Thomasina Gean v. Charlotte Mecklenburg BOE
Plaintiff / Appellant: THOMASINA COFIELD GEAN
Defendant / Appellee: CHARLOTTE MECKLENBURG BOARD OF EDUCATION, HUNTINGTOWNE FARMS ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS, CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASSOCIATION and EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Case Number: 19-1660
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 21, 2019 Thomasina Gean v. Charlotte Mecklenburg BOE

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 DOCUMENT by Thomasina Cofield Gean in 19-1660, 19-1661. [1000565400] [19-1660, 19-1661] AW [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:46 PM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESTRICTED ACCESS DOCUMENT (court & party access only) filed by Thomasina Cofield Gean in 19-1660, 19-1661. Document Title: exhibits K1, K2, L1, L2. Full document restriction required due to: other . [1000563423] [19-1660, 19-1661] AW [Entered: 08/08/2019 12:33 PM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENT - exhibits by Thomasina Cofield Gean in 19-1660, 19-1661. [1000563421] [19-1660, 19-1661] AW [Entered: 08/08/2019 12:32 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Thomasina Cofield Gean in 19-1660, 19-1661. [19-1660, 19-1661] AW [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:01 AM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Thomasina Cofield Gean in 19-1660, 19-1661. [19-1660, 19-1661] AW [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:45 AM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 DOCUMENT - re: address issues by Thomasina Cofield Gean in 19-1660, 19-1661. [1000547802] [19-1660, 19-1661] AW [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:39 AM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Thomasina Cofield Gean in 19-1660, 19-1661. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000547792] [19-1660, 19-1661] AW [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:33 AM]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER filed [1000533690] consolidating case 19-1661 with 19-1660(L). Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Thomasina Gean. [19-1660, 19-1661] AW [Entered: 06/20/2019 09:28 AM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00437-RJC-DCK. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1660] AW [Entered: 06/20/2019 09:02 AM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Thomasina Gean. Informal Opening Brief due 07/15/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1660] AW [Entered: 06/20/2019 08:58 AM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Thomasina Cofield Gean - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 07/22/2019 Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00437-RJC-DCK. Mailed to: Thomasina Gean. [19-1660] AW [Entered: 06/20/2019 08:56 AM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00437-RJC-DCK. Case manager: AWalker. [19-1660] AW [Entered: 06/20/2019 08:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomasina Gean v. Charlotte Mecklenburg BOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMASINA COFIELD GEAN
Represented By: Thomasina Cofield Gean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLOTTE MECKLENBURG BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Courtney Collins Rogers
Represented By: Terry LaMonte Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUNTINGTOWNE FARMS ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS
Represented By: Terry LaMonte Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Joseph L. Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By: Gill Paul Beck Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?