Andrew High v. Murphy-Brown, LLC
Plaintiff: ALBERTA BATTS, SETH WALSTON, JR., DON WEBB, FAITH MURPHY, HARVEY TATE, REDEDIETH MORRISSEY, MARTHA JOY MILLER, WALTER GUY ADAMS, DONNIE MESSICK, ISAAC WEBB, PARIS BEST, JOE HERRING, MANDIE KENAN, SALLIE BONEY JOHNSON, WILLIE BURTON, MILDRED KENAN, ADAJIO FAISON, LARRY FAISON, JOE KENAN, CATHY PEARSALL, BETTY COLLIER, MARY KENAN, OLIVIA VANN SMITH, ALLEN T. JOHNSON, ANNIE CARR, GENE PEARSON, JANIE PAYNE, LLOYD BARTON, GLADYS M. WALSTON, MARCUS PETERSON, ANNIE JACOBS, MARGARET WILLIAMS, ERIC HIGH, CARL A. MOYE, ETHEL NEWKIRK, TEVIN NEWKIRK, WARD SCARBOUGH, RICHARD LAVERNE BROWN, NED ROBINSON, JAMES D. HALL, EMMA A. MOYE, RICHARD H. THOMPSON, VIOLA HERRING, NORWOOD PICKETT, ESTELLA WALKER, BETTY JAMES, RAY C. HALL, FRANKEA RASHAWN HALL, WANDA MCGOWAN, GWENDOLYN PICKETT, FOSTINA LISANE COOPER, CLIFFORD NEWKIRK, PAMELA HALL, CARL LEWIS, HOWARD MURPHY, PERRY MILLER, SCOTTY HALL, LEOLA JACOBS, TRACEY SCOTT GODLEY, WILLIAM ROBINSON, VIVIAN FAISON, ALONZO KELLY, JR., JENNIE DAVIS, THURMAN MCAURTHOR JUDGE and JAMES MONTGOMERY, SR.
Plaintiff / Appellee: HATTIE TUCKER, RAQUAN SCARBOROUGH, LILLIE WAYMON, ANDREW LEE BROWN, RANDY ALLEN DAVIS, Executor of the Estate of Jennie Stancil Davis, ELAINE CARLTON, LOIS STEWART BANKS, HELEN C. DOBSON, BRENDA ATKINSON, COLLINS LOPEZ, ANNIE HARPER, KANDACE BLANKS, KENTREL DAVIS, CELESTINE BROWN SMITH, MAYA JUDGE, ELAINE FAISON HUNT, FOSTINA JONES, HERMETTA JUDGE, VICTOR RAYA, ARCHIE WRIGHT, JR., EUNICE ANDERSON, QUINTIN LEE GODLEY, Administrator of the Estate of Tracey S. Godley, ALEX SHARPLESS, IOLA PICKETT HALL, ETHEL DAVIS, KIMBERLY CARR, JAMES ALFRED HENRY, ANTHONY CARLTON, MARGARET GRETA NICHOLSON, CHARLES HERRING, BOBBY JAMES WYCKOFF, SARA LOU BATTS, DAQWAN ROBINSON, LEE ANN WILLIAMS, GEMELL BETHUNE, RUSSELL PICKETT, ETHEL BEST, ROSEMARY BATTS, DORIVAL S. ROCHA, EDNA MURPHY, GORDEN HUMPHREY, GENEVA PICKETT, MICHAEL JOHNSON, WILBERY GARY MURRAY, TAMMAURA MARSHAYE BROWN, LAWRENCE RAWLS, COREY BATTS, JAMES HARPER, JR., JAMES ANTHONY MILLER, DEBORAH GOODMAN TOTTEN, DOROTHY L. HILL, Administratrix of the Estate of Perry Miller, TONY BENNETT, GERALDINE HUMPHREY, EUGENA WARD ELLIS, Administratrix of the Estate of Isaac Shelton Ward, MINNIE BRINSON, ROBERTO MURPHY, DELOIS BETHUNE, BRENDA LEE MURRAY, ROSALIND LEE, JOHN TAYLOR, CARLEEN ROBINSON, Administratrix of the Estate of Ned Robinson, GEORGE F. WILLIAMS, ELISA HESTER, Co-Administrator of the Estate of Joan Scarbough, TONGA BONEY, IVAN DANYELL WILLIAMS, JAMES WILLOUGHBY, SR., EDDIE RAY HALL, EDITH SAUNDERS, LOUISE VERNELL MONROE, Administratrix of the Estate of Billie Monroe, AVERY ADRAYLE WILLIS, JR., ROSALYN MOORE, JEREMIAH MATHEWSON, GREGORY BRINSON, DEBORAH J. MCGEE, IRIS HIGH, GERTIE JACOBS, THURNELL BECTON, Executor of the Estate of Viola Christine Herring, JAMES ATKINSON, ANTONIO KEVIN MCKOY, LITTLE DAVIS, JERRY BONEY, EDWARD MONROE, JOANNE KING, KIRON NEWTON, WILMA HALL, WILLIAM MATHIS, CAROLYN ADAMS, RAEFORD BATTS, TALLEY SAUNDERS, JOYCE MESSICK, RICHARD BLOW, CHERYL FLOWERS, JIMMY CARR, RETHA PICKETT, JAMES DAVIS, SR., MARY TATUM, JOYCE MURPHY, Administrator of the Estate of Howard Lee Murphy, RONALD MATTHEWS, VONNIE WILLIAMS, HARRY EDWARD KENAN, Co-Administrator of the Estate of Mildred Kenan, LOTTIE FOWLER, KIM NEWTON, ERNESTINE SAVAGE, DENNIS BURTON, SANDRA KEMP, Administrator of the Estate of Charles Monroe, ALLEN A. JOHNSON, LINDA GIRLEY, PATRICIA MONTGOMERY, EVELYN BONEY JAMES, JACQUELINE DAVIS, COUNCIL GLASPIE, ANNIE HAYES, ANNIE DORIS JOHNSON, as Administratrix of the Estate of Allen Thomas Johnson, SARAH ANN PICKETT, BELVERIA ANN WEBB, LITTLE WORRELL, JAMES WHITLEY, JR., JARMAR TREMAINE MONROE, SAMUEL DEVON MONROE, BRIAN PICKETT, ANGELA HIGH, LINNILL FARLAND, SR., MARGARET STEWART ADAMS, SHEILA MURPHY, CASANDRA MONROE MURCHISON, SALISA BEST, RITA MONROE, PHYLLIS WRIGHT, CYNTHIA HIGH, QUEENIE ELIZABETH ROSE, SHARON ROBINSON, JERRY MCCLARIN, SR., JESSIE LISANE, JR., GREGORY PETERSON, BARBARA MCKOY JAMISON, SUSAN WEBB, Administratrix of the Estate of Don Webb, SHIRLEY TEMPLE KELLY, MYRON JUDGE, LORETTA MILLER, Administrator of the Estate of Rededieth M. Morrisey, TERRY TERRELLE WILLIAMS, FREDERICK PICKETT, TRACY SHAMEKA CROMARTIE, WILMA DIANA JARMAN EVANS, ANNIE HERRING, JERRY SLOAN, MELVIN LASHLEY, DIANE ARTIS, JULAINE BENNERMAN, CAROLYN ANN GLASPER, DAISY WILLIAMS, MAXINE SPENCER, ADELE WHITEHEAD JONES, PAMELA KAYE MCMILLON, DELOIS LEWIS, MARY E. ADAMS, EDWARD INGRAM, LAKECHIA TURNER, WOODY GILLIS, As Executor of the Estate of Gwendolyn Gail Pickett, JEFFERY LANIER, CARTHA WILLIAMS, ARTIS