Emmanuel Edokobi v. U. S. General Services Admin
Defendant: RUSHERN BAKER, III, In His Personal Capacities, JAMES DAILEY, DEPARTMENT OF PERMITTING, INSPECTIONS AND ENFORCEMENT, BENJAMIN BARKSDALE, In His Personal Capacities, MICHAEL HARRY, In His Personal and Offical Capacities, RENEE TAYLOR, In Her Personal and Official Capacities, ELLINGTON CHURCHILL, JR., In His Personal Capacities, CLAUDE MISHER, In His Personal Capacities, RAY HINKLE, In His Personal Capacities, PETER SHAPIRO, In His Personal Capacities, VERIZON MARYLAND INC., SHIRLEY CHINN, In Her Personal and Official Capacities, OFFICER PA1002, In His Personal Capacities, PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF FIRE AND EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES and REVENUE AUTHORITY OF PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY PARKING VIOLATION ENFORCEMENT
Defendant / Appellee: NACIEVE OWENS, In HIs Personal and Official Capacities, MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES, DONNIE BAXTER, TIMOTHY HORNE, In His Personal and Official Capacities, ERIC BROWN, In His Personal and Official Capacities, ALEX HERNANDEZ, In His Personal and Official Capacities, CHRISTOPHER CHERRY, In His Personal and Official Capacities, NGOZI O. OKORONKWO, In His Personal and Official Capacities, COAKLEY REALTY MANAGEMENT, LLC, DANIEL LIVINGSTON, In His Personal and Official Capacities, TERRI WINSTON, In Her Personal Capacities, WILLIAM EDELEN, In His Personal and Official Capacities, VERIZON MARYLAND, LLC, HAITHAM HIJAZI, In His Personal and Official Capacities, RONALD DAWKINS, In His Personal and Official Capacities, U. S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, RICKEY PARKER, In His Personal and Official Capacities, RORY COAKLEY, OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY GOVERNMENT, MARTIN STAMLER and SHIRLEY GRANT, In Her Personal and Official Capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: EMMANUEL EDOKOBI
Case Number: 19-2232
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Emmanuel Edokobi re: failure to satisfy fee requirements. Mailed to: Emmanuel Edokobi. [19-2232] JR [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:09 AM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Emmanuel Edokobi. [19-2232] JR [Entered: 12/03/2019 09:24 AM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Emmanuel Edokobi. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000630162] [19-2232] JR [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:00 PM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Verizon Maryland, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000623559] [19-2232] John McCann [Entered: 11/11/2019 02:19 PM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John E. McCann, Jr. for Verizon Maryland, LLC. [1000623558] [19-2232] John McCann [Entered: 11/11/2019 02:16 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-02469-TDC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2232] JR [Entered: 11/06/2019 08:20 AM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/19/2019. [19-2232] JR [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:20 AM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Emmanuel Edokobi. Informal Opening Brief due 12/02/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2232] JR [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:18 AM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Emmanuel Edokobi - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 12/05/2019. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-02469-TDC. Mailed to: Emmanuel Edokobi. [19-2232] JR [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:16 AM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-02469-TDC. Case manager: JRice. [19-2232] JR [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmanuel Edokobi v. U. S. General Services Admin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NACIEVE OWENS, In HIs Personal and Official Capacities
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES
Represented By: Robert Alan McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONNIE BAXTER
Represented By: Aleksandra Rybicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY HORNE, In His Personal and Official Capacities
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC BROWN, In His Personal and Official Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX HERNANDEZ, In His Personal and Official Capacities
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER CHERRY, In His Personal and Official Capacities
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NGOZI O. OKORONKWO, In His Personal and Official Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COAKLEY REALTY MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Aleksandra Rybicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL LIVINGSTON, In His Personal and Official Capacities
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRI WINSTON, In Her Personal Capacities
Represented By: Robert Alan McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM EDELEN, In His Personal and Official Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERIZON MARYLAND, LLC
Represented By: John Edward McCann Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAITHAM HIJAZI, In His Personal and Official Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RONALD DAWKINS, In His Personal and Official Capacities
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U. S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICKEY PARKER, In His Personal and Official Capacities
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RORY COAKLEY
Represented By: Aleksandra Rybicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY GOVERNMENT
Represented By: Stephen E. Whitted Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTIN STAMLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHIRLEY GRANT, In Her Personal and Official Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSHERN BAKER, III, In His Personal Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES DAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF PERMITTING, INSPECTIONS AND ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN BARKSDALE, In His Personal Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL HARRY, In His Personal and Offical Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE TAYLOR, In Her Personal and Official Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLINGTON CHURCHILL, JR., In His Personal Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUDE MISHER, In His Personal Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY HINKLE, In His Personal Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER SHAPIRO, In His Personal Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON MARYLAND INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRLEY CHINN, In Her Personal and Official Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER PA1002, In His Personal Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF FIRE AND EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVENUE AUTHORITY OF PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY PARKING VIOLATION ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMMANUEL EDOKOBI
Represented By: Emmanuel Edokobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?