Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC v. Avco Corporation
Plaintiff / Appellee: TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC and PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC
Defendant / Appellant: AVCO CORPORATION and AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC
Case Number: 19-2245
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2245] MRB [Entered: 12/20/2019 08:25 AM]
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/21/2020. Response Brief due 02/20/2020 [19-2245] RHS [Entered: 12/12/2019 10:27 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2245] MRB [Entered: 11/25/2019 09:33 AM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by A. Marisa Chun for Avco Corporation and Avstar Fuel Systems, Inc. [1000631340] [19-2245] A. Marisa Chun [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:53 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew S. Chamberlin for Avco Corporation and Avstar Fuel Systems, Inc. [1000631194] [19-2245] Andrew Chamberlin [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:20 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Preetha Suresh Rini for Avco Corporation and Avstar Fuel Systems, Inc. [1000631169] [19-2245] Preetha Rini [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:06 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Avco Corporation and Avstar Fuel Systems, Inc. [19-2245] Leslie Packer [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:02 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Avstar Fuel Systems, Inc. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000631159] [19-2245] Leslie Packer [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:00 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Avco Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000631158] [19-2245] Leslie Packer [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:59 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Leslie C. Packer for Avco Corporation and Avstar Fuel Systems, Inc. [1000631156] [19-2245] Leslie Packer [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:57 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert C. Van Arnam for PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC and Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC. [1000630638] [19-2245] Robert Van Arnam [Entered: 11/21/2019 09:45 AM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew R. Shores for PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC and Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC. [1000630600] [19-2245] Andrew Shores [Entered: 11/21/2019 09:33 AM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000630034] [19-2245] Richard Matthews [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:02 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000630032] [19-2245] Richard Matthews [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:01 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard T. Matthews for PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC and Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC. [1000630028] [19-2245] Richard Matthews [Entered: 11/20/2019 01:57 PM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00503-CCE-JEP.. [19-2245] RHS [Entered: 11/07/2019 08:50 AM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00503-CCE-JEP. Case manager: RSewell. [19-2245] RHS [Entered: 11/07/2019 08:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turn and Bank Holdings, LLC v. Avco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TURN AND BANK HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Richard Thomas Matthews
Represented By: Robert Van Arnam
Represented By: Andrew Robert Shores
Represented By: Robert Charles Van Arnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PRECISION AIRMOTIVE, LLC
Represented By: Richard Thomas Matthews
Represented By: Robert Van Arnam
Represented By: Andrew Robert Shores
Represented By: Robert Charles Van Arnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AVCO CORPORATION
Represented By: Andrew Scott Chamberlin Esq.
Represented By: Preetha Suresh Rini
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Kent B. Goss
Represented By: Valerie M. Goo
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AVSTAR FUEL SYSTEMS, INC
Represented By: Andrew Scott Chamberlin Esq.
Represented By: Preetha Suresh Rini
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Kent B. Goss
Represented By: Valerie M. Goo
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?