HALL, LINDA WILLIAMS, LUKE DAVIS, MICHAEL SCARBOUGH, Co-Administrator of the Estate of Joan Scarbough, Executor of the Estate of Ward Scarbough, MICHELLE GARNER, FRANCIS CHERYL HALL, DARLENE FOWLER MAYNOR, TERRA KENAN, PERCY GIRLEY, CAROLYN DAVIS, KATRINA HARVEY, JAMES JACOBS, ANNETTE MCKIVER, SHARADE DAVIS, JOYCE HERRING ROBERTS, REGINA EVERETT, Administrator of the Estate of Walter Guy Adams, MARY LORENA WILLIAMS, TONY ORLANDO HALL, JOYCE MURPHY, DENZEL HERRING, ERVIN M. MURRAY, EDNA WALKER, JAMES D. BOWEN, JR., BETTY JEAN SLOAN, RAYMOND BATTS, CYNTHIA LORETTA DIXON HALL, JAMES ARLANDA PICKETT, PEGGY ARDEAN FENNELL, LINDA EVANS, HARRY MURPHY, LORETTA BYRD, Administrator of the Estate of Lawrence Rawls, PANZYTA KENAN, Co-Administrator of the Estate of Mildred Kenan, LAETITIA LISANE CHELTENHAM, Administratrix of the Estate of Fostina Lisane Cooper, JANNETT BUSH, WILLIE MESSICK, DELPHINE MURRAY WILLIAMS, BRUCE HALL, LUADA PATRICK, Co-Administrator of the Estate of William Louis Robinson, GEORGE ALTON MARTIN, HELEN MCKOY BANKS, JACQUELINE MCCALOP LISANE, DEBBIE MELVIN, JOYCE ANN HARDISON, RUDOLPH ADAMS, JAMES LASHLEY, ANDREW JAMES, Administrator of the Estate of Betty Ann Smith James, JENNIFER HERRING, THURMON MONROE, SR., RACHELLA DOBSON, WOODELL MCGOWAN, Individually and as executor of the estate of Wanda McGowan, NICHOLAS WOODARD, SR., CASSANDRA CHASTEN, ESTATE OF IDA CROMARTIE, EVELYN WOODARD, BRIONNA MCKIVER, PRISCILLA DUNHAM, EMMA LOU KING COLLINS, NOVA WILLIAMS, MINDY PIERCE, TAMMY MONROE, GLENDA BARTON, ANDREW HIGH, BARRY HENRY, DOMINIQUE WOODARD, DANIEL WILLIAMS, JAMES HOLMES, SHARON E. KIRK, ROBERT BETHUNE, MARVIN GAY PICKETT, WILLIAM MURPHY, PEGGY CARR FENNELL, Co-Administratrix of the Estate of Annie Laura Rochelle Carr, TITUS HIGH, GABRIELLA RAYA, ELOUISE ALLEN, BETTY BAKER, KATIE JOYNER, JACQUALINE NEWKIRK, VICTORIA HALL, LAVERNE FULLWOOD, DARIEN JEROME MURPHY, SR., BEN ARTIS, JOHN BAKER, LLOYD DAVIS, RONALD LEE BAKER, APRIL SANTRICE MURRAY, DENNIS MCKIVER, JR., THURMAN MCAURTHOR JUDGE, Individually and as administrator of the Estate of Thurman Judge, CAROLYN HALL, BARBARA GIBBS, PATRICIA MELVIN PRATT, JOHN BANNERMAN, EVANGELINE KENAN, VIRGINIA BOONE, WALTER PICKETT, CAROLYN MATHIS, SHANITA L. HENRY, PANZYTA KENAN, WANDA CARLTON DIXON, RHODA CAMPBELL, JANICE PICKETT, MINNIE MAE PRICE, MARILYN MATTHEWS, MELISSA GLASPIE, GLENN FAISON, JOHN HOCKADAY, JACQUELINE HIGH, JOYCE MCKIVER, SANDRA C. BETHUNE, JOHN LASHLEY, JERRY FENNELL, SR., JESSIE BRINSON, ALMA SHARPLESS, LEDESMOND HIGH, DOUGLAS MATHIS, THELMA JEANETTE WYCKOFF, MARY W. JONES, DAVID MCCLEARY JARMAN, PRECIOUS L. SMITH, LEROY BROADIE, KENNETH CARTER, TIMOTHY MORRISSEY, DWIGHT DELANE DIXON, RACHEL SCARBOROUGH, CLARENCE BANNERMAN, BELINDA DEBORAH BOONE, MEKONNE SHONTE SWANN, LAWANDRA DINAH MCKOY, PHYLLIS MONTE ADAMS, DARLENE JONES, KELLY PEARSON, WILLIE THOMAS WILLIAMS, LAURA PICKETT, JOYCE ANN GLASPIE, LAKESHA T. KELLY, Administrator of the Estate of Alonzo Junior Kelly, SABENA CARTER, JOSEPH DEAN PICKETT, LENORA NICHOLSON, CYRIL HARRINGTON, JAMES HENRY ROSE, ADLENE HERRING, JIMMY WAYMON, JAMES LINWOOD MONTGOMERY, JR., Administrator of the Estate of James Linwood Montgomery, Sr., JONATHAN MATTHEWS, JR., CONNIE NEWTON, WILBERT CARR, FELICIA BANNERMAN, DANIEL I. MILLER, Administrator for the Estate of Perry Miller, GERALDINE BURTON, ANNA MORRISEY, MARY E. UNDERWOOD, ISOLENE SCARBOROUGH, OSHONIA SHERYL MILLER, ALICE HIGH, OLIVIA RAYA, PATRICK H. CROMARTIE, JR., DORIS CHASTEN, RICHARD PRATT, TRUMILLA MCCLARIN, DAISY LLOYD, CHARLES MONROE, MASTER BLANKS, CALVIN MELVIN, Administrator of the Estate of Margaret Marine Williams, DAISY J. FENNELL, AARON SMITH, ANNIE L. MONROE, SUSAN MATHEWSON, CHARLES M. SLADE, JR., Administrator of the Estate of Larry Wayne Smith, Administrator of the Estate of Eric Antonio High, CAROLYN CARR WALKER, Co-Administratrix of the Estate of Annie Laura Rochelle Carr, GREGORY COLLINS HALL, EDNA ALLISON, ROBERT CARTER, FLORA HALL, ANN FRANCES BROWN, ETHEL LEE HALL, ELVIS WILLIAMS, SHATINAH WOODARD, SHIRLYNN BLOW, JERRY C. COLLIER, Executor of the Estate of Bettie C. Collier, JOE TERRANO KELLY, DAVID EARL MURRAY, LOWINELYN MCGEE, ANNJEANETTE GILLIS, As Executor of the Estate of Gwendolyn Gail Pickett, THELMA MATHIS, ELSIE HOCKADAY, GREGORY CARR, VIOLET BRANCH, LENORA HOLMES, SHEENA CROMARTIE, LANNIE FAYE PICKETT, ANNIE RAWLS, DONALD DAVID CARR, CELESTINE BROWN SMITH, Administrator of the Estate of Richard Laverne Brown, JAMES DAVIS, JR., FREEMAN SEALEY, ANTONIO WILLIAMS, SR., JOHN DEE FAISON, LOU FRANCES HERRING, ROSIE