Robert Wazney v. State of South Carolina

Plaintiff / Appellant: ROBERT WILLIAM WAZNEY
Defendant / Appellee: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 19-6084
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed [1000455671] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [7] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Robert Wazney, #363679. Copies to all parties. [19-6084] CT [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:52 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Robert William Wazney. [19-6084] CT [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:48 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Robert William Wazney. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6084] CT [Entered: 02/07/2019 12:53 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 DOCUMENT - Affidavit by Robert Wazney. [1000447253] [19-6084] TW [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:52 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-02610-HMH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6084] CT [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:06 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 02/04/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6084] CT [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:36 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Robert Wazney ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days.. [19-6084] CT [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:35 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/24/2019. [19-6084] CT [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:33 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-02610-HMH. Case manager: CathyHerb. [19-6084] CT [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Wazney v. State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT WILLIAM WAZNEY
Represented By: Robert William Wazney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?