Michael Livingston v. SC Dept. of Social Services
Defendant: SUSAN LUBEROFF, M