Lynton Ballentine v. Wells Fargo Bank National
Defendant / Appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DOES 1 THROUGH 100, Inclusive, SHAPIRO AND INGLE, LLP, SATTERFIELD LEGAL, PLLC, GINNIE MAE, As Trustee for Securitized Trust Guaranteed Remic Pass-Through Securities 2006-040 Trust and CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellant: LB INTERNATIONAL EXPRESS TRUST and LYNTON BALLENTINE
Case Number: 19-2117
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Lynton Ballentine. [19-2117] JHM [Entered: 12/09/2019 04:15 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Champion Mortgage Company, Satterfield Legal, PLLC and Shapiro and Ingle, LLP. [1000630014] [19-2117] Jason Purser [Entered: 11/20/2019 01:43 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Champion Mortgage Company, Satterfield Legal, PLLC and Shapiro and Ingle, LLP re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 11/21/2019 from Jason Kenneth Purser. Mailed to: Lynton Ballentine & Nathan Strup. [19-2117] TW [Entered: 11/18/2019 10:25 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Champion Mortgage Company, Satterfield Legal, PLLC and Shapiro and Ingle, LLP. [19-2117]--[Edited 11/18/2019 by LDJ to modify brief type] Jason Purser [Entered: 11/15/2019 04:31 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. [19-2117] B. Ewing [Entered: 11/15/2019 12:00 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Shapiro and Ingle, LLP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000625209] [19-2117] Jason Purser [Entered: 11/13/2019 12:18 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Satterfield Legal, PLLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000625208] [19-2117] Jason Purser [Entered: 11/13/2019 12:17 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Champion Mortgage Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000625207] [19-2117] Jason Purser [Entered: 11/13/2019 12:16 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Lynton Ballentine and Champion Mortgage Company, Satterfield Legal, PLLC and Shapiro and Ingle, LLP re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Lynton Ballentine & Nathan Strup. [19-2117] TW [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:15 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Lynton Ballentine. [19-2117] TW [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:11 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000612908] [19-2117] B. Ewing [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:31 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Baxter Chad Ewing for Wells Fargo Bank National Association. [1000612906] [19-2117] B. Ewing [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:29 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00589-CCE-JEP. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2117] JHM [Entered: 10/15/2019 04:44 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 10/25/2019. [19-2117] JHM [Entered: 10/11/2019 04:39 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 10/25/2019. [19-2117] JHM [Entered: 10/11/2019 12:23 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Lynton Ballentine. Informal Opening Brief due 11/04/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2117] JHM [Entered: 10/11/2019 12:03 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE ISSUED to Lynton Ballentine and LB International Express Trust re: status of counsel. Mailed to: Lynton Ballentine Roy D. Rudisill 3955 Sawmill Road Winston Salem, NC 27107. Status of Counsel due 10/21/2019. [19-2117] JHM [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:49 AM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00589-CCE-JEP. Case manager: JMoore. [19-2117] JHM [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynton Ballentine v. Wells Fargo Bank National
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: B. Chad Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lynne P. Klauer
Represented By: Nathan Lee Strup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES 1 THROUGH 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHAPIRO AND INGLE, LLP
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Purser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SATTERFIELD LEGAL, PLLC
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Purser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GINNIE MAE, As Trustee for Securitized Trust Guaranteed Remic Pass-Through Securities 2006-040 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY
Represented By: Jason Kenneth Purser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LB INTERNATIONAL EXPRESS TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYNTON BALLENTINE
Represented By: Lynton Ballentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?