Willie Worley, Jr. v. Jason Johnson

Defendant: FRANK L. PERRY and JAMESE SMITH, Unit Manager
Defendant / Appellee: JASON JOHNSON
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIE D. WORLEY, JR.
Case Number: 19-6068
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Willie D. Worley, Jr.. [19-6068] JHM [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:00 PM]
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed [1000443751] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Willie Worley, Jr., 0453523. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Willie Worley, Jr.. [19-6068] JHM [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:58 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Willie D. Worley, Jr.. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6068] JHM [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:55 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:16-ct-03205-BO. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6068] JHM [Entered: 01/09/2019 09:08 AM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Willie D. Worley, Jr.. Informal Opening Brief due 02/01/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6068] JHM [Entered: 01/08/2019 03:47 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Willie D. Worley, Jr. ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Willie D. Worley, Jr.. [19-6068] JHM [Entered: 01/08/2019 03:46 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:16-ct-03205-BO. Case manager: JMoore. [19-6068] JHM [Entered: 01/08/2019 03:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willie Worley, Jr. v. Jason Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON JOHNSON
Represented By: Terence Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK L. PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMESE SMITH, Unit Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIE D. WORLEY, JR.
Represented By: Willie D. Worley Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?