Centraarchy Restaurant Mgmt v. Philip Angelo
Defendant: JEREMY DOUGLAS NIELSEN, CHELSEA MCCAFFREY COOK, DANIELLE DOWSEY, MARY AMANDA MOORE and PATRICIA CARMCAMO
Defendant / Appellant: MARK ODEGARD, DERRICK BELTON, PATRICK THOMPSON, KATHERINE STEIN, KRISTIN EHLERS, SAMUEL ZAKRZEWSKI, ALEXIS NUGENT-IACONA, DARIAN SENTELL CRAFT, NATHANIEL G. WALKER, IV, KEEGAN SHELTON, PATRICK LOWERY, BENNY A. HARRIS, JR., STEVEN M. SWANSON, RYAN A. FELDER, OLIVIA WILDMAN, CASEY OUTEN, GEORGETTE A. HARE, CONNER MILLEN, MICHAEL DIXON, DANIEL A. MILLER, LAUREN PIURKOSKI, SUECIA MCKNIGHT, WESLEY A. WILLIAMS, KATHRYN GJENNESTAD, ASHETON RICHARDSON, ERNEST SNOWDEN, TASHEKIA WILLIAMSON, EMILY STOUFFER, AMBER CASKEY STOUGHTON, MARINDA WILLIAMS, MARISA COLONE, SHENNANDOAH TALLMAN, EMMA HOYLE, AMY BETH FRANKS, CORINNA TAYLOR, TANAI WOMACK, PHILIP ANGELO, NATALIE ROSIER, BENJAMIN EDWARD MURPHY, ANDREA SMALL, LAUREN ELIZABETH BROWN, MALINA RIVAS, JACOB MCWATTERS and JORDAN HRIVNAK
Plaintiff / Appellee: CENTRAARCHY RESTAURANT MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Case Number: 19-1888
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER filed [1000602183] granting motion to extend filing time [ # 14 ]. Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 10/30/2019. Response brief due 11/29/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1888] TW [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:27 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Philip Angelo, Derrick Belton, Lauren Elizabeth Brown, Marisa Colone, Darian Sentell Craft, Michael Dixon, Kristin Ehlers, Ryan A. Felder, Amy Beth Franks, Kathryn Gjennestad, Georgette A. Hare, Benny A. Harris, Jr., Emma Hoyle, Jordan Hrivnak, Patrick Lowery, Suecia McKnight, Jacob McWatters, Conner Millen, Daniel A. Miller, Benjamin Edward Murphy, Alexis Nugent-Iacona, Mark Odegard, Casey Outen, Lauren Piurkoski, Asheton Richardson, Malina Rivas, Natalie Rosier, Keegan Shelton, Andrea Small, Ernest Snowden, Katherine Stein, Emily Stouffer, Amber Caskey Stoughton, Steven M. Swanson, Shennandoah Tallman, Corinna Taylor, Patrick Thompson, Nathaniel G. Walker, IV, Olivia Wildman, Marinda Williams, Wesley A. Williams, Tashekia Williamson, Tanai Womack and Samuel Zakrzewski to extend filing time for All briefing deadlines until Opening Brief & Joint Appendix November 8, 2019; Response Brief December 9, 2019; and Reply Brief December 30, 2019.. Date and method of service: 10/07/2019 ecf. [1000602007] [19-1888] Badge Humphries [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:08 PM]
September 23, 2019 Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1888] LHP [Entered: 09/23/2019 10:10 AM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1888] MRB [Entered: 09/03/2019 09:11 AM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/09/2019. Response Brief due 11/08/2019. [19-1888] TW [Entered: 08/30/2019 02:36 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Philip Angelo, Derrick Belton, Lauren Elizabeth Brown, Marisa Colone, Darian Sentell Craft, Michael Dixon, Kristin Ehlers, Ryan A. Felder, Amy Beth Franks, Kathryn Gjennestad, Georgette A. Hare, Benny A. Harris, Jr., Emma Hoyle, Jordan Hrivnak, Patrick Lowery, Suecia McKnight, Jacob McWatters, Conner Millen, Daniel A. Miller, Benjamin Edward Murphy, Alexis Nugent-Iacona, Mark Odegard, Casey Outen, Lauren Piurkoski, Asheton Richardson, Malina Rivas, Natalie Rosier, Keegan Shelton, Andrea Small, Ernest Snowden, Katherine Stein, Emily Stouffer, Amber Caskey Stoughton, Steven M. Swanson, Shennandoah Tallman, Corinna Taylor, Patrick Thompson, Nathaniel G. Walker, IV, Olivia Wildman, Marinda Williams, Wesley A. Williams, Tashekia Williamson, Tanai Womack and Samuel Zakrzewski. [1000578102] [19-1888] David Paavola [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:52 AM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Philip Angelo, Derrick Belton, Lauren Elizabeth Brown, Marisa Colone, Darian Sentell Craft, Michael Dixon, Kristin Ehlers, Ryan A. Felder, Amy Beth Franks, Kathryn Gjennestad, Georgette A. Hare, Benny A. Harris, Jr., Emma Hoyle, Jordan Hrivnak, Patrick Lowery, Suecia McKnight, Jacob McWatters, Conner Millen, Daniel A. Miller, Benjamin Edward Murphy, Alexis Nugent-Iacona, Mark Odegard, Casey Outen, Lauren Piurkoski, Asheton Richardson, Malina Rivas, Natalie Rosier, Keegan Shelton, Andrea Small, Ernest Snowden, Katherine Stein, Emily Stouffer, Amber Caskey Stoughton, Steven M. Swanson, Shennandoah Tallman, Corinna Taylor, Patrick Thompson, Nathaniel G. Walker, IV, Olivia Wildman, Marinda Williams, Wesley A. Williams, Tashekia Williamson, Tanai Womack and Samuel Zakrzewski. [19-1888] Badge Humphries [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:51 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Philip Angelo, Derrick Belton, Lauren Elizabeth Brown, Marisa Colone, Darian Sentell Craft, Michael Dixon, Kristin Ehlers, Ryan A. Felder, Amy Beth Franks, Kathryn Gjennestad, Georgette A. Hare, Benny A. Harris, Jr., Emma Hoyle, Jordan Hrivnak, Patrick Lowery, Suecia McKnight, Jacob McWatters, Conner Millen, Daniel A. Miller, Benjamin Edward Murphy, Alexis Nugent-Iacona, Mark Odegard, Casey Outen, Lauren Piurkoski, Asheton Richardson, Malina Rivas, Natalie Rosier, Keegan Shelton, Andrea Small, Ernest Snowden, Katherine Stein, Emily Stouffer, Amber Caskey Stoughton, Steven M. Swanson, Shennandoah Tallman, Corinna Taylor, Patrick Thompson, Nathaniel G. Walker, IV, Olivia Wildman, Marinda Williams, Wesley A. Williams, Tashekia Williamson, Tanai Womack and Samuel Zakrzewski. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000577506] [19-1888] Badge Humphries [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:41 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Badge Humphries for Philip Angelo, Derrick Belton, Lauren Elizabeth Brown, Marisa Colone, Darian Sentell Craft, Michael Dixon, Kristin Ehlers, Ryan A. Felder, Amy Beth Franks, Kathryn Gjennestad, Georgette A. Hare, Benny A. Harris, Jr., Emma Hoyle, Jordan Hrivnak, Patrick Lowery, Suecia McKnight, Jacob McWatters, Conner Millen, Daniel A. Miller, Benjamin Edward Murphy, Alexis Nugent-Iacona, Mark Odegard, Casey Outen, Lauren Piurkoski, Asheton Richardson, Malina Rivas, Natalie Rosier, Keegan Shelton, Andrea Small, Ernest Snowden, Katherine Stein, Emily Stouffer, Amber Caskey Stoughton, Steven M. Swanson, Shennandoah Tallman, Corinna Taylor, Patrick Thompson, Nathaniel G. Walker, IV, Olivia Wildman, Marinda Williams, Wesley A. Williams, Tashekia Williamson, Tanai Womack and Samuel Zakrzewski. [1000577487] [19-1888] Badge Humphries [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:34 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Centraarchy Restaurant Management Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000577434] [19-1888] Molly Cherry [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:07 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Molly H. Cherry for Centraarchy Restaurant Management Company. [1000577427] [19-1888] Molly Cherry [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:04 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Todd R. Ellis for Philip Angelo, Derrick Belton, Lauren Elizabeth Brown, Marisa Colone, Darian Sentell Craft, Michael Dixon, Kristin Ehlers, Ryan A. Felder, Amy Beth Franks, Kathryn Gjennestad, Georgette A. Hare, Benny A. Harris, Jr., Emma Hoyle, Jordan Hrivnak, Patrick Lowery, Suecia McKnight, Jacob McWatters, Conner Millen, Daniel A. Miller, Benjamin Edward Murphy, Alexis Nugent-Iacona, Mark Odegard, Casey Outen, Lauren Piurkoski, Asheton Richardson, Malina Rivas, Natalie Rosier, Keegan Shelton, Andrea Small, Ernest Snowden, Katherine Stein, Emily Stouffer, Amber Caskey Stoughton, Shennandoah Tallman, Corinna Taylor, Steven M. Swanson, Patrick Thompson, Olivia Wildman, Marinda Williams, Wesley A. Williams, Tashekia Williamson, Tanai Womack and Samuel Zakrzewski. [1000576996] [19-1888] Todd Ellis [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:53 AM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Margaret N. Fox for Philip Angelo, Derrick Belton, Lauren Elizabeth Brown, Marisa Colone, Darian Sentell Craft, Michael Dixon, Kristin Ehlers, Ryan A. Felder, Amy Beth Franks, Kathryn Gjennestad, Georgette A. Hare, Benny A. Harris, Jr., Emma Hoyle, Jordan Hrivnak, Patrick Lowery, Suecia McKnight, Jacob McWatters, Conner Millen, Daniel A. Miller, Benjamin Edward Murphy, Alexis Nugent-Iacona, Mark Odegard, Casey Outen, Lauren Piurkoski, Asheton Richardson, Malina Rivas, Natalie Rosier, Keegan Shelton, Andrea Small, Ernest Snowden, Katherine Stein, Emily Stouffer, Amber Caskey Stoughton, Steven M. Swanson, Shennandoah Tallman, Corinna Taylor, Patrick Thompson, Nathaniel G. Walker, IV, Olivia Wildman, Marinda Williams, Wesley A. Williams, Tashekia Williamson, Tanai Womack and Samuel Zakrzewski. [1000576889] [19-1888] Margaret Fox [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:57 AM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James M. Griffin for Philip Angelo, Derrick Belton, Lauren Elizabeth Brown, Marisa Colone, Darian Sentell Craft, Michael Dixon, Kristin Ehlers, Ryan A. Felder, Amy Beth Franks, Kathryn Gjennestad, Georgette A. Hare, Benny A. Harris, Jr., Emma Hoyle, Jordan Hrivnak, Patrick Lowery, Suecia McKnight, Jacob McWatters, Conner Millen, Daniel A. Miller, Benjamin Edward Murphy, Alexis Nugent-Iacona, Mark Odegard, Casey Outen, Lauren Piurkoski, Asheton Richardson, Malina Rivas, Natalie Rosier, Keegan Shelton, Andrea Small, Ernest Snowden, Katherine Stein, Emily Stouffer, Amber Caskey Stoughton, Steven M. Swanson, Shennandoah Tallman, Corinna Taylor, Patrick Thompson, Nathaniel G. Walker, IV, Olivia Wildman, Marinda Williams, Wesley A. Williams, Tashekia Williamson, Tanai Womack and Samuel Zakrzewski. [1000576883] [19-1888] James Griffin [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:53 AM]
