Roderick Johnson v. Denise Morgan

Defendant / Appellee: S. HARE and DENISE MORGAN, Warden
Plaintiff / Appellant: RODERICK JOHNSON
Case Number: 19-6067
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 Letter requesting status of case by Roderick Johnson . [1000472749] [19-6067] DL [Entered: 03/08/2019 02:12 PM]
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed [1000441702] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [6] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Roderick Johnson, #2539872. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Roderick Johnson and Warden, Accounting Office, Eastern Correctional Institution, 30420 Revells Neck Road, Westover, MD 21890. [19-6067] DL [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:34 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Roderick Johnson. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [19-6067] DL [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:29 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Roderick Johnson. [19-6067] DL [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:28 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00078-CCB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6067] DL [Entered: 01/08/2019 02:50 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Roderick Johnson. Informal Opening Brief due 02/01/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6067] DL [Entered: 01/08/2019 02:47 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Roderick Johnson ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Roderick Johnson. [19-6067] DL [Entered: 01/08/2019 02:45 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00078-CCB. Case manager: DLett. [19-6067] DL [Entered: 01/08/2019 02:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roderick Johnson v. Denise Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. HARE
Represented By: Ari Jason Kodeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENISE MORGAN, Warden
Represented By: Ari Jason Kodeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RODERICK JOHNSON
Represented By: Roderick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?