Yuri Stoyanov v. Raymond Mabus
Defendant / Appellee: ARCHER MACY, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Commander of NSWC, WILLIAM SNYDER, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 20 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS III, Attorney General, GARTH JENSEN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Deputy Head of Code 70, PAUL SHANG, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 707, KEVIN MCCOY, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of NAVSEA, PAUL E. SULLIVAN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Commander of SEA 00, KENNETH GOLDMAN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 71 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, JEROME CARRUBBA, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Security Manager of Code 03, SAM HAN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 74 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, KENNETH FORMAN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 73 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, CIRO MINOPOLI, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 75 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, RAYMOND E. MABUS, Secretary of the Navy United States Department of the Navy, JAMES H. KING, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 70 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, JOSEPH VIGNALLI, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 7204, ROBERT K. HUR, U. S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney, BARBARA REDINGER, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Security Manager Code 40, BRUCE CROCK, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 741 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, GARY ROUGHHEAD, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of Naval Operations, JAMES SHANNON, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of NSWC, GARY ROGHEAD, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of Navy Operations, DAVID CARON, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Assistant Counsel Code 39 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, CHARLES R. REEVES, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Product Area Director of Code 09 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, M. J. BABERICH, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Head of Code 64 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, WAYNE WEIKERT, Individually and in her Official Capacity as the Head of Code 70, CHRIS D. MEYER, Individually and in her Official Capacity as EEO Chief and Commander of Code 00, MARK THOMAS, Individually and in his Official Capacity as EEO Chief and Commander of Code 00 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, M. WADE, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 21 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, KEVIN M. WILSON, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 74 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, ROBERT KOLLARS, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 7102, MIKE MULLEN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of Naval Operations, E. CAHILL, Ms., Individually and in her Official Capacity as Head of Workforce Relations Branch Code 39, DAVID L. MAYO, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 743 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, NEACLESA ANDERSON, Individually and in her Official Capacity as general Counsel of Code 04, JACK K. TEMPLETON, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 20 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, GARY M. JEBSEN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 70, MARGARET W. LONG, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Administrative/Technical Specialist Code 39, L. MURPHY, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 22 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, DAVID WINTER, Former Secretary of the Navy U.S. Department of the Navy, CATHERINE L. KESSMEIER, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Counsel of Code 004 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center, ROBERT WINGO, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 7502, ELAINE B. MCKINNEY, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Deputy EEO Chief Code 004, WILLIAM MARTIN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 722 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center and SUN HAN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 74
Plaintiff / Appellant: YURI J. STOYANOV
Case Number: 19-1502
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 30, 2019 Yuri Stoyanov v. Raymond Mabus

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Yuri J. Stoyanov. [19-1502] JR [Entered: 07/02/2019 09:22 AM]
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Yuri J. Stoyanov re: failure to satisfy fee and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Yuri J. Stoyanov. [19-1502] JR [Entered: 06/14/2019 11:00 AM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-03479-CCB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1502] JR [Entered: 05/14/2019 07:00 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 05/24/2019. [19-1502] JR [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:48 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Yuri J. Stoyanov. Informal Opening Brief due 06/03/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1502] JR [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:45 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Yuri J. Stoyanov - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 06/10/2019. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-03479-CCB. Mailed to: Yuri J. Stoyanov. [19-1502] JR [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:42 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-03479-CCB. Case manager: JRice. [19-1502] JR [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yuri Stoyanov v. Raymond Mabus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARCHER MACY, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Commander of NSWC
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM SNYDER, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 20 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS III, Attorney General
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARTH JENSEN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Deputy Head of Code 70
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL SHANG, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 707
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN MCCOY, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of NAVSEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL E. SULLIVAN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Commander of SEA 00
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH GOLDMAN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 71 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEROME CARRUBBA, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Security Manager of Code 03
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAM HAN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 74 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH FORMAN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 73 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIRO MINOPOLI, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 75 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAYMOND E. MABUS, Secretary of the Navy United States Department of the Navy
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES H. KING, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 70 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH VIGNALLI, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 7204
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT K. HUR, U. S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARBARA REDINGER, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Security Manager Code 40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRUCE CROCK, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 741 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY ROUGHHEAD, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of Naval Operations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES SHANNON, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of NSWC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY ROGHEAD, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of Navy Operations
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID CARON, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Assistant Counsel Code 39 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES R. REEVES, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Product Area Director of Code 09 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. J. BABERICH, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Head of Code 64 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WAYNE WEIKERT, Individually and in her Official Capacity as the Head of Code 70
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS D. MEYER, Individually and in her Official Capacity as EEO Chief and Commander of Code 00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK THOMAS, Individually and in his Official Capacity as EEO Chief and Commander of Code 00 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. WADE, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 21 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN M. WILSON, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 74 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT KOLLARS, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 7102
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE MULLEN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of Naval Operations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. CAHILL, Ms., Individually and in her Official Capacity as Head of Workforce Relations Branch Code 39
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID L. MAYO, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 743 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEACLESA ANDERSON, Individually and in her Official Capacity as general Counsel of Code 04
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACK K. TEMPLETON, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 20 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY M. JEBSEN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 70
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARGARET W. LONG, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Administrative/Technical Specialist Code 39
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: L. MURPHY, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 22 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID WINTER, Former Secretary of the Navy U.S. Department of the Navy
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATHERINE L. KESSMEIER, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Counsel of Code 004 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT WINGO, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 7502
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELAINE B. MCKINNEY, Individually and in her Official Capacity as Deputy EEO Chief Code 004
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM MARTIN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as Head of Code 722 Carderock Division Naval Surface Warfare Center
Represented By: Kelly Marie Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUN HAN, Individually and in his Official Capacity as the Head of Code 74
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YURI J. STOYANOV
Represented By: Yuri J. Stoyanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?