WILLOUGHBY, HERBERT MILLER, JOE E. POWELL, JR., PAULINE HILL, JENNIFER MARLENA CROMARTIE, CHARLES WADE, BERNITA FAISON, TERESA LLOYD, ROSA SMITH, DEBORAH MONROE, EDWARD OWENS, KATIE MORRISEY BRUNSON, NICHOLAS BLANKS, NOTIS HOLT, MICHAEL ALLEN, BUDDY JOYNER, OLIVER MURPHY, GEORGE ESTER FENNELL, EMERY P. DALESIO, TIARA MONET FENNELL, BOBBY KING, ROBERT CARR, ANNETTE M. WILLIAMS, ANNIE WASHINGTON, WILLIE JAMES MURCHISON, EDITH PEARSON, Executor of the Estate of Gene Pearson, BILLIE MONROE, WILLIE KEA, JR., FELICIA JOHNSON, DETRIA BATTS, HARRY EDWARD KENAN, LATONYA CARTER, JULIE DAVIS, RANDY DAVIS, ALEXANDRIA MCKOY, JEDIAEL LEAK, ANTHONY ROBINSON, LUCY SIDBERRY, DENNIS BEST, RICKY LEE GRAY, SONDRA MARSHELL MARTIN, LAJUNE JESSUP, ELSIE HERRING, ADLENE HERRING, Administrator of the Estate of Joe Herring, NORWOOD ALDERMAN, MARVIN DEVON MCKOY, TONY FARRIOR, JOHN EVERETT, GEORGE ESTER FENNELL, Administrator of the Estate of Jerry Franklin Fennell, Jr., DANIELLE MARIE HARRINGTON, SHIRLEY WILLIAMS, KAREN MCKIVER, THERESA J. MILLER, Executrix of the Estate of Martha Joy Miller, RICHARD WILLIAMS, SHANNON ADAMS, PERRY PICKETT, EVETT PICKETT, OLLIE BURTON, Personal Representative of the Estate of Willie J. Burton, BRENDA GARNER BING, AARON WESLEY HALL, on his own behalf and as Guardian of Scotty Hall, James Dudley Hall, and Pamela Hall, JAMES ALFRED HENRY, JR., LEMUEL PRICE, MAE MAZYCK, HERMAN STEVEN WILLIAMS, GEORGIA FARLAND, DEBORAH R. WOLFE, LATORIA MARIE JOHNSON, HARRY LEE SMITH, WINFRED DOUGLASS CHASTEN, MANUEL RAYA, RENE MILLER, NYIESHA KIERRA MURCHISON, EDDIE NICHOLSON, KECIA FARRIOR, JACQUELINE G. HILL, DWAYNE BOWEN, LINDSAY COUNCIL HALL, LORRINE ROBINSON, ALMA S. ROCHA, DWIGHT CARR, NATASHA JUDGE, MACKIE BAKER, ERMA JEAN MILES, EDNA ALLISON, Executor of the Estate of Leola Jacobs, BOBBY MONROE, DEBORAH JOHNSON, JIMMIE SAVAGE, GWENDOLYN HIGH, BETTY WILLIAMS, EMMETT HALL, PATRICIA PARKER PICKETT, RITA BONEY BUTLER, CAROLYN MCKOY WRIGHT, JOYCE ROBERTS HERRING, TANNER PIERCE, ROBERT PICKETT, FREDERICK LLOYD, EDYTHE BROWN, CLEVELAND ADOLPH MONROE, ALISA BRINSON, DOROTHY MATHIS, CAROLYN B. CARR, LULAR FRANCIS WILLIAMS, KEVIN PIERCE, MARILYN ALDERMAN, BOBBY FARRON MONROE, JR., MARILYN O. HALL, Co-Administratrix of the Estate of Ray Cornelius Hall, JAMES DOBSON, MARY P. WADE, TAMMY LLOYD, KELLY BEST, EDITH PEARSON, DEBORAH PETERSON, CLARA MILLER, GEORGE PICKETT, TANECHIA LLOYD, DREAMA CARTER, ELVERETT HALL, JUDITH WORRELL, WILLIAM ROBINSON, JR., Co-Administrator of the Estate of William Louis Robinson, DOROTHY JACKSON, ANTWAN HIGH, DAVID CARTER and DAPHNE MCKOY
Defendant / Appellant: MURPHY-BROWN, LLC
Case Number: 20-1150
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/15/2020. Response brief due 07/15/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000710566] [20-1150] DL [Entered: 03/27/2020 10:04 AM]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/21/2020. Response brief due 05/21/2020 Copies to all parties. [1000700254] [20-1150] AW [Entered: 03/11/2020 03:17 PM]
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1150] LHP [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:04 AM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/08/2020. Response Brief due 05/08/2020 [20-1150] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 07:23 AM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Andrew High. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000692279] [20-1150] Mona Wallace [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:25 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Murphy-Brown, LLC. [20-1150] Tennille Checkovich [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:38 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Murphy-Brown, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000692197] [20-1150] Tennille Checkovich [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:18 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael W. Stark for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000692189] [20-1150] Michael Stark [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:11 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tennille J. Checkovich for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000692183] [20-1150] Tennille Checkovich [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:08 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mona Lisa Wallace for Andrew High. [1000692049] [20-1150] Mona Wallace [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:45 AM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John S. Hughes for Andrew