Olandio Workman v. Scotty Bodiford
Defendant: JOE DILL, individual capacity official capacity, BUTCH KIRVENY, individual capacity official capacity, FRED PAYNE, individual capacity official capacity, JOHN VANDERMOSTEN, Interim Assistance County Administrator individual capacity official capacity, RICK ROBERT, individual capacity official capacity, GREENVILLE COUNTY COUNCIL, BOB TAYLOR, individual capacity official capacity, LIZ SEMAN, individual capacity official capacity, JOSEPH KERNELL, Greenville County Administrator individual capacity official capacity, XANTHENE NORRIS, individual capacity official capacity, WILLIS MEADOWS, individual capacity official capacity, ENNIS FANT, individual capacity official capacity, LYNN BALLARD, individual capacity official capacity and SID CATES, individual capacity official capacity
Defendant / Appellee: OFFICER SHOKLLY, individual capacity official capacity, OFFICER JENNINGS, individual capacity official capacity, OFFICER COLLIER, individual capacity official capacity, MAJOR STOWERS, individual capacity official capacity, SCOTTY BODIFORD, Jail Administrator individual capacity official capacity, SERGEANT BOWMAN, individual capacity official capacity and JIMMY THOMPSON, Mail Room Supervisor individual capacity official capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: OLANDIO RAY WORKMAN
Case Number: 19-6083
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Carly H. Davis for Scotty Bodiford, Sergeant Bowman, Collier, Jennings, Shoklly, Stowers and Jimmy Thompson. [1000458447] [19-6083] Russell Harter [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:52 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Russell W. Harter, Jr. for Scotty Bodiford, Sergeant Bowman, Collier, Jennings, Shoklly, Stowers and Jimmy Thompson. [1000458443] [19-6083] Russell Harter [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:50 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Scotty Bodiford, Sergeant Bowman, Collier, Jennings, Shoklly, Stowers and Jimmy Thompson re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 02/19/2019 from Carly Davis and Russell W. Harter Jr... [19-6083] MR [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:43 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Scotty Bodiford, Sergeant Bowman, Collier, Jennings, Shoklly, Stowers and Jimmy Thompson. [19-6083] Russell Harter [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:11 AM]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed [1000455627] granting motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ]. Number of days granted: 14. Any Informal Response Brief due 02/25/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-6083] MR [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:06 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Scotty Bodiford, Sergeant Bowman, Collier, Jennings, Shoklly, Stowers and Jimmy Thompson Russell W. Harter, Jr., Attorney for Defendants - Appellees to extend filing time for informal response brief until February 25, 2019.. Date and method of service: 02/11/2019 US mail. [1000455554] [19-6083] Russell Harter [Entered: 02/11/2019 03:17 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) - DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Scotty Bodiford, Sergeant Bowman, Collier, Jennings, Shoklly, Stowers, Jimmy Thompson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000452168] [19-6083] --[Edited 02/06/2019 by MR to remove Olandio Ray Workman as a party filer] --[Edited 02/06/2019 by MR - striking of duplicative filing - see ecf #10] Russell Harter [Entered: 02/05/2019 05:15 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Scotty Bodiford, Sergeant Bowman, Collier, Jennings, Shoklly, Stowers, Jimmy Thompson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000452167] [19-6083] --[Edited 02/06/2019 by MR to remove Olandio Ray Workman as a party filer] Russell Harter [Entered: 02/05/2019 05:14 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 46 NOTICE issued to Mrs. Carly Davis for Sergeant Bowman, Scotty Bodiford, Jennings, Jimmy Thompson, Stowers, Shoklly and Collier and Mr. Russell W. Harter, Jr. for Sergeant Bowman, Scotty Bodiford, Jennings, Jimmy Thompson, Stowers, Shoklly and Collier filing of disclosure form Requested document due 02/20/2019.. [19-6083] MR [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:30 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Scotty Bodiford, Sergeant Bowman, Collier, Jennings, Shoklly, Stowers and Jimmy Thompson re: filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Scotty Bodiford, Sergeant Bowman, Collier, Jennings, Shoklly, Stowers and Jimmy Thompson on 02/01/2019.. [19-6083] MR [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:25 AM]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed [1000447177] granting application for leave to proceed PLRA [6] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: OLANDIO RAY WORKMAN (273352). Copies to all parties. Mailed to: appellant and Financial Section, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Post Office Box 21787, Columbia, SC 29221. [19-6083] MR [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:22 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Olandio Ray Workman. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6083] MR [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:18 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Olandio Ray Workman. [19-6083] MR [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:17 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 02/04/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6083] MR [Entered: 01/10/2019 08:29 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Olandio Ray Workman ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days.. [19-6083] MR [Entered: 01/10/2019 08:27 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00355-RBH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6083] MR [Entered: 01/10/2019 08:27 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00355-RBH. Case manager: MRadday. [19-6083] MR [Entered: 01/10/2019 08:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olandio Workman v. Scotty Bodiford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER SHOKLLY, individual capacity official capacity
Represented By: Carly Davis
Represented By: Russell W. Harter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER JENNINGS, individual capacity official capacity
Represented By: Carly Davis
Represented By: Russell W. Harter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER COLLIER, individual capacity official capacity
Represented By: Carly Davis
Represented By: Russell W. Harter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAJOR STOWERS, individual capacity official capacity
Represented By: Carly Davis
Represented By: Russell W. Harter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTTY BODIFORD, Jail Administrator individual capacity official capacity
Represented By: Carly Davis
Represented By: Russell W. Harter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT BOWMAN, individual capacity official capacity
Represented By: Carly Davis
Represented By: Russell W. Harter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIMMY THOMPSON, Mail Room Supervisor individual capacity official capacity
Represented By: Carly Davis
Represented By: Russell W. Harter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE DILL, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUTCH KIRVENY, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRED PAYNE, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN VANDERMOSTEN, Interim Assistance County Administrator individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK ROBERT, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENVILLE COUNTY COUNCIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB TAYLOR, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIZ SEMAN, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH KERNELL, Greenville County Administrator individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XANTHENE NORRIS, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIS MEADOWS, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENNIS FANT, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNN BALLARD, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SID CATES, individual capacity official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OLANDIO RAY WORKMAN
Represented By: Olandio Ray Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?