Antoine Martin v. Roy Cooper
Defendant / Appellee: HERTFORD COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, LT. MARTY DAVIS, Major, VERNON STEWART, District Attorney (District 11A), MAUREEN KRUEGER, District Attorney (District 19D), TOM HORNER, District Attorney (District 23), MIKE MILLER, District Attorney (District 27B), SUSAN DOYLE, District Attorney (District 11B), GREG NEWMAN, District Attorney (District 29B), BILLY WEST, District Attorney (District 12), BEN DAVID, District Attorney (District 05), ERIK A. HOOKS, Secretary of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, LYNN CLODFELTER, District Attorney (District 20A), JAMES O'NEILL, District Attorney (District 21), BRANDY COOK, District Attorney (District 19C), JIM WOODALL, District Attorney (District 15B), VALERIE ASBELL, District Attorney (District 06), SCOTT REILLY, District Attorney (District 25), MATT SCOTT, District Attorney (District 16B), ROY COOPER, Governor of the State of North Carolina, ANDREW WOMBLE, District Attorney (District 01), SARAH KIRKMAN, District Attorney (District 22A), SETH BANKS, District Attorney (District 24), RICKY BOWMAN, District Attorney (District 17B), MIKE WATERS, District Attorney (District 09), REECE SAUNDERS, District Attorney (District 16C), NANCY LORRIN FREEMAN, District Attorney (District 10), TODD WILLIAMS, District Attorney (District 28), AVERY CRUMP, District Attorney (District 18), SPENCER MERRIWEATHER, District Attorney (District 26), MR. JOSHUA STEIN, Attorney General of the State of North Carolina, TREY ROBINSON, District Attorney (District 20B), FARIS DIXON, District Attorney (District 03A), JACQUELINE PEREZ, District Attorney (District 09A), JASON RAMEY, District Attorney (District 17A), ASHLEY WELCH, District Attorney (District 30), DEXTER HAYES, Sheriff, ERNIE LEE, District Attorney (District 04), MATTHEW DELBRIDGE, District Attorney (District 08), ROBERT EVANS, District Attorney (District 07), TED BELL, District Attorney (District 29A), SATANA DEBERRY, District Attorney (District 14), GARRY FRANK, District Attorney (District 22B), SETH EDWARDS, District Attorney (District 02), JON DAVID, District Attorney (District 13), KRISTY NEWTON, District Attorney (District 16A), ROXANN VANEEKHOVEN, District Attorney (District 19A), SCOTT THOMAS, District Attorney (District 03B), LOCKE BELL, District Attorney (District 27A), ANDY GREGSON, District Attorney (District 19B) and SEAN BOONE, District Attorney (District 15A)
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTOINE D. MARTIN
Case Number: 19-2196
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 12, 2020 Antoine Martin v. Roy Cooper

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Antoine D. Martin. [19-2196] AB [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:53 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tammera S. Hill for Roy Cooper, Erik A. Hooks and Joshua Stein. [1000639767] [19-2196] Tammera Hill [Entered: 12/06/2019 10:37 AM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Marty Davis, Dexter Hayes and Hertford County Sheriff's Office. [19-2196] Rudolf Garcia-Gallont [Entered: 12/05/2019 05:01 PM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Valerie Asbell, Seth Banks, Locke Bell, Ted Bell, Sean Boone, Ricky Bowman, Lynn Clodfelter, Brandy Cook, Roy Cooper, Avery Crump, Ben David, Jon David, Satana DeBerry, Matthew Delbridge, Faris Dixon, Susan Doyle, Seth Edwards, Robert Evans, Garry Frank, Nancy Lorrin Freeman, Andy Gregson, Erik A. Hooks, Tom Horner, Sarah Kirkman, Maureen Krueger, Ernie Lee, Spencer Merriweather, Mike Miller, Greg Newman, Kristy Newton, James O'Neill, Jacqueline Perez, Jason Ramey, Scott Reilly, Trey Robinson, Reece Saunders, Matt Scott, Joshua Stein, Scott Thomas, Roxann Vaneekhoven, Mike Waters, Billy West, Todd Williams and Jim Woodall. [19-2196] Kathryn Shields [Entered: 12/05/2019 03:57 PM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kathryn H. Shields for Valerie Asbell, Seth Banks, Locke Bell, Ted Bell, Sean Boone, Ricky Bowman, Lynn Clodfelter, Brandy Cook, Roy Cooper, Avery Crump, Ben David, Jon David, Satana DeBerry, Matthew Delbridge, Faris Dixon, Susan Doyle, Seth Edwards, Robert Evans, Garry Frank, Nancy Lorrin Freeman, Andy Gregson, Erik A. Hooks, Tom Horner, Sarah Kirkman, Maureen Krueger, Ernie Lee, Spencer Merriweather, Mike Miller, Greg Newman, Kristy Newton, James O'Neill, Jacqueline Perez, Jason Ramey, Scott Reilly, Trey Robinson, Reece Saunders, Matt Scott, Joshua Stein, Vernon Stewart, Scott Thomas, Roxann Vaneekhoven, Mike Waters, Ashley Welch, Billy West, Todd Williams, Andrew Womble and Jim Woodall. [1000639283] [19-2196] Kathryn Shields [Entered: 12/05/2019 03:54 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Antoine D. Martin. [19-2196] AB [Entered: 11/21/2019 11:03 AM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00002-BO. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2196] AB [Entered: 11/14/2019 11:03 AM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Dexter Hayes. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000621412] [19-2196] Rudolf Garcia-Gallont [Entered: 11/06/2019 02:11 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Marty Davis. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000621407] [19-2196] Rudolf Garcia-Gallont [Entered: 11/06/2019 02:09 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Hertford County Sheriff's Office. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000621402] [19-2196] Rudolf Garcia-Gallont [Entered: 11/06/2019 02:08 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rudolf Garcia-Gallont for Marty Davis, Dexter Hayes and Hertford County Sheriff's Office. [1000621397] [19-2196] Rudolf Garcia-Gallont [Entered: 11/06/2019 02:06 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Antoine D. Martin 351 Boone Farm Road Ahoskie, NC 27910. Informal Opening Brief due 11/22/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2196] AB [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:16 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/12/2019. [19-2196] AB [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:12 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00002-BO. Case manager: ABrownlee. [19-2196] AB [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antoine Martin v. Roy Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HERTFORD COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By: Rudolf Alexander Garcia-Gallont