High. [1000692044] [20-1150] Mona Wallace [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:44 AM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tillman J. Breckenridge for Joyce McKiver, Delois Lewis, Daphne McKoy, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Archie Wright, Jr., Tammy Lloyd, Deborah Johnson, Priscilla Dunham and Ethel Davis. [1000691772] [20-1150] Tillman Breckenridge [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:08 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:15-cv-00013-BR. [20-1150] KH [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:00 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:15-cv-00013-BR. Case manager: KHancock. [20-1150] KH [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Andrew High v. Murphy-Brown, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HATTIE TUCKER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAQUAN SCARBOROUGH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LILLIE WAYMON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDREW LEE BROWN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RANDY ALLEN DAVIS, Executor of the Estate of Jennie Stancil Davis
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELAINE CARLTON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LOIS STEWART BANKS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HELEN C. DOBSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRENDA ATKINSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COLLINS LOPEZ
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNIE HARPER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KANDACE BLANKS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENTREL DAVIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CELESTINE BROWN SMITH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MAYA JUDGE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELAINE FAISON HUNT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FOSTINA JONES
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HERMETTA JUDGE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VICTOR RAYA
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARCHIE WRIGHT, JR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EUNICE ANDERSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: QUINTIN LEE GODLEY, Administrator of the Estate of Tracey S. Godley
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALEX SHARPLESS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IOLA PICKETT HALL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ETHEL DAVIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KIMBERLY CARR
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES ALFRED HENRY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANTHONY CARLTON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARGARET GRETA NICHOLSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES HERRING
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BOBBY JAMES WYCKOFF
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARA LOU BATTS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAQWAN ROBINSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEE ANN WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEMELL BETHUNE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RUSSELL PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ETHEL BEST
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSEMARY BATTS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DORIVAL S. ROCHA
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDNA MURPHY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GORDEN HUMPHREY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GENEVA PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL JOHNSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILBERY GARY MURRAY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TAMMAURA MARSHAYE BROWN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAWRENCE RAWLS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COREY BATTS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES HARPER, JR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES ANTHONY MILLER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEBORAH GOODMAN TOTTEN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOROTHY L. HILL, Administratrix of the Estate of Perry Miller
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TONY BENNETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GERALDINE HUMPHREY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EUGENA WARD ELLIS, Administratrix of the Estate of Isaac Shelton Ward
