Carol Stein v. Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital
Defendant / Appellee: CHARLOTTE HOUSING AUTHORITY, DEXTER MOSELEY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, KERR PUTNEY, DOES, 1-11, CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT, FRANK MOON, NATHAN GRAY, JESSE DOZIER, RODNEY MONROE, GEORGE CONNOR, ROBERT MUELLER, FULTON MEACHAM, LILA WIGAN, DARREL STEPHENS, MICHAEL C. TARWATER, JAMES COMEY, CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY and EUGENE A. WOODS
Plaintiff / Appellant: CAROL ANDREA STEIN
Case Number: 19-2332
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Charlotte Housing Authority, George Connor, Jesse Dozier, Dexter Moseley and Fulton Meacham. [19-2332] Theodore Edwards [Entered: 01/03/2020 09:42 AM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Carol Andrea Stein. [19-2332] CH [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:41 AM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by George Connor, Jesse Dozier, Dexter Moseley and Fulton Meacham. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000639879] [19-2332] Theodore Edwards [Entered: 12/06/2019 11:35 AM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dylan Benjamin Hix for George Connor, Jesse Dozier, Dexter Moseley, Fulton Meacham and Charlotte Housing Authority. [1000639848] [19-2332] Dylan Hix [Entered: 12/06/2019 11:22 AM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Theodore C. Edwards II for Charlotte Housing Authority, George Connor, Jesse Dozier, Dexter Moseley and Fulton Meacham. [1000639806] [19-2332] Theodore Edwards [Entered: 12/06/2019 10:52 AM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority, Eugene A. Woods and Michael C. Tarwater. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000638859] [19-2332] Gwendolyn Lewis [Entered: 12/05/2019 11:20 AM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gwendolyn W. Lewis for Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority, Eugene A. Woods and Michael C. Tarwater. [1000636940] [19-2332] Gwendolyn Lewis [Entered: 12/03/2019 12:40 PM]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [3] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Carol Stein, Theodore Edwards, Gwendolyn Lewis. [1000633015] [19-2332] CH [Entered: 11/25/2019 11:24 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00564-RJC-DSC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2332] CH [Entered: 11/25/2019 10:12 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Carol Stein, Gwendolyn Lewis, Theodore Edwards. Informal Opening Brief due 12/19/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2332] CH [Entered: 11/25/2019 09:53 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 IFP APPLICATION transferred from district court (court access only). [19-2332] CH [Entered: 11/25/2019 09:48 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED district court document (court access only). Description of document: Application to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00564-RJC-DSC. [19-2332] CH [Entered: 11/25/2019 09:46 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00564-RJC-DSC. Case manager: CHalupa. [19-2332] CH [Entered: 11/25/2019 09:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carol Stein v. Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLOTTE HOUSING AUTHORITY
Represented By: Theodore Curtis Edwards II
Represented By: Dylan Benjamin Hix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEXTER MOSELEY
Represented By: Theodore Curtis Edwards II
Represented By: Dylan Benjamin Hix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: James Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Gill Paul Beck Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KERR PUTNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1-11
Represented By: James Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Clarence Edward Matherson Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK MOON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATHAN GRAY
Represented By: James Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSE DOZIER
Represented By: Theodore Curtis Edwards II
Represented By: Dylan Benjamin Hix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RODNEY MONROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE CONNOR
Represented By: Theodore Curtis Edwards II
Represented By: Dylan Benjamin Hix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT MUELLER
Represented By: James Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Gill Paul Beck Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FULTON MEACHAM
Represented By: Theodore Curtis Edwards II
Represented By: Dylan Benjamin Hix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LILA WIGAN
Represented By: James Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Gill Paul Beck Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DARREL STEPHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL C. TARWATER
Represented By: Gwendolyn Williams Lewis
Represented By: Tricia Morvan Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES COMEY
Represented By: James Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Gill Paul Beck Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Gwendolyn Williams Lewis
Represented By: Tricia Morvan Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EUGENE A. WOODS
Represented By: Gwendolyn Williams Lewis
Represented By: Tricia Morvan Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAROL ANDREA STEIN
Represented By: Carol Andrea Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?