Terry Gooden v. United States Navy
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES NAVY, U. S. MARINE CORPS and ROBERT B. NELLER, U.S. Marine Corps
Plaintiff / Appellant: TERRY GOODEN
Case Number: 19-2020
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Terry Gooden. [19-2020] EB [Entered: 10/10/2019 04:27 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00188-RBS-RJK. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2020] EB [Entered: 09/20/2019 06:54 AM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Terry Gooden. Informal Opening Brief due 10/15/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2020] EB [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:50 PM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00188-RBS-RJK. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-2020] EB [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry Gooden v. United States Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES NAVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U. S. MARINE CORPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT B. NELLER, U.S. Marine Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY GOODEN
Represented By: Terry Gooden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?