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MINNIE BRINSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERTO MURPHY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DELOIS BETHUNE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRENDA LEE MURRAY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSALIND LEE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN TAYLOR
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARLEEN ROBINSON, Administratrix of the Estate of Ned Robinson
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEORGE F. WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELISA HESTER, Co-Administrator of the Estate of Joan Scarbough
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TONGA BONEY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IVAN DANYELL WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES WILLOUGHBY, SR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDDIE RAY HALL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDITH SAUNDERS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LOUISE VERNELL MONROE, Administratrix of the Estate of Billie Monroe
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AVERY ADRAYLE WILLIS, JR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSALYN MOORE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEREMIAH MATHEWSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREGORY BRINSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEBORAH J. MCGEE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IRIS HIGH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GERTIE JACOBS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THURNELL BECTON, Executor of the Estate of Viola Christine Herring
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES ATKINSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANTONIO KEVIN MCKOY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LITTLE DAVIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JERRY BONEY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDWARD MONROE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOANNE KING
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KIRON NEWTON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILMA HALL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM MATHIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROLYN ADAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAEFORD BATTS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TALLEY SAUNDERS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOYCE MESSICK
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD BLOW
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHERYL FLOWERS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JIMMY CARR
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RETHA PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES DAVIS, SR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY TATUM
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOYCE MURPHY, Administrator of the Estate of Howard Lee Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RONALD MATTHEWS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VONNIE WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARRY EDWARD KENAN, Co-Administrator of the Estate of Mildred Kenan
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LOTTIE FOWLER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KIM NEWTON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERNESTINE SAVAGE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DENNIS BURTON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SANDRA KEMP, Administrator of the Estate of Charles Monroe
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALLEN A. JOHNSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LINDA GIRLEY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATRICIA MONTGOMERY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EVELYN BONEY JAMES
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACQUELINE DAVIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNCIL GLASPIE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNIE HAYES
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNIE DORIS JOHNSON, as Administratrix of the Estate of Allen Thomas Johnson
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARAH ANN PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BELVERIA ANN WEBB
