David Trotman, Jr. v. Central State Hospital

Defendant / Appellee: DR. YARATHA, 39 - Number Indicates Building, LYTE, 39 - Number Indicates Building, DR. RANDALL FORBES, 113 - Number Indicates Building, GRAVES, 39 - Number Indicates Building, DR. GROGAN, 39 - Number Indicates Building, CENTRAL STATE HOSPITAL, Central State Hospital, JONES, 113 - Number Indicates Building, TRACY HENDERSON, 39 - Number Indicates Building, LOFTON-BEACH, 39 - Number Indicates Building, HARPER, 39 - Number Indicates Building, GASKILL, 39 - Number Indicates Building, PARHAM, 95 - Number Indicates Building, BAILEY, 39 - Number Indicates Building, JOHN ERNST, 39 - Number Indicates Building, WILKERSON, 39 - Number Indicates Building, FISHER, 95 - Number Indicates Building, DR. JACK BARBER, DOCTOR ALBRIGHT, 39 - Number Indicates Building, MCDOWELL, 39 - Number Indicates Building, DR. MAGAKEAN, 39 - Number Indicates Building, LEE, 39 - Number Indicates Building, V.D.B.H.D.S and MILES, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID MICHAEL TROTMAN, JR.
Case Number: 19-6041
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 Letter re: by David Michael Trotman, Jr. [1000450982] [19-6041] AW [Entered: 02/04/2019 04:22 PM]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000447410] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: David Trotman Jr. #18A4180. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David Trotman Jr, and Five Points Correctional Center, Attn: Accounting, 6600 State Route 96, Romulus, NY 14541. [19-6041] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:18 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by David Michael Trotman, Jr. [19-6041] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:15 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by David Michael Trotman, Jr. [19-6041] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:14 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by David Michael Trotman, Jr.. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6041] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:13 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00716-REP. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6041] AW [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:52 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: David Trotman Jr. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6041] AW [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:49 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ David Michael Trotman, Jr. ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: David Trotman Jr. [19-6041] AW [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:44 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00716-REP. Case manager: AWalker. [19-6041] AW [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Trotman, Jr. v. Central State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. YARATHA, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LYTE, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. RANDALL FORBES, 113 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRAVES, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. GROGAN, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTRAL STATE HOSPITAL, Central State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONES, 113 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRACY HENDERSON, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOFTON-BEACH, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARPER, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GASKILL, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PARHAM, 95 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BAILEY, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN ERNST, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILKERSON, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FISHER, 95 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. JACK BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOCTOR ALBRIGHT, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCDOWELL, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. MAGAKEAN, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEE, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: V.D.B.H.D.S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MILES, 39 - Number Indicates Building
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID MICHAEL TROTMAN, JR.
Represented By: David Michael Trotman Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?