Carla Spencer v. Town of Bedford
Defendant / Appellee: TOWN OF BEDFORD | TOWN OF BEDFORD POLICE DEPARTMENT
Plaintiff / Appellant: CARLA BEELS SPENCER
Case Number: 19-1665
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 15, 2020 Carla Spencer v. Town of Bedford

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/17/2019. Response Brief due 10/17/2019 [19-1665] TF [Entered: 08/08/2019 11:43 AM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1665] LP [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:33 AM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for JoRita Meyer. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 5/1/19 hearing. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Carla Spencer. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00031-NKM-RSB. Transcript due from JoRita Meyer, Official Court Reporter on 09/09/2019. [19-1665] TF [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:23 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Sonia Ferris. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 8/17/18 hearing. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Carla Spencer. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00031-NKM-RSB. Transcript due from Sonia Ferris, Official Court Reporter on 09/09/2019. [19-1665] TF [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:20 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Carla Beels Spencer. [19-1665] Thomas Strelka [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:19 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Carla Beels Spencer. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000540762] [19-1665] Thomas Strelka [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:18 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas E Strelka for Carla Beels Spencer. [1000540758] [19-1665] Thomas Strelka [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:16 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Town of Bedford | Town of Bedford Police Department. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000539742] [19-1665] Jeremy Carroll [Entered: 07/01/2019 02:50 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeremy E. Carroll for Town of Bedford | Town of Bedford Police Department. [1000539740] [19-1665] Jeremy Carroll [Entered: 07/01/2019 02:49 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brittany M. Haddox for Carla Beels Spencer. [1000538792] [19-1665] Brittany Haddox [Entered: 06/28/2019 12:59 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00031-NKM-RSB. [19-1665] TF [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:45 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00031-NKM-RSB. Case manager: TFischer. [19-1665] TF [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carla Spencer v. Town of Bedford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOWN OF BEDFORD | TOWN OF BEDFORD POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Jeremy E. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLA BEELS SPENCER
Represented By: Linda Leigh Rhoads Strelka
Represented By: Norvell Winston West IV
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Haddox
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?