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:17-cv-03275-MBS. [19-1888] JHM [Entered: 08/16/2019 04:02 PM]
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-03275-MBS. Case manager: JMoore. [19-1888] JHM [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centraarchy Restaurant Mgmt v. Philip Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK ODEGARD
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DERRICK BELTON
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PATRICK THOMPSON
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KATHERINE STEIN
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KRISTIN EHLERS
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SAMUEL ZAKRZEWSKI
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEXIS NUGENT-IACONA
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DARIAN SENTELL CRAFT
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NATHANIEL G. WALKER, IV
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KEEGAN SHELTON
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PATRICK LOWERY
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BENNY A. HARRIS, JR.
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEVEN M. SWANSON
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RYAN A. FELDER
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OLIVIA WILDMAN
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CASEY OUTEN
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GEORGETTE A. HARE
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CONNER MILLEN
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL DIXON
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DANIEL A. MILLER
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LAUREN PIURKOSKI
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SUECIA MCKNIGHT
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WESLEY A. WILLIAMS
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KATHRYN GJENNESTAD
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ASHETON RICHARDSON
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ERNEST SNOWDEN
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TASHEKIA WILLIAMSON
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EMILY STOUFFER
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMBER CASKEY STOUGHTON
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARINDA WILLIAMS
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARISA COLONE
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SHENNANDOAH TALLMAN
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EMMA HOYLE
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMY BETH FRANKS
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CORINNA TAYLOR
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TANAI WOMACK
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PHILIP ANGELO
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NATALIE ROSIER
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BENJAMIN EDWARD MURPHY
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANDREA SMALL
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LAUREN ELIZABETH BROWN
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MALINA RIVAS
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JACOB MCWATTERS
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JORDAN HRIVNAK
Represented By: James Mixon Griffin
Represented By: David L. Paavola
Represented By: Badge S. Humphries
Represented By: Todd Raymond Ellis
Represented By: Margaret N. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY DOUGLAS NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHELSEA MCCAFFREY COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE DOWSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY AMANDA MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA CARMCAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTRAARCHY RESTAURANT MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Represented By: Simon H. Bloom
Represented By: Molly Hughes Cherry
Represented By: Frederick Skip Sugarman
Represented By: Andrea J. Pearson
Represented By: Adam D. Nugent
Represented By: Shannan F. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?