Hassan Bah v. William Barr
Respondent: PAUL PERRY, in his official capacity as Superintendent, Caroline Detention Facility
Not Yet Classified: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, KIMBERLY ZANOTTI, in her official capacity as the Washington Field Office Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, HASSAN BAH, WILLIAM P. BARR, in his official capacity as the Attorney General, RONALD D. VITIELLO, in his official capacity as Acting Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement and CHAD WOLF, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Case Number: 19-7653
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 01/23/2020. Response brief due 02/21/2020. Copies to all parties.. [1000651426] [19-7653] MR [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:32 AM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by William P. Barr, Ronald D. Vitiello, Chad Wolf and Kimberly Zanotti to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until February 3, 2020.. Date and method of service: 12/23/2019 ecf. [1000651097] [19-7653] Dhruman Sampat [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:47 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dhruman Y. Sampat for William P. Barr, Ronald D. Vitiello, Chad Wolf and Kimberly Zanotti. [1000633902] [19-7653] Dhruman Sampat [Entered: 11/26/2019 09:47 AM]
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/02/2020. Response Brief due 01/31/2020 [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/22/2019 07:55 AM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKETING STATEMENT by William P. Barr, Ronald D. Vitiello, Chad Wolf and Kimberly Zanotti. [19-7653] Lauren Wetzler [Entered: 11/21/2019 08:28 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lauren A. Wetzler for William P. Barr, Ronald D. Vitiello, Chad Wolf and Kimberly Zanotti. [1000631313] [19-7653] Lauren Wetzler [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:34 PM]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed substituting party Chad Wolf substituted for Kevin K McAleenan Copies to all parties.. [1000629510] [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/20/2019 08:16 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Docket correction requested from Hassan Bah. Re: [ # 5 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. [19-7653] TW [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:46 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) - APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Claudia R. Cubas for Hassan Bah. [1000626824] [19-7653] --[Edited 11/22/2019 by MR] Claudia Cubas [Entered: 11/15/2019 09:54 AM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Hassan Bah. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000624384] [19-7653] Rodney Page [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:28 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rodney F. Page for Hassan Bah. [1000624374] [19-7653] Rodney Page [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:23 PM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1000622037-2 ] habeas immigration case Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00641-TSE-JFA.. [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:32 AM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00641-TSE-JFA. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:31 AM]
November 7, 2019 Habeas corpus immigration case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00641-TSE-JFA. Date notice of appeal filed: 11/04/2019. Case manager: MRadday. [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassan Bah v. William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Andrew Sun Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KIMBERLY ZANOTTI, in her official capacity as the Washington Field Office Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Andrew Sun Han
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dhruman Yogesh Sampat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HASSAN BAH
Represented By: Rodney Fred Page
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WILLIAM P. BARR, in his official capacity as the Attorney General
Represented By: Andrew Sun Han
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dhruman Yogesh Sampat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RONALD D. VITIELLO, in his official capacity as Acting Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Andrew Sun Han
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dhruman Yogesh Sampat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHAD WOLF, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dhruman Yogesh Sampat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PAUL PERRY, in his official capacity as Superintendent, Caroline Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?