Jerry Welty, Jr. v. Peter Meletis
Defendant: AMANDA LAMBERT, Director of Support Services, AUSTIN B. HAYNES, JR., Citizen at Large, PHILLIP CAMPBELL, Assistant fo the County Executive, TRACY GORDON, Intergovernmental/Legislative Director, PRINCE WILLIAM-MANASAS JAIL BOARD, Oversight, BRIAN FODDRELL, Director of Transition, CAROL MOYE, Director of Financial Services, STEVEN AUSTIN, Director of Office of Criminal Justice Services, SHARON ELIZABETH PANDAK, Attorney at Law, RODERICK OSBORNE, Director of Inmate Services, MICHAEL TAYLOR, Director Classification and Treatmen, DAWN HARMAN, Major, VICTOR RILEY, Citizen at Large, PAUL EBERT, Commonwealth's Attorney, ANTHONY KOSTELECKY, Vice Chairman Citizen at Large, PRINCE WILLIAM-MANASSAS ADULT DETENTION CENTER, MICHELE MCQUIGG, Clerk of the Circuit Court, PAUL F. NICHOLS, Unknown, CLAIBORNE TURNER RICHARDSON, II, Assistant Commonwealth's Attorney, STEPHAN HUDSON, Chief of Police, SUSAN MCMAHON, Director of Administration and HUGH BRIEN, Citizen at Large
Defendant / Appellee: GEORGE HURLOCK, Director of Security, GLENDELL HILL, Chairman and PETER MELETIS, Superintendent
Plaintiff / Appellant: JERRY WELTY, JR.
Case Number: 19-7050
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00659-JAG-RCY. Mailed to: Jerry Welty, Jr.. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:06 PM]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER filed [1000581904] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jerry Welty, Jr.. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:01 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Jerry Welty, Jr. re: for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Jerry Welty, Jr.. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:18 AM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Case reopened.. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00659-JAG-RCY. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:17 AM]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed [1000565507] vacating order dismissing case Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jerry Welty, Jr.. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:25 PM]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000565500] recalling mandate. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jerry Welty, Jr.. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:23 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00659-JAG-RCY. Mailed to: Jerry Welty, Jr.. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:13 PM]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed [1000565466] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jerry Welty, Jr. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:12 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00659-JAG-RCY. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:02 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jerry Welty ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Jerry Welty, Jr.. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:00 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jerry Welty, Jr.. Informal Opening Brief due 08/12/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:58 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00659-JAG-RCY. Case manager: JMoore. [19-7050] JHM [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerry Welty, Jr. v. Peter Meletis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA LAMBERT, Director of Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN B. HAYNES, JR., Citizen at Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP CAMPBELL, Assistant fo the County Executive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY GORDON, Intergovernmental/Legislative Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCE WILLIAM-MANASAS JAIL BOARD, Oversight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN FODDRELL, Director of Transition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL MOYE, Director of Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN AUSTIN, Director of Office of Criminal Justice Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON ELIZABETH PANDAK, Attorney at Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODERICK OSBORNE, Director of Inmate Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL TAYLOR, Director Classification and Treatmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAWN HARMAN, Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR RILEY, Citizen at Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL EBERT, Commonwealth's Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY KOSTELECKY, Vice Chairman Citizen at Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCE WILLIAM-MANASSAS ADULT DETENTION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELE MCQUIGG, Clerk of the Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL F. NICHOLS, Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAIBORNE TURNER RICHARDSON, II, Assistant Commonwealth's Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHAN HUDSON, Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN MCMAHON, Director of Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUGH BRIEN, Citizen at Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE HURLOCK, Director of Security
Represented By: Sharon Elizabeth Pandak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLENDELL HILL, Chairman
Represented By: Sharon Elizabeth Pandak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER MELETIS, Superintendent
Represented By: Sharon Elizabeth Pandak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JERRY WELTY, JR.
Represented By: Jerry Welty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?