Paul Clark, Sr. v. Monique Almy
Appellee: MONIQUE D. ALMY, Plan Officer
Not Yet Classified: REBECCA DELORME, PAUL C. CLARK, SR., PAUL CLARK, JR. and COUNCIL OF UNIT OWNERS OF THE 100 HARBORVIEW DRIVE CONDOMINIUM
Case Number: 19-2181
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 22 Docket correction requested from Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme. [19-2181] AB [Entered: 12/26/2019 08:38 AM]
December 24, 2019 Filing 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brennan C. McCarthy for Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme. [1000651178] [19-2181] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 12/24/2019 01:06 AM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme re: filing of appearance form, disclosure statement, and docketing statement. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days, filing of disclosure form, filing of docketing statement. [19-2181] TF [Entered: 12/06/2019 10:47 AM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/13/2020. Response Brief due 02/12/2020 [19-2181] TF [Entered: 12/04/2019 12:38 PM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paul C. Clark, Sr.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000637056] [19-2181] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 12/03/2019 01:54 PM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Paul C. Clark, Sr.. [19-2181] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 12/03/2019 01:54 PM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brennan C. McCarthy for Paul C. Clark, Sr.. [1000637053] [19-2181] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 12/03/2019 01:53 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Rebecca Delorme for the : filing of appearance form, disclosure form, and docketing statement. Forms due 12/03/2019. [19-2181] TF [Entered: 11/26/2019 10:31 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2181, 19-2140, 19-2183] MRB [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:09 AM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Consolidation by Paul C. Clark, Sr., Paul Clark, Jr. and Rebecca Delorme. [19-2181] Brennan McCarthy [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:20 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Notice re: Position Concerning Consolidation of Cases by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [19-2181] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/06/2019 04:19 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Response to Court Notice by Monique D. Almy. [19-2181] Randall Hagen [Entered: 11/06/2019 02:07 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Monique D. Almy. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000621334] [19-2181] TF [Entered: 11/06/2019 01:06 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Randall L. Hagen for Monique D. Almy. [1000621302] [19-2181] Randall Hagen [Entered: 11/06/2019 12:51 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000620628] [19-2181] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:44 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa Yonka Stevens for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000620624] [19-2181] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:43 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James R. Schraf for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000620622] [19-2181] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:42 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul Sweeney for Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium. [1000620616] [19-2181] Paul Sweeney [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:41 PM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. Mailed to: Almy. [19-2181] TF [Entered: 11/04/2019 04:07 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE ISSUED to Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr., Rebecca Delorme and Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium in 19-2140, Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr., Rebecca Delorme and Monique D. Almy in 19-2181, Council of Unit Owners of the 100 Harborview Drive Condominium and Paul Clark, Jr., Paul C. Clark, Sr. and Rebecca Delorme in 19-2183 requesting response to court inquiry [1000615424]. Mailed to: Almy. Due: 11/07/2019 [19-2140, 19-2183, 19-2181] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 04:20 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01437-SAG,16-13049. Mailed to: Almy. [19-2181] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 11:41 AM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01437-SAG. Case manager: TFischer. [19-2181] TF [Entered: 10/28/2019 11:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Paul Clark, Sr. v. Monique Almy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MONIQUE D. ALMY, Plan Officer
Represented By: Monique D. Almy
Represented By: Randall L. Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: REBECCA DELORME
Represented By: Brennan Christopher McCarthy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAUL C. CLARK, SR.
Represented By: Brennan Christopher McCarthy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAUL CLARK, JR.
Represented By: Brennan Christopher McCarthy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COUNCIL OF UNIT OWNERS OF THE 100 HARBORVIEW DRIVE CONDOMINIUM
Represented By: Lisa Yonka Stevens
Represented By: James Russell Schraf
Represented By: Paul Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?