Jacqueline Minifield v. Stephanie Sills
Defendant: FRED ROWE, JOHN DEFILIPPI, A. J. CAVE, RICHARD BOYD, MICHAEL BRUNSON, MICHAEL UPHAM, C. E. POST, ANNA SHELTON, KELLY RICE, ANDREA ENKE, M. A. LANHAM, MICHAEL ACKERMAN, JOHN & JANE DOES, in their individual capacity, KRISTEN BRADFORD, ERIC DEEL, RICHARD HANKINS, TRAVIS MEDINA, ALAN WORSHAM, EDEN FREEMAN, KEVIN SANZENBACHER, CRAIG SMITH, KIMBERLY E. BRUNSON, as admin of the estate of Michael Brunson, KIMBERLY E. BRUNSON, CITY OF WINCHESTER, FRANK MYRTLE, KEVIN NEWLAND, CHRISTOPHER IVINS, JOSIAH SHIAVONE, DERICK LEE SEWELL, DOUGLAS ADAMS, G. F. MACHER, MARTY HARVEY, BRIAN KING and GARY WILSON
Defendant / Appellant: STEPHANIE SILLS
Plaintiff / Appellee: JACQUELINE Y. MINIFIELD, as Administrator and Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF D'LONDRE MINIFIELD and In her Individual Capacity
Case Number: 20-1301
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER filed deferring action on Motion for summary disposition filed by Appellee Jacqueline Y. Minifield [ # 17 ] Copies to all parties. [1000736830] [20-1301] KH [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:15 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Stephanie Sills to notice requesting response [ # 18 ], Motion [ # 17 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 05/11/2020 10:15 AM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 23 Corrected JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Stephanie Sills. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. [1000734622] [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:27 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 22 Corrected JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Stephanie Sills. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. [1000734615] [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:25 PM]
May 4, 2020 Filing 21 Docket correction requested from Stephanie Sills. Re: [ # 20 ] appendix. Access to appendix has been restricted to case participants. [20-1301] KH [Entered: 05/04/2020 02:51 PM]
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Stephanie Sills. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. [1000732807] [20-1301]--[Edited 05/07/2020 by KH- See ECF 22 & 23] Julia Judkins [Entered: 05/04/2020 01:00 PM]
May 4, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF by Stephanie Sills in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000732801] [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 05/04/2020 12:55 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE ISSUED to Stephanie Sills requesting response to Motion for summary disposition [ # 17 ] Response due 05/11/2020.[1000730855]. [20-1301] KH [Entered: 04/30/2020 09:09 AM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 Corrected MOTION by Jacqueline Y. Minifield for summary disposition. Date and method of service: 04/29/2020 ecf. [1000730701] [20-1301] Christopher Brown [Entered: 04/29/2020 10:47 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 16 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Jacqueline Y. Minifield for summary disposition. Date and method of service: 04/28/2020 ecf. [1000730696] [20-1301]--[Edited 04/30/2020 by KH-See ECF 17] Christopher Brown [Entered: 04/29/2020 09:14 PM]
April 18, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jacqueline Y. Minifield. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000723813] [20-1301] Christopher Brown [Entered: 04/18/2020 09:39 AM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stephanie Sills. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000723591] [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:39 PM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Stephanie Sills and Jacqueline Y. Minifield re: filing of disclosure form. Disclosure statement due from Jacqueline Y. Minifield and Stephanie Sills on 04/20/2020. [20-1301] KH [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:01 PM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher E. Brown for Jacqueline Y. Minifield. [1000722911] [20-1301] Christopher Brown [Entered: 04/16/2020 04:09 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 Joint appendix designations by Stephanie Sills Is statement of issues included? Yes [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 04/06/2020 03:04 PM]
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER filed. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/04/2020. Response Brief due 06/03/2020 [20-1301] DL [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:26 PM]
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Withdraw of Docs 6 and 7 - Transcript Order by Stephanie Sills. [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 03/23/2020 10:05 AM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 Docket correction requested from Stephanie Sills. Re: [ # 7 ] transcript order, [ # 6 ] transcript order. Access to transcript order, transcript order has been restricted to case participants. [20-1301] KH [Entered: 03/19/2020 03:42 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Corrected TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Stephanie Sills for. [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 03/18/2020 01:21 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 Corrected TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Stephanie Sills for. [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 03/18/2020 01:20 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Docket correction requested from Stephanie Sills. Correction due: 03/23/2020. [20-1301] KH [Entered: 03/18/2020 01:12 PM]
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Stephanie Sills. [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:40 PM]
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Julia B. Judkins for Stephanie Sills. [1000703948] [20-1301] Julia Judkins [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:33 PM]
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00043-MFU-JCH. [20-1301] KH [Entered: 03/16/2020 02:45 PM]
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00043-MFU-JCH. Case manager: KHancock. [20-1301] KH [Entered: 03/16/2020 02:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jacqueline Minifield v. Stephanie Sills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRED ROWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DEFILIPPI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. J. CAVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BRUNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL UPHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. E. POST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNA SHELTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY RICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA ENKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. A. LANHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL ACKERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN & JANE DOES, in their individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTEN BRADFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC DEEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD HANKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS MEDINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN WORSHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDEN FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN SANZENBACHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY E. BRUNSON, as admin of the estate of Michael Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY E. BRUNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF WINCHESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK MYRTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN NEWLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER IVINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSIAH SHIAVONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DERICK LEE SEWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. F. MACHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTY HARVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEPHANIE SILLS
Represented By: Julia Bougie Judkins Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACQUELINE Y. MINIFIELD, as Administrator and Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF D'LONDRE MINIFIELD and In her Individual Capacity
Represented By: Bradley Glenn Pollack
Represented By: Christopher Edwin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?