Farhan Warfaa v. Yusuf Ali
Plaintiff / Appellee: FARHAN MOHAMOUD TANI WARFAA
Defendant / Appellant: YUSUF ABDI ALI
Case Number: 19-1668
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1668, 19-1675 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix.. Date and method of service: 08/18/2019 ecf. [1000568841] [19-1668, 19-1675] Joseph Drennan [Entered: 08/18/2019 11:56 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Benjamin D. Klein for Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000566111] [19-1668, 19-1675] Benjamin Klein [Entered: 08/13/2019 12:19 PM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1675, 19-1668 re: filing of docketing statement Docketing statement due from Yusuf Abdi Ali on 08/01/2019.. [19-1675, 19-1668] JHM [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:00 AM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/19/2019. Response Brief due 09/17/2019 [19-1668, 19-1675] JHM [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:14 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Yusuf Abdi Ali. [19-1668] Joseph Drennan [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:41 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1668, 19-1675. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000543251] [19-1668, 19-1675] Joseph Drennan [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:39 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph Peter Drennan for Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000543250] [19-1668, 19-1675] Joseph Drennan [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:37 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Carmen K. Cheung for Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000543229] [19-1668, 19-1675] Carmen Cheung [Entered: 07/08/2019 08:40 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000543227] [19-1668, 19-1675] Lindsay Barnes [Entered: 07/08/2019 07:49 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lindsay R. Barnes III for Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000543225] [19-1668, 19-1675] Lindsay Barnes [Entered: 07/08/2019 07:48 PM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1000535368-2 ] case Originating case number: 1:05-cv-00701-LMB-JFA.. [19-1675] JHM [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:26 AM]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER filed [1000535373] consolidating case 19-1675 with 19-1668. Copies to all parties. [19-1668, 19-1675] JHM [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:22 AM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:05-cv-00701-LMB-JFA.. [19-1668] JHM [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:29 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:05-cv-00701-LMB-JFA. Case manager: JMoore. [19-1668] JHM [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farhan Warfaa v. Yusuf Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FARHAN MOHAMOUD TANI WARFAA
Represented By: Lindsay Robertson Barnes III
Represented By: Richard Scott Kelley
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Klein
Represented By: Carmen Ka Man Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: YUSUF ABDI ALI
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?