Antonio Garibaldi v. Juan Vallasis

Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTONIO C. GARIBALDI
Defendant / Appellee: DR. JUAN VALLASIS, Dentist and DR. JAMES HAYDU, Dentist
Case Number: 19-6098
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-01000-AJT-TCB. Mailed to: Antonio Garibaldi. [19-6098] RE [Entered: 02/25/2019 07:56 AM]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed [1000463497] granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 8 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Antonio Garibaldi. [19-6098] RE [Entered: 02/25/2019 07:54 AM]
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Antonio C. Garibaldi to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [8]. [1000463495] [19-6098] RE [Entered: 02/25/2019 07:53 AM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Antonio C. Garibaldi re: for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Antonio Garibaldi. [19-6098] RE [Entered: 02/13/2019 09:01 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Juan Vallasis. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446725] [19-6098] Grace Morse-McNelis [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:56 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by James Haydu. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446723] [19-6098] Grace Morse-McNelis [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:55 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Grace Morse-McNelis for James Haydu and Juan Vallasis. [1000446715] [19-6098] Grace Morse-McNelis [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:52 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Antonio Garibaldi. Informal Opening Brief due 02/07/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6098] RE [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:30 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Antonio C. Garibaldi ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Antonio Garibaldi. [19-6098] RE [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:28 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-01000-AJT-TCB. Case manager: REdwards. [19-6098] RE [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Garibaldi v. Juan Vallasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONIO C. GARIBALDI
Represented By: Antonio C. Garibaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. JUAN VALLASIS, Dentist
Represented By: Grace Morse-McNelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. JAMES HAYDU, Dentist
Represented By: Grace Morse-McNelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?