Ron Foster v. EPA
Defendant: GINA MCCARTHY, in her official capacity as Administrator
Defendant / Appellee: SCOTT PRUITT, in his official capacity as Administrator, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY and ANDREW WHEELER, in his official capacity as Administrator
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARKETING & PLANNING SPECIALISTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, FOSTER FARMS, LLC and RON FOSTER
Case Number: 19-2208
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert J. Lundman for EPA and Andrew Wheeler. [1000649488] [19-2208] Robert Lundman [Entered: 12/20/2019 10:48 AM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 18 COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for abeyance [ # 15 ] Case 19-2208 placed in abeyance pending decision in 2:14cv16744 from Southern District of West Virginia, Copies to all parties. [1000645664] [19-2208] DL [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:44 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 Returned mail received for Kent Hanson. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? n/a [1000644658] [19-2208] KH [Entered: 12/13/2019 03:26 PM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER filed suspending briefing schedule. Copies to all parties. [1000642574] [19-2208] KH [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:32 PM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION by Foster Farms, LLC, Ron Foster and Marketing & Planning Specialists Limited Partnership to place case in abeyance. , to extend filing time for Briefing Schedule and Appendix until 120 days from current deadlines (April 21, 2020, for Opening Brief and Appendix, and May 20, 2020, for Response Brief).. Date and method of service: 12/10/2019 ecf. [1000642470] [19-2208] Joseph Schaeffer [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:45 PM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 Returned mail received from Kent Hanson re [ # 2 ] docketing Notice. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? N/a [1000630142] [19-2208] KH [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:50 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 Returned mail received from Kent Hanson re [ # 10 ] briefing order , [ # 9 ] Order. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? N/a [1000630137] [19-2208] KH [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:49 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer M. Mankins, AUSA for EPA and Andrew Wheeler. [1000625723] [19-2208] Jennifer Mankins [Entered: 11/14/2019 08:33 AM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. Mailed to: Laura J.S. Brown, Kent Edmund Hanson, Sonya Shea. [19-2208] KH [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:51 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Laura J.S. Brown, Kent Edmund Hanson, Sonya Shea. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/23/2019. Response Brief due 01/21/2020 [19-2208] KH [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:33 PM]
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed substituting party. Andrew Wheeler substituted for Scott Pruitt. Copies to all parties. [1000624265] [19-2208] KH [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:11 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John C. Wilkinson for Foster Farms, LLC, Ron Foster and Marketing & Planning Specialists Limited Partnership. [1000624034] [19-2208] John Wilkinson [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:12 AM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Foster Farms, LLC, Ron Foster and Marketing & Planning Specialists Limited Partnership. [19-2208] Joseph Schaeffer [Entered: 11/11/2019 03:07 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Marketing & Planning Specialists Limited Partnership. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000623232] [19-2208] Joseph Schaeffer [Entered: 11/08/2019 01:39 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ron Foster. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000623228] [19-2208] Joseph Schaeffer [Entered: 11/08/2019 01:38 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Foster Farms, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000623227] [19-2208] Joseph Schaeffer [Entered: 11/08/2019 01:37 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph V. Schaeffer for Foster Farms, LLC, Ron Foster and Marketing & Planning Specialists Limited Partnership. [1000623224] [19-2208] Joseph Schaeffer [Entered: 11/08/2019 01:35 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-16744. Mailed to: Laura J.S. Brown, Kent Edmund Hanson, Sonya Shea. [19-2208] KH [Entered: 10/31/2019 04:04 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-16744. Case manager: KHancock. [19-2208] KH [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ron Foster v. EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA MCCARTHY, in her official capacity as Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT PRUITT, in his official capacity as Administrator
Represented By: Laura J.S. Brown
Represented By: Stefania D. Shamet
Represented By: Sonya Shea
Represented By: J. Christopher Krivonyak
Represented By: Kent Edmund Hanson
Represented By: Gary L. Call
Represented By: Jennifer Maureen Mankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Laura J.S. Brown
Represented By: Stefania D. Shamet
Represented By: Sonya Shea
Represented By: J. Christopher Krivonyak
Represented By: Kent Edmund Hanson
Represented By: Gary L. Call
Represented By: Jennifer Maureen Mankins
Represented By: Robert Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW WHEELER, in his official capacity as Administrator
Represented By: Jennifer Maureen Mankins
Represented By: Robert Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARKETING & PLANNING SPECIALISTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Joseph V. Schaeffer
Represented By: John Charles Wilkinson Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FOSTER FARMS, LLC
Represented By: Joseph V. Schaeffer
Represented By: John Charles Wilkinson Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RON FOSTER
Represented By: Joseph V. Schaeffer
Represented By: John Charles Wilkinson Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?