Paul Clark, Sr. v. Council of Unit Owners
Not Yet Classified: REBECCA DELORME, PAUL C. CLARK, SR., PAUL CLARK, JR. and COUNCIL OF UNIT OWNERS OF THE 100 HARBORVIEW DRIVE CONDOMINIUM
Case Number: 19-2140
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2140, 19-2183] MRB [Entered: 12/03/2019 08:49 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 23 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2181, 19-2140, 19-2183] MRB [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:09 AM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: PAUL C. CLARK, SR.; REBECCA DELORME; PAUL CLARK, JR. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/24/2019. Opening/Response Brief Due: 01/23/2020. Response/Reply Brief Due 02/24/2020. [19-2140, 19-2183] TF [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:01 AM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 Letter re: Correspondence/Line regarding Transcripts by Rebecca Delorme, Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Paul Clark, Jr. in 19-2140 . [1000625613] [19-2140, 19-2183] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 11/13/2019 05:10 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2140, 19-2183 regarding the filing of transcript order. Transcript order order due 11/15/2019 by Paul Clark Jr., Paul C. Clark Sr. and Rebecca Delorme. [19-2140, 19-2183] TF [Entered: 11/12/2019 10:31 AM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 Appendix designations by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2183 Is statement of issues included? No [19-2140, 19-2183] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:25 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 STATEMENT OF ISSUES by Appellee Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2140, Appellant Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2183. [19-2140, 19-2183] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:19 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:10 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Paul C. Clark, Sr., Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2140. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000623255] [19-2140, 19-2183] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:13 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brennan C. McCarthy for Paul C. Clark, Sr., Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2140. [1000623249] [19-2140, 19-2183] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:07 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Paul C. Clark, Sr., Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme. [19-2140] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:05 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2140 for the filing of disclosure forms, appearance form, and docketing statement. Forms due 11/14/2019. [19-2140] TF [Entered: 11/08/2019 10:16 AM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Notice re: Position Concerning Consolidation of Cases by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2140. [19-2140, 19-2183] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/06/2019 04:23 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Randall L. Hagen for Monique D. Almy, Plan Officer for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2140. [1000621233] [19-2140, 19-2183] FILED IN ERROR.--[Edited 11/06/2019 by TF] Randall Hagen [Entered: 11/06/2019 12:11 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE ISSUED to Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr., Rebecca Delorme and Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2140, Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr., Rebecca Delorme and Monique D. Almy in 19-2181, Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium and Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2183 requesting response to court inquiry [1000615424]. Mailed to: Almy. Due: 11/07/2019 [19-2140, 19-2183, 19-2181] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 04:20 PM]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed consolidating case 19-2183 with 19-2140. Cross-appeal appellant: PAUL C. CLARK, SR.; REBECCA DELORME; PAUL CLARK, JR. Copies to all parties. [1000615161] [19-2140, 19-2183] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 12:04 PM]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed rescinding briefing order. Copies to all parties. [1000615159] [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 12:02 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000612024] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:35 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul Sweeney for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000612019] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:33 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa Yonka Stevens for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000612016] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:32 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James R. Schraf for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000612012] [19-2140] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:30 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Stevens. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/26/2019. Response Brief due 12/26/2019 [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/17/2019 01:39 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03542-SAG,16-13049,17-00045. Mailed to: Stevens. [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/17/2019 01:37 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03542-SAG,16-13049,17-00045. Case manager: TFischer. [19-2140] TF [Entered: 10/17/2019 01:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Paul Clark, Sr. v. Council of Unit Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: REBECCA DELORME
Represented By: Brennan Christopher McCarthy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAUL C. CLARK, SR.
Represented By: Brennan Christopher McCarthy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAUL CLARK, JR.
Represented By: Brennan Christopher McCarthy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COUNCIL OF UNIT OWNERS OF THE 100 HARBORVIEW DRIVE CONDOMINIUM
Represented By: Lisa Yonka Stevens
Represented By: James Russell Schraf
Represented By: Paul Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?