Steve Chadwick v. Richard Graham, Jr.
Defendant / Appellee: RICHARD J. GRAHAM, JR.
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEVE CARL CHADWICK
Case Number: 19-6870
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 27, 2019 Steve Chadwick v. Richard Graham, Jr.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Steve Carl Chadwick. [19-6870] EB [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:44 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Steve Carl Chadwick to appoint/assign counsel. Date and method of service: 07/18/2018 US mail. [1000550033] [19-6870] EB [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:30 PM]
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed [1000542383] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5]. Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Steve Carl Chadwick, # 348980. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Steve Carl Chadwick; Warden, Attn. Accouting Office, WESTERN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 13800 McMullen Highway, SW Cumberland, MD 21502-2150. [19-6870] EB [Entered: 07/05/2019 03:53 PM]
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000542378] deferring action on Motion to appoint/assign counsel filed by Appellant Steve Carl Chadwick [ # 7 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Steve Carl Chadwick. [19-6870] EB [Entered: 07/05/2019 03:50 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Steve Carl Chadwick to appoint/assign counsel. [1000542377] [19-6870] EB [Entered: 07/05/2019 03:50 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Steve Carl Chadwick. [19-6870] EB [Entered: 07/05/2019 03:49 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Steve Carl Chadwick. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6870] EB [Entered: 07/05/2019 03:49 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Steve Carl Chadwick. Informal Opening Brief due 07/15/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-6870] EB [Entered: 06/20/2019 04:42 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Steve Carl Chadwick ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Steve Carl Chadwick. [19-6870] EB [Entered: 06/20/2019 04:40 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00596-RDB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6870] AB [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:46 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00596-RDB. Case manager: ABrownlee. [19-6870] AB [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steve Chadwick v. Richard Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD J. GRAHAM, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVE CARL CHADWICK
Represented By: Steve Carl Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?