Davetta Range v. Jeff Bezos
Defendant / Appellee: BILL MONTGOMERY, Maricopa County Attorney/Owns TP USA, BLACK LIVES MATTER TORONTO, TURNING POINT USA, BONNIE JANETT, NFL, Intellectual Property Counsel, OPEN SOCIETY FDD, SUSAN F. GREY, Rev, Dr, President, JEFF PASH, Intellectual Property Counsel, US COMMERCE DEPT MBDA, President Henry Childs II, BLACK LIVES MATTER NETWORK INC, Corporation ? Corporation Trust Center, MELANIE CAMPBELLE, President, JOHN C. STOCKS, Chair of Board Open Society & NEA President, BLACK LIVES MATTER VT LTD, FACEBOOK, INC., TONY LEE, Rev, Pastor, PAUL SENNOTT, Attorney, Trademark Petitioners (unauthorized), STEVE LINICK, OIG, Office of the Inspector General State Dept, ROBERT C. SCOTT, Home Education (Dept-Committee Chair), RICHARD GERGEL, Judge & Speaker at Aspen Ideas, BLACK LIVES MATTER FOUNDATION, BLACK LIVES MATTER VANCOUVER, PATRICK GASPARD, President of the Open Society Foundation, UUA CHURCH, DATA FOR BLACK LIVES, JOHN PODESTA, Cap, NEW YORK BLACK LIVES MATTER INC, REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA LOS ANGELES & OAKLAND, AME CHURCH, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, MBDA GRANT RECEIVERS (BLMLA), COLOR OF CHANGE, ACT BLUE PAC, ETHAN FORREST, Attorney, WIKIPEDIA, ANDREI IANCU, Under Secy of Commerce USPTO, BLACK LIVES MATTER GREATER ATLANTA, NCBCP, GEORGE SOROS, Owner of the Open Society Foundation, AMAZON JEFF BEZOS, JOHN ZAVEZ, Client, Trademark Petitioners (unauthorized), JUDGE BRIAN A. JACKSON, Judge who threw out a BLM case, NEA, MARK RIDLEY THOMAS, Supv, APRIL GOGGINS, (unauthorized), Fraud Pirate, BlackLivesMatterDMV.org, TWITTER, INCORPORATED, STENY H. HOYER, House Majority Leader- Deomocratic Party and DCRA DEPT OF CONSUMER & REG AFFAIRS, EIN Registrat for DC Govt
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVETTA LYNN RANGE
Case Number: 20-1349
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ] Number of days granted: 21. Informal Opening Brief due 06/11/2020; denying Motion to proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice [10]. Fee/IFP/CJA 23 due 06/11/2020 Copies to all parties.. [1000743362] [20-1345, 20-1349] MR [Entered: 05/21/2020 12:48 PM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to [10] Motion to proceed in forma pauperis by Davetta Lynn Range in 20-1345, 20-1349. [1000742387] [20-1345, 20-1349] MR [Entered: 05/20/2020 12:31 PM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Davetta Lynn Range in 20-1345, 20-1349 to extend filing time for informal opening brief until (no date certain or number of days specified).. Date and method of service: 05/20/2020 ecf. [1000742358] [20-1345, 20-1349] MR [Entered: 05/20/2020 11:43 AM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Davetta Lynn Range in 20-1345. [20-1345, 20-1349] MR [Entered: 05/20/2020 11:41 AM]
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Davetta Lynn Range in 20-1345, 20-1349 re: failure to satisfy fee and informal briefing requirements Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days.. [20-1345, 20-1349] MR [Entered: 05/04/2020 09:11 AM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 DOCUMENTS referencing [ # 1000707875-2 ] case , [ # 1 ] case by Davetta Lynn Range in 20-1345, 20-1349. [1000716276] [20-1345, 20-1349] MR [Entered: 04/07/2020 08:38 AM]
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT referencing [ # 1000707875-2 ] case , [ # 1 ] case by Davetta Lynn Range in 20-1345, 20-1349. [1000715207] [20-1345, 20-1349] (note: document e-mailed to district court and forwarded to 4CCA) MR [Entered: 04/06/2020 07:56 AM]
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01647-CMH-IDD. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-1349] MR [Entered: 03/25/2020 10:14 AM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 RECORDS requested from Clerk of Court in 20-1345, 20-1349. Due: 04/07/2020. [20-1345, 20-1349] MR [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:28 AM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 04/17/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1345, 20-1349] MR [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:23 AM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 FEE NOTICE issued to Davetta Lynn Range in 20-1345, 20-1349 - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 04/23/2020 Originating case number: 1:20-cv-00123-CMH-IDD.. [20-1345, 20-1349] MR [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:21 AM]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1349 with 20-1345.. Copies to all parties.. [1000708155] [20-1345, 20-1349] MR [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:17 AM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01647-CMH-IDD. Case manager: MRadday. [20-1349] MR [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Davetta Range v. Jeff Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL MONTGOMERY, Maricopa County Attorney/Owns TP USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLACK LIVES MATTER TORONTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TURNING POINT USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BONNIE JANETT, NFL, Intellectual Property Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OPEN SOCIETY FDD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN F. GREY, Rev, Dr, President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFF PASH, Intellectual Property Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US COMMERCE DEPT MBDA, President Henry Childs II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLACK LIVES MATTER NETWORK INC, Corporation ? Corporation Trust Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELANIE CAMPBELLE, President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN C. STOCKS, Chair of Board Open Society & NEA President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLACK LIVES MATTER VT LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FACEBOOK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY LEE, Rev, Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL SENNOTT, Attorney, Trademark Petitioners (unauthorized)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVE LINICK, OIG, Office of the Inspector General State Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT C. SCOTT, Home Education (Dept-Committee Chair)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD GERGEL, Judge & Speaker at Aspen Ideas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLACK LIVES MATTER FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLACK LIVES MATTER VANCOUVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK GASPARD, President of the Open Society Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UUA CHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DATA FOR BLACK LIVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN PODESTA, Cap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEW YORK BLACK LIVES MATTER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA LOS ANGELES & OAKLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AME CHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MBDA GRANT RECEIVERS (BLMLA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLOR OF CHANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACT BLUE PAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ETHAN FORREST, Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WIKIPEDIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREI IANCU, Under Secy of Commerce USPTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLACK LIVES MATTER GREATER ATLANTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NCBCP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE SOROS, Owner of the Open Society Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMAZON JEFF BEZOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN ZAVEZ, Client, Trademark Petitioners (unauthorized)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDGE BRIAN A. JACKSON, Judge who threw out a BLM case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK RIDLEY THOMAS, Supv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APRIL GOGGINS, (unauthorized), Fraud Pirate, BlackLivesMatterDMV.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TWITTER, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STENY H. HOYER, House Majority Leader- Deomocratic Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DCRA DEPT OF CONSUMER & REG AFFAIRS, EIN Registrat for DC Govt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVETTA LYNN RANGE
Represented By: Davetta Lynn Range
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?