Represented By: James R. Morgan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LT. MARTY DAVIS, Major
Represented By: Rudolf Alexander Garcia-Gallont
Represented By: James R. Morgan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERNON STEWART, District Attorney (District 11A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAUREEN KRUEGER, District Attorney (District 19D)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOM HORNER, District Attorney (District 23)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE MILLER, District Attorney (District 27B)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN DOYLE, District Attorney (District 11B)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG NEWMAN, District Attorney (District 29B)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILLY WEST, District Attorney (District 12)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEN DAVID, District Attorney (District 05)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIK A. HOOKS, Secretary of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Tammera Sudderth Hill Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LYNN CLODFELTER, District Attorney (District 20A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES O'NEILL, District Attorney (District 21)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANDY COOK, District Attorney (District 19C)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM WOODALL, District Attorney (District 15B)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VALERIE ASBELL, District Attorney (District 06)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT REILLY, District Attorney (District 25)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATT SCOTT, District Attorney (District 16B)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROY COOPER, Governor of the State of North Carolina
Represented By: Tammera Sudderth Hill Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW WOMBLE, District Attorney (District 01)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SARAH KIRKMAN, District Attorney (District 22A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SETH BANKS, District Attorney (District 24)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICKY BOWMAN, District Attorney (District 17B)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE WATERS, District Attorney (District 09)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REECE SAUNDERS, District Attorney (District 16C)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY LORRIN FREEMAN, District Attorney (District 10)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TODD WILLIAMS, District Attorney (District 28)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AVERY CRUMP, District Attorney (District 18)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPENCER MERRIWEATHER, District Attorney (District 26)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. JOSHUA STEIN, Attorney General of the State of North Carolina
Represented By: Tammera Sudderth Hill Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TREY ROBINSON, District Attorney (District 20B)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FARIS DIXON, District Attorney (District 03A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE PEREZ, District Attorney (District 09A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON RAMEY, District Attorney (District 17A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASHLEY WELCH, District Attorney (District 30)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEXTER HAYES, Sheriff
Represented By: Rudolf Alexander Garcia-Gallont
Represented By: James R. Morgan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERNIE LEE, District Attorney (District 04)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW DELBRIDGE, District Attorney (District 08)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT EVANS, District Attorney (District 07)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TED BELL, District Attorney (District 29A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SATANA DEBERRY, District Attorney (District 14)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARRY FRANK, District Attorney (District 22B)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SETH EDWARDS, District Attorney (District 02)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON DAVID, District Attorney (District 13)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTY NEWTON, District Attorney (District 16A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROXANN VANEEKHOVEN, District Attorney (District 19A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT THOMAS, District Attorney (District 03B)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOCKE BELL, District Attorney (District 27A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDY GREGSON, District Attorney (District 19B)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEAN BOONE, District Attorney (District 15A)
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTOINE D. MARTIN
Represented By: Antoine D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?