Jordan Jones v. George Solomon
Defendant / Appellee: JONNITA BAKER, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, TYLER STOCKTON, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, SCOTTY LOWERY, STEPHEN P. CARPENTER, FRANK L. PERRY, Secretary of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, JOSEPH BUCHANAN, GILBERT LEWIS, JASMINE BELYEU, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, MARK RANDALL GEOUGE, Assistant Unit Manager for Yancey Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, ROBIN HUDGINS, Assistant Unit Manager for Watauga Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, BANKS, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, JEFFREY A. DANIELS, Western Region Security Coordinator of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, BRYAN DALE JOHNSON, Unit Manager for the Watauga Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, GEORGE T. SOLOMON, Director of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, BALL, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, MIKE BALL, Superintendent of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, ADRIAN Z. CROWE, Unit Manager for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, GREGORY P. TAYLOR, Assistant Superintendent for Custody and Operations of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, REENE REEL, Captain designated Officer-in-Charge of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, JOHN DOE, Captian or Lieuteant designated Officer-in-Charge of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, MARTY COOPER, BONDY CARROLL, Correctional Sergeant for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, BRIAN WATSON, Special Affairs Captain of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, CORNETT, Unit Manager for Yancey Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, RANDY S. MULL, Disciplinary Hearing Officer for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, TIM LAUGHRUN, Classification Coordinator of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, WILLIAMS, JASON PENLAND, Assistant Superintendent for Programs of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution, W. DAVID GUICE, Commissioner of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, JAMES C. WALDROOP, Assistant Unit Manager for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution and ELIZABETH D. WALLACE, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Plaintiff / Appellant: JORDAN ANDREW JONES
Case Number: 19-6143
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00089-FDW. Mailed to: Jordan Jones. [19-6143] RE [Entered: 02/11/2019 09:03 AM]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000455071] granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 7 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jordan Jones. [19-6143] RE [Entered: 02/11/2019 09:02 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Jordan Andrew Jones to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [7]. [1000455068] [19-6143] RE [Entered: 02/11/2019 08:59 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) DOCUMENT - notice that letter was incorrectly construed as a notice of appeal by Jordan Andrew Jones. [1000454983] [19-6143--[Edited 02/11/2019 by RE-See ECF no. 7 for motion] RE [Entered: 02/11/2019 07:45 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00089-FDW. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6143] RE [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:13 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jordan Jones. Informal Opening Brief due 02/21/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6143] RE [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:09 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jordan Andrew Jones ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Jordan Jones. [19-6143] RE [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:07 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00089-FDW. Case manager: REdwards. [19-6143] RE [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jordan Jones v. George Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONNITA BAKER, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TYLER STOCKTON, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTTY LOWERY
Represented By: Corrine Lenore Lusic
Represented By: Joseph Finarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN P. CARPENTER
Represented By: Corrine Lenore Lusic
Represented By: Joseph Finarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK L. PERRY, Secretary of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH BUCHANAN
Represented By: Corrine Lenore Lusic
Represented By: Joseph Finarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GILBERT LEWIS
Represented By: Corrine Lenore Lusic
Represented By: Joseph Finarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASMINE BELYEU, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK RANDALL GEOUGE, Assistant Unit Manager for Yancey Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBIN HUDGINS, Assistant Unit Manager for Watauga Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANKS, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY A. DANIELS, Western Region Security Coordinator of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYAN DALE JOHNSON, Unit Manager for the Watauga Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE T. SOLOMON, Director of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BALL, Correctional Officer for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE BALL, Superintendent of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADRIAN Z. CROWE, Unit Manager for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY P. TAYLOR, Assistant Superintendent for Custody and Operations of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REENE REEL, Captain designated Officer-in-Charge of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: Corrine Lenore Lusic
Represented By: Joseph Finarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, Captian or Lieuteant designated Officer-in-Charge of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTY COOPER
Represented By: Corrine Lenore Lusic
Represented By: Joseph Finarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BONDY CARROLL, Correctional Sergeant for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: Corrine Lenore Lusic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN WATSON, Special Affairs Captain of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORNETT, Unit Manager for Yancey Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RANDY S. MULL, Disciplinary Hearing Officer for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Corrine Lenore Lusic
Represented By: Joseph Finarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIM LAUGHRUN, Classification Coordinator of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: Corrine Lenore Lusic
Represented By: Joseph Finarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON PENLAND, Assistant Superintendent for Programs of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Represented By: Corrine Lenore Lusic
Represented By: Joseph Finarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: W. DAVID GUICE, Commissioner of the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES C. WALDROOP, Assistant Unit Manager for the Avery Unit of Avery-Mitchell Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH D. WALLACE, Inmate Grievance Examiner for the North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JORDAN ANDREW JONES
Represented By: Jordan Andrew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?