United Supreme Council, 33 Deg v. United Supreme Council
Defendant: ROGER C. BROWN, Individually and as Grand Master of the Most Worshipful Prince Hall Grand Lodge of Virginia Free and Accepted Masons, Incorporated and MOST WORSHIPFUL PRINCE HALL GRAND LODGE OF VIRGINIA FREE AND ACCEPTED MASONS, INCORPORATED
Defendant / Appellee: RALPH SLAUGHTER, UNITED SUPREME COUNCIL OF THE ANCIENT ACCEPTED SCOTTISH RITE FOR THE 33 DEGREE OF FREEMASONRY, PRINCE HALL AFFILIATED, a District of Columbia Non-Profit Corporation, MICHAEL A. PARRIS and JOSEPH A. WILLIAMS
Plaintiff / Appellant: UNITED SUPREME COUNCIL, 33 DEGREE OF THE ANCIENT AND ACCEPTED SCOTTISH RITE OF FREEMASONRY, PRINCE HALL AFFILIATION, SOUTHERN JURISDICTION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, a Tennessee Non-Profit Corporation and UNITED SUPREME COUNCIL 33 (THIRTY-THREE) OF THE ANCIENT AND ACCEPTED SCOTTISH RITE OF FREEMASONRY (PRINCE HALL AFFILIATION) SOUTHERN JURISDICTION U.S., GRAND ORIENT AT WASHINGTON, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, a District of Columbia Non-Profit Corporation; T
Case Number: 19-1942
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed suspending proceedings in this case. Copies to all parties. [1000608749] [19-1942] AW [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:19 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Letter re: [ # 10 ] notice requesting response by Michael A. Parris, Ralph Slaughter, Joseph A. Williams and United Supreme Council of the Ancient Accepted Scottish Rite for the 33 Degree of Freemasonry, Prince Hall Affiliated . [1000607117] [19-1942] Jalil Dozier [Entered: 10/15/2019 10:13 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 Letter re: by United Supreme Council 33 (Thirty-Three) of the Ancient and Accepted Scottish Rite of Freemasonry (Prince Hall Affiliation) Southern Jurisdiction U.S., Grand Orient at Washington, District Of Columbia and United Supreme Council, 33 Degree of the Ancient and Accepted Scottish Rite of Freemasonry, Prince Hall Affiliation, Southern Jurisdiction of the United States of America . [1000602144] [19-1942] Richard Baker [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:15 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE ISSUED to United Supreme Council 33 (Thirty-Three) of the Ancient and Accepted Scottish Rite of Freemasonry (Prince Hall Affiliation) Southern Jurisdiction U.S., Grand Orient at Washington, District Of Columbia, United Supreme Council, 33 Degree of the Ancient and Accepted Scottish Rite of Freemasonry, Prince Hall Affiliation, Southern Jurisdiction of the United States of America and Michael A. Parris, Ralph Slaughter, United Supreme Council of the Ancient Accepted Scottish Rite for the 33 Degree of Freemasonry, Prince Hall Affiliated and Joseph A. Williams requesting response to court inquiry [1000600222].. Due: 10/15/2019 [19-1942] JR [Entered: 10/03/2019 02:04 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1942] MRB [Entered: 09/18/2019 01:21 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/21/2019. Response Brief due 11/20/2019 [19-1942] JR [Entered: 09/11/2019 07:29 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKETING STATEMENT by United Supreme Council 33 (Thirty-Three) of the Ancient and Accepted Scottish Rite of Freemasonry (Prince Hall Affiliation) Southern Jurisdiction U.S., Grand Orient at Washington, District Of Columbia and United Supreme Council, 33 Degree of the Ancient and Accepted Scottish Rite of Freemasonry, Prince Hall Affiliation, Southern Jurisdiction of the United States of America. [19-1942] Richard Baker [Entered: 09/10/2019 04:30 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by United Supreme Council 33 (Thirty-Three) of the Ancient and Accepted Scottish Rite of Freemasonry (Prince Hall Affiliation) Southern Jurisdiction U.S., Grand Orient at Washington, District Of Columbia and United Supreme Council, 33 Degree of the Ancient and Accepted Scottish Rite of Freemasonry, Prince Hall Affiliation, Southern Jurisdiction of the United States of America. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000585287] [19-1942] Richard Baker [Entered: 09/10/2019 04:29 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard Carnell Baker, Esq. for United Supreme Council 33 (Thirty-Three) of the Ancient and Accepted Scottish Rite of Freemasonry (Prince Hall Affiliation) Southern Jurisdiction U.S., Grand Orient at Washington, District Of Columbia and United Supreme Council, 33 Degree of the Ancient and Accepted Scottish Rite of Freemasonry, Prince Hall Affiliation, Southern Jurisdiction of the United States of America. [1000585283] [19-1942] Richard Baker [Entered: 09/10/2019 04:28 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Michael A. Parris, Ralph Slaughter, Joseph A. Williams and United Supreme Council of the Ancient Accepted Scottish Rite for the 33 Degree of Freemasonry, Prince Hall Affiliated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000583116] [19-1942] Jalil Dozier [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:06 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jalil Devon Dozier for Michael A. Parris, Ralph Slaughter, Joseph A. Williams and United Supreme Council of the Ancient Accepted Scottish Rite for the 33 Degree of Freemasonry, Prince Hall Affiliated. [1000582721] [19-1942] Jalil Dozier [Entered: 09/06/2019 12:17 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] civil copyright case Originating case number: 1:16-cv-01103-LO-IDD. [19-1942] JR [Entered: 08/30/2019 12:23 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Civil copyright case docketed. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-01103-LO-IDD. Date notice of appeal filed: 08/30/2019. Case manager: JRice. [19-1942] JR [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Supreme Council, 33 Deg v. United Supreme Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RALPH SLAUGHTER
Represented By: Jalil Devon Dozier
Represented By: Amanda Renee Ledford
Represented By: Jeroyd Wiley Greene III
Represented By: Ryan Chester Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED SUPREME COUNCIL OF THE ANCIENT ACCEPTED SCOTTISH RITE FOR THE 33 DEGREE OF FREEMASONRY, PRINCE HALL AFFILIATED, a District of Columbia Non-Profit Corporation
Represented By: Jalil Devon Dozier
Represented By: Amanda Renee Ledford
Represented By: Jeroyd Wiley Greene III
Represented By: Ryan Chester Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL A. PARRIS
Represented By: Jalil Devon Dozier
Represented By: Amanda Renee Ledford
Represented By: Jeroyd Wiley Greene III
Represented By: Ryan Chester Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH A. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Jalil Devon Dozier
Represented By: Amanda Renee Ledford
Represented By: Jeroyd Wiley Greene III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNITED SUPREME COUNCIL, 33 DEGREE OF THE ANCIENT AND ACCEPTED SCOTTISH RITE OF FREEMASONRY, PRINCE HALL AFFILIATION, SOUTHERN JURISDICTION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, a Tennessee Non-Profit Corporation
Represented By: Richard Carnell Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNITED SUPREME COUNCIL 33 (THIRTY-THREE) OF THE ANCIENT AND ACCEPTED SCOTTISH RITE OF FREEMASONRY (PRINCE HALL AFFILIATION) SOUTHERN JURISDICTION U.S., GRAND ORIENT AT WASHINGTON, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, a District of Columbia Non-Profit Corporation; T
Represented By: Richard Carnell Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER C. BROWN, Individually and as Grand Master of the Most Worshipful Prince Hall Grand Lodge of Virginia Free and Accepted Masons, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOST WORSHIPFUL PRINCE HALL GRAND LODGE OF VIRGINIA FREE AND ACCEPTED MASONS, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?