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LITTLE WORRELL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES WHITLEY, JR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JARMAR TREMAINE MONROE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SAMUEL DEVON MONROE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRIAN PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANGELA HIGH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LINNILL FARLAND, SR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARGARET STEWART ADAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHEILA MURPHY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CASANDRA MONROE MURCHISON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SALISA BEST
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RITA MONROE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PHYLLIS WRIGHT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CYNTHIA HIGH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: QUEENIE ELIZABETH ROSE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHARON ROBINSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JERRY MCCLARIN, SR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JESSIE LISANE, JR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREGORY PETERSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BARBARA MCKOY JAMISON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUSAN WEBB, Administratrix of the Estate of Don Webb
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHIRLEY TEMPLE KELLY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MYRON JUDGE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LORETTA MILLER, Administrator of the Estate of Rededieth M. Morrisey
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TERRY TERRELLE WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FREDERICK PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRACY SHAMEKA CROMARTIE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILMA DIANA JARMAN EVANS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNIE HERRING
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JERRY SLOAN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELVIN LASHLEY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIANE ARTIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JULAINE BENNERMAN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROLYN ANN GLASPER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAISY WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MAXINE SPENCER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ADELE WHITEHEAD JONES
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAMELA KAYE MCMILLON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DELOIS LEWIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY E. ADAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDWARD INGRAM
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAKECHIA TURNER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WOODY GILLIS, As Executor of the Estate of Gwendolyn Gail Pickett
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEFFERY LANIER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARTHA WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARTIS HALL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LINDA WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUKE DAVIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL SCARBOUGH, Co-Administrator of the Estate of Joan Scarbough, Executor of the Estate of Ward Scarbough
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHELLE GARNER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRANCIS CHERYL HALL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DARLENE FOWLER MAYNOR
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TERRA KENAN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PERCY GIRLEY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROLYN DAVIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KATRINA HARVEY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES JACOBS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNETTE MCKIVER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHARADE DAVIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOYCE HERRING ROBERTS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: REGINA EVERETT, Administrator of the Estate of Walter Guy Adams
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY LORENA WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TONY ORLANDO HALL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOYCE MURPHY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DENZEL HERRING
