Azaniah Blankumsee v. Donald Beachley

Defendant / Appellee: DAYANA COCORAN, Commissioner, DONALD EUGENE BEACHLEY, JOSEPH MICHAELS, states attorney and LARRY HOGAN, Governor
Plaintiff / Appellant: AZANIAH BLANKUMSEE
Case Number: 19-6096
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed [1000461466] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA. [7] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Azaniah Blankumsee, #326-698. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Azaniah Blankumsee EASTERN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 30420 Revells Neck Road Westover, MD 21890-0000 Warden Attn: Accounting Office EASTERN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 30420 Revells Neck Road Westover, MD 21890-0000. [19-6096] AB [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:30 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by Azaniah Blankumsee. [19-6096] AB [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:23 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Azaniah Blankumsee re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Azaniah Blankumsee EASTERN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 30420 Revells Neck Road Westover, MD 21890-0000. [19-6096] AB [Entered: 02/06/2019 09:01 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Azaniah Blankumsee. Consent to Payment Form: No; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6096] AB [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:44 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Azaniah Blankumsee. [19-6096] AB [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:43 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-03415-PWG. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6096] AB [Entered: 01/23/2019 04:18 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Azaniah Blankumsee EASTERN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 30420 Revells Neck Road Westover, MD 21890-0000. Informal Opening Brief due 02/04/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6096] AB [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:47 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Azaniah Blankumsee ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Azaniah Blankumsee EASTERN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 30420 Revells Neck Road Westover, MD 21890-0000. [19-6096] AB [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:46 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/25/2019. [19-6096] AB [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:44 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-03415-PWG. Case manager: ABrownlee. [19-6096] AB [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azaniah Blankumsee v. Donald Beachley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAYANA COCORAN, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD EUGENE BEACHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH MICHAELS, states attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARRY HOGAN, Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AZANIAH BLANKUMSEE
Represented By: Azaniah Blankumsee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?