Cynthia Glenn v. Melissa Marsh
Plaintiff: MARK GUION
Plaintiff / Appellant: CYNTHIA GLENN
Defendant / Appellee: JANE DOES 1-20, ROBERT CLARK, BRITTANY VAN DE GOHM, ROCHELLE Y. CONITS, MELISSA MARSH, MILFORD OLIVER HOWARD, III, KIMBERLY DUNHAM, XYZ 1-10 ENTITIES AND AGENCIES, JOHN DOES 1-20 and RACHEL HOPKINS
Case Number: 19-1555
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Cynthia Glenn re: filing of disclosure form. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: C. Glenn. [19-1555] CT [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:52 AM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Cynthia Glenn. [19-1555] CT [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:46 AM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption modified. Mailed to: C. Glenn. [19-1555] CT [Entered: 06/06/2019 10:48 AM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-01609-DCC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1555] CT [Entered: 06/06/2019 10:48 AM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: C. Glenn. Informal Opening Brief due 07/01/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1555] CT [Entered: 06/06/2019 10:43 AM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Cynthia Glenn to notice requesting response [ # 2 ]. [19-1555] CT [Entered: 06/05/2019 04:17 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE ISSUED to Cynthia Glenn, Mark Guion and Robert Clark, Rochelle Y. Conits, Jane Does 1-20, John Does 1-20, Kimberly Dunham, Rachel Hopkins, Milford Oliver Howard, III, Melissa Marsh, Brittany Van de Gohm and XYZ 1-10 Entities and Agencies requesting response to court inquiry [1000518034].. Due: 06/03/2019 [19-1555] CT [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:18 AM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-01609-DCC. Case manager: CathyHerb. [19-1555] CT [Entered: 05/22/2019 10:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cynthia Glenn v. Melissa Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CYNTHIA GLENN
Represented By: Cynthia Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRITTANY VAN DE GOHM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROCHELLE Y. CONITS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELISSA MARSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MILFORD OLIVER HOWARD, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY DUNHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XYZ 1-10 ENTITIES AND AGENCIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RACHEL HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK GUION
Represented By: Mark Guion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?