Barbara Sopkin v. Jill Mendelson
Defendant / Appellee: RICHARD S. MENDELSON TRUST, LAND CLARK CARROLL MENDELSON BLAIR P.C. and JILL C. MENDELSON, Executor of Estate of Richard S. Mendelson
Plaintiff / Appellant: BARBARA SOPKIN, General Partner for Interlase Limited Partnership
Case Number: 19-1763
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed [1000575386] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/25/2019. Response brief due 12/13/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1763] DL [Entered: 08/27/2019 02:18 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Barbara Sopkin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000562492] [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/07/2019 01:58 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1763] LHP [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:57 AM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jill C. Mendelson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000561863] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:31 PM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Land Clark Carroll Mendelson Blair P.C.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000561861] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:30 PM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Richard S. Mendelson Trust. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000561859] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:30 PM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/16/2019. Response Brief due 10/16/2019 [19-1763] TF [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:21 AM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Docket correction requested from Land Clark Carroll Mendelson Blair P.C., Jill C. Mendelson and Richard S. Mendelson Trust. [19-1763] TF [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:14 AM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Barbara Sopkin. [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:35 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Barbara Sopkin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000560487] [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:33 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John S. Lopatto III for Barbara Sopkin. [1000560483] [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:30 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert E. Draim for Land Clark Carroll Mendelson Blair P.C., Jill C. Mendelson and Richard S. Mendelson Trust. [1000560292] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:09 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00058-AJT-MSN. [19-1763] TF [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:46 AM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00058-AJT-MSN. Case manager: TFischer. [19-1763] TF [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbara Sopkin v. Jill Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD S. MENDELSON TRUST
Represented By: Robert E. Draim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAND CLARK CARROLL MENDELSON BLAIR P.C.
Represented By: Robert E. Draim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JILL C. MENDELSON, Executor of Estate of Richard S. Mendelson
Represented By: Robert E. Draim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARBARA SOPKIN, General Partner for Interlase Limited Partnership
Represented By: John Simon Lopatto III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?