J.R. v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: B.Y., individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated, J.R., individually and on behalf of her minor minor children A.R. and H.K., J.S., individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated and J.H., individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC. and WALGREEN CO.
Case Number: 19-2404
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 19 ]. Number of days granted: 7. Opening brief and appendix due 02/11/2020. Response brief due 03/12/2020. Copies to all parties.. [1000675111] [19-2404] MR [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:29 PM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION by B.Y., J.H., J.R. and J.S. to seal. Description of material to be sealed: Entire Record On Appeal.. Date and method of service: 02/03/2020 ecf. [1000674649] [19-2404] Michael Moore [Entered: 02/03/2020 09:28 AM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION by B.Y., J.H., J.R., J.S. and Walgreen Co. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. to extend filing time for Opening Brief and Joint Appendix until February 11, 2020 and Appellees have 30 days from February 11, 2020 to file response brief.. Date and method of service: 02/03/2020 ecf. [1000674631] [19-2404] Michael Moore [Entered: 02/03/2020 09:24 AM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott D. Stein for Walgreen Co. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. [1000674174] [19-2404] Scott Stein [Entered: 01/31/2020 02:40 PM]
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kate Heinzelman for Walgreen Co. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. [1000657603] [19-2404] Kate Heinzelman [Entered: 01/07/2020 07:16 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Charles W. Byrd for B.Y., J.H., J.R. and J.S.. [1000651854] [19-2404] Charles Byrd [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:55 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael J. Moore for B.Y., J.H., J.R. and J.S.. [1000651843] [19-2404] Michael Moore [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:53 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Aimee J. Hall for B.Y., J.H., J.R. and J.S.. [1000651834] [19-2404] Aimee Hall [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:50 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/04/2020. Response Brief due 03/05/2020 [19-2404] MR [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:51 AM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKETING STATEMENT by B.Y., J.H., J.R. and J.S.. [19-2404] William Nettles [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:42 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B.Y., J.H., J.R. and J.S.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000651087] [19-2404] William Nettles [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:41 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William N. Nettles for B.Y., J.H., J.R. and J.S.. [1000650886] [19-2404] William Nettles [Entered: 12/23/2019 03:16 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000646450] [19-2404] Adam Hegler [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:06 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreen Co.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000646447] [19-2404] Adam Hegler [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:05 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David E. Dukes for Walgreen Co. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. [1000646444] [19-2404] David Dukes [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:02 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Amanda S. Kitts for Walgreen Co. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. [1000646442] [19-2404] Amanda Kitts [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:00 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Adam J. Hegler for Walgreen Co. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. [1000646438] [19-2404] Adam Hegler [Entered: 12/17/2019 12:58 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00446-DCN.. [19-2404] MR [Entered: 12/11/2019 01:38 PM]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER filed sealing case. Copies to all parties.. [1000643189] [19-2404] MR [Entered: 12/11/2019 01:34 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED district court documents (court access only). Description of documents: district court docket sheet, district court notice of appeal transmittal sheet, order being appealed, notice of appeal. Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00446-DCN. [19-2404] MR [Entered: 12/11/2019 12:30 PM]
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:19-cv-00446-DCN. Case manager: MRadday. [19-2404] MR [Entered: 12/09/2019 04:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.R. v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: B.Y., individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: C. Neal Pope
Represented By: Arthur Raphael Miller
Represented By: Charles W. Byrd
Represented By: Frances Cornelia Trapp
Represented By: Adair Ford Boroughs
Represented By: Aimee J. Hall
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson III
Represented By: Michael J. Moore
Represented By: William Norman Nettles
Represented By: Edward L. Hardin Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.R., individually and on behalf of her minor minor children A.R. and H.K.
Represented By: C. Neal Pope
Represented By: Arthur Raphael Miller
Represented By: Charles W. Byrd
Represented By: Frances Cornelia Trapp
Represented By: Adair Ford Boroughs
Represented By: Aimee J. Hall
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson III
Represented By: Michael J. Moore
Represented By: William Norman Nettles
Represented By: Edward L. Hardin Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.S., individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: C. Neal Pope
Represented By: Arthur Raphael Miller
Represented By: Charles W. Byrd
Represented By: Frances Cornelia Trapp
Represented By: Adair Ford Boroughs
Represented By: Aimee J. Hall
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson III
Represented By: Michael J. Moore
Represented By: William Norman Nettles
Represented By: Edward L. Hardin Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.H., individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: C. Neal Pope
Represented By: Arthur Raphael Miller
Represented By: Charles W. Byrd
Represented By: Frances Cornelia Trapp
Represented By: Adair Ford Boroughs
Represented By: Aimee J. Hall
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson III
Represented By: Michael J. Moore
Represented By: William Norman Nettles
Represented By: Edward L. Hardin Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.
Represented By: David Eidson Dukes
Represented By: Adam J. Hegler
Represented By: Scott David Stein
Represented By: Amanda Sally Kitts
Represented By: Kate Heinzelman
Represented By: Kate Elizabeth Heinzelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALGREEN CO.
Represented By: David Eidson Dukes
Represented By: Adam J. Hegler
Represented By: Scott David Stein
Represented By: Amanda Sally Kitts
Represented By: Kate Heinzelman
Represented By: Kate Elizabeth Heinzelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?