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERVIN M. MURRAY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDNA WALKER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES D. BOWEN, JR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BETTY JEAN SLOAN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAYMOND BATTS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CYNTHIA LORETTA DIXON HALL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES ARLANDA PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PEGGY ARDEAN FENNELL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LINDA EVANS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARRY MURPHY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LORETTA BYRD, Administrator of the Estate of Lawrence Rawls
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PANZYTA KENAN, Co-Administrator of the Estate of Mildred Kenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAETITIA LISANE CHELTENHAM, Administratrix of the Estate of Fostina Lisane Cooper
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANNETT BUSH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIE MESSICK
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DELPHINE MURRAY WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRUCE HALL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUADA PATRICK, Co-Administrator of the Estate of William Louis Robinson
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEORGE ALTON MARTIN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HELEN MCKOY BANKS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACQUELINE MCCALOP LISANE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEBBIE MELVIN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOYCE ANN HARDISON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RUDOLPH ADAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES LASHLEY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDREW JAMES, Administrator of the Estate of Betty Ann Smith James
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JENNIFER HERRING
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THURMON MONROE, SR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RACHELLA DOBSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WOODELL MCGOWAN, Individually and as executor of the estate of Wanda McGowan
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NICHOLAS WOODARD, SR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CASSANDRA CHASTEN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ESTATE OF IDA CROMARTIE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EVELYN WOODARD
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRIONNA MCKIVER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PRISCILLA DUNHAM
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMMA LOU KING COLLINS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NOVA WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MINDY PIERCE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TAMMY MONROE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GLENDA BARTON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDREW HIGH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BARRY HENRY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOMINIQUE WOODARD
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANIEL WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES HOLMES
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHARON E. KIRK
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT BETHUNE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARVIN GAY PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM MURPHY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PEGGY CARR FENNELL, Co-Administratrix of the Estate of Annie Laura Rochelle Carr
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TITUS HIGH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GABRIELLA RAYA
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELOUISE ALLEN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BETTY BAKER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KATIE JOYNER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACQUALINE NEWKIRK
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VICTORIA HALL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAVERNE FULLWOOD
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DARIEN JEROME MURPHY, SR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BEN ARTIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN BAKER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LLOYD DAVIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RONALD LEE BAKER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: APRIL SANTRICE MURRAY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DENNIS MCKIVER, JR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THURMAN MCAURTHOR JUDGE, Individually and as administrator of the Estate of Thurman Judge
