Frank Johnson v. Correct Care Solutions
Defendant: PARKER, Nurse
Defendant / Appellee: NURSE MELISSA, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, M. GASKINS, Administer Nurse, DIRECTOR RANDOLPH, RN SHANNON and MRS. NURSE MCLEAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRANK STEPHON JOHNSON
Case Number: 19-6034
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 0:18-cv-00876-HMH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 02/06/2019 08:51 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Correct Care Solutions, Mrs. M. Gaskins, McLean, Melissa, Randolph and Shannon. [19-6034] Ryan Patane [Entered: 02/05/2019 12:27 PM]
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed [1000443846] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [9]. Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Frank Johnson, #50451. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Frank Johnson and Accounting Office, ALVIN S. GLENN DETENTION CENTER, 201 John Mark Dial Drive, Columbia, SC 29209. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:41 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Frank Stephon Johnson. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:15 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Frank Stephon Johnson. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:06 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Correct Care Solutions, Mrs. M. Gaskins, McLean, Melissa, Randolph and Shannon. [1000440318] [19-6034] Mark Gende [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:38 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ryan J. Patane for Correct Care Solutions, Mrs. M. Gaskins, Mrs. Nurse McLean, Nurse Melissa, Dr. Randolph and RN Shannon. [1000439336] [19-6034] Ryan Patane [Entered: 01/15/2019 01:01 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Correct Care Solutions, Mrs. M. Gaskins, Mrs. Nurse McLean, Nurse Melissa, Dr. Randolph, and RN Shannon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000439312] [19-6034] Ryan Patane [Entered: 01/15/2019 12:43 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court record (paper) requested? N/A. (*Original record 01/04 and supplemental 1/09.) [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:08 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA NOTICE issued to Frank Stephon Johnson. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:42 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Frank Johnson. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:24 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 0:18-cv-00876-HMH. Case manager: CBennett. [19-6034] CB [Entered: 01/04/2019 09:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Johnson v. Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NURSE MELISSA
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Patane Esq.
Represented By: Mark Victor Gende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Patane Esq.
Represented By: Mark Victor Gende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. GASKINS, Administer Nurse
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Patane Esq.
Represented By: Mark Victor Gende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIRECTOR RANDOLPH
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Patane Esq.
Represented By: Mark Victor Gende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RN SHANNON
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Patane Esq.
Represented By: Mark Victor Gende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MRS. NURSE MCLEAN
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Patane Esq.
Represented By: Mark Victor Gende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER, Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANK STEPHON JOHNSON
Represented By: Frank Stephon Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?