RSewell. [19-1468] RHS [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. Acosta v. Benefits Consulting Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, Secretary of Labor
Represented By: Isidro Mariscal
Represented By: Geoffrey Forney
Represented By: Katrina T. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARILYN WARD
Represented By: Joseph Steven Ferretti
Represented By: Bryan Gales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN PORTER
Represented By: Joseph Steven Ferretti
Represented By: Bryan Gales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY BECKMAN
Represented By: Joseph Steven Ferretti
Represented By: Bryan Gales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT BUSSONE
Represented By: Harold Mark Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCE BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, INC.
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: Joseph Steven Ferretti
Represented By: Bryan Gales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN LAMPNER
Represented By: Joseph Steven Ferretti
Represented By: Bryan Gales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BENEFITS CONSULTING GROUP
Represented By: Athan Theodore Tsimpedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIMES D.C. INC. HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN
Represented By: Maria E. Rodi
Represented By: Douglas William Desmarais
Represented By: Richard I. Scharlat
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Represented By: Mark D. Meredith
Represented By: Donald J. Kravet
Represented By: Christina S. Dumitrescu
Represented By: Angela Davis Pallozzi
Represented By: Brian Scott Cousin
Represented By: Harold Mark Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE CHIMES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Maria E. Rodi
Represented By: Douglas William Desmarais
Represented By: Richard I. Scharlat
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Represented By: Mark D. Meredith
Represented By: Donald J. Kravet
Represented By: Christina S. Dumitrescu
Represented By: Angela Davis Pallozzi
Represented By: Brian Scott Cousin
Represented By: Harold Mark Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIMES INTERNATIONAL, LTD.
Represented By: Maria E. Rodi
Represented By: Douglas William Desmarais
Represented By: Richard I. Scharlat
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Represented By: Mark D. Meredith
Represented By: Donald J. Kravet
Represented By: Christina S. Dumitrescu
Represented By: Angela Davis Pallozzi
Represented By: Brian Scott Cousin
Represented By: Harold Mark Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY RAMSEY
Represented By: Athan Theodore Tsimpedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?