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROLYN HALL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BARBARA GIBBS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATRICIA MELVIN PRATT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN BANNERMAN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EVANGELINE KENAN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VIRGINIA BOONE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WALTER PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROLYN MATHIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHANITA L. HENRY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PANZYTA KENAN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WANDA CARLTON DIXON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RHODA CAMPBELL
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANICE PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MINNIE MAE PRICE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARILYN MATTHEWS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELISSA GLASPIE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GLENN FAISON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN HOCKADAY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACQUELINE HIGH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOYCE MCKIVER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Represented By: Tillman J. Breckenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SANDRA C. BETHUNE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN LASHLEY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JERRY FENNELL, SR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JESSIE BRINSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALMA SHARPLESS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEDESMOND HIGH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOUGLAS MATHIS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THELMA JEANETTE WYCKOFF
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY W. JONES
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID MCCLEARY JARMAN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PRECIOUS L. SMITH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEROY BROADIE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENNETH CARTER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TIMOTHY MORRISSEY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DWIGHT DELANE DIXON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RACHEL SCARBOROUGH
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLARENCE BANNERMAN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BELINDA DEBORAH BOONE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MEKONNE SHONTE SWANN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAWANDRA DINAH MCKOY
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PHYLLIS MONTE ADAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DARLENE JONES
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KELLY PEARSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIE THOMAS WILLIAMS
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAURA PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOYCE ANN GLASPIE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAKESHA T. KELLY, Administrator of the Estate of Alonzo Junior Kelly
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SABENA CARTER
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSEPH DEAN PICKETT
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LENORA NICHOLSON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CYRIL HARRINGTON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES HENRY ROSE
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ADLENE HERRING
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JIMMY WAYMON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES LINWOOD MONTGOMERY, JR., Administrator of the Estate of James Linwood Montgomery, Sr.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JONATHAN MATTHEWS, JR.
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CONNIE NEWTON
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILBERT CARR
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FELICIA BANNERMAN
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANIEL I. MILLER, Administrator for the Estate of Perry Miller
Represented By: John S. Hughes Esq.