Heather Hoffman v. Stephanie Smart-Gittings
Defendant: STAFF SERGEANT ERIC CALENDINE, CHIEF DEPUTY MICHAEL HATFIELD, P. J. TANNER, Beaufort County Sheriff, J. EDWARD ALLEN, Beaufort County Coroner, CORPORAL ANDREW CALORE and JERRI ANN ROSENEAU, Beaufort County Magistrate Court Clerk of Court
Defendant / Appellee: AT&T, CATHERINE E. HEIGEL, Director, SC Department of Health and Environmental Control, STEPHANIE SMART-GITTINGS, Circuit Defender, Beaufort County Public Defender's Office, SUSAN ERIN PRESNELL, MUSC Medical Examiner, JOHN DOES X 20 and DUFFIE STONE, Fourteenth Circuit Court Solicitor
Plaintiff / Appellant: HEATHER C. HOFFMAN
Case Number: 19-2058
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 9:18-cv-01146-RMG-BM. Mailed to: Heather C. Hoffman. [19-2058] JR [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:59 PM]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Heather C. Hoffman. [1000635314] [19-2058] JR [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:57 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Heather C. Hoffman re: failure to file informal brief. Mailed to: Heather C. Hoffman. [19-2058] JR [Entered: 10/30/2019 09:12 AM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by AT&T. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000605509] [19-2058] Andrew Hand [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:06 AM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew R. Hand for AT&T. [1000605504] [19-2058] Andrew Hand [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:04 AM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Duffie Stone. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000605405] [19-2058] Mary Lohr [Entered: 10/11/2019 09:59 AM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary Bass Lohr for Duffie Stone. [1000605404] [19-2058] Mary Lohr [Entered: 10/11/2019 09:58 AM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Hervery Young for Stephanie Smart-Gittings. [1000604926] [19-2058] Hervery Young [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:28 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ms. Catherine E. Heigel. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000604823] [19-2058] Barbara Showers [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:50 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000604822] [19-2058] Barbara Showers [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:49 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Barbara Wynne Showers for Dr. Susan Erin Presnell and Ms. Catherine E. Heigel. [1000604820] [19-2058] Barbara Showers [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:47 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Elloree A. Ganes for Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [1000604816] [19-2058] Elloree Ganes [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:44 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 9:18-cv-01146-RMG-BM. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2058] JR [Entered: 10/10/2019 08:27 AM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Heather C Hoffman. Informal Opening Brief due 10/24/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2058] JR [Entered: 09/30/2019 01:30 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:18-cv-01146-RMG-BM. Case manager: JRice. [19-2058] JR [Entered: 09/30/2019 12:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heather Hoffman v. Stephanie Smart-Gittings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAFF SERGEANT ERIC CALENDINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF DEPUTY MICHAEL HATFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. J. TANNER, Beaufort County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. EDWARD ALLEN, Beaufort County Coroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORAL ANDREW CALORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRI ANN ROSENEAU, Beaufort County Magistrate Court Clerk of Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AT&T
Represented By: Andrew Richard Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATHERINE E. HEIGEL, Director, SC Department of Health and Environmental Control
Represented By: William Donald Britt Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Wynne Showers
Represented By: Elloree Ann Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHANIE SMART-GITTINGS, Circuit Defender, Beaufort County Public Defender's Office
Represented By: Hervery B. O. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN ERIN PRESNELL, MUSC Medical Examiner
Represented By: Barbara Wynne Showers
Represented By: Elloree Ann Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES X 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DUFFIE STONE, Fourteenth Circuit Court Solicitor
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HEATHER C. HOFFMAN
Represented By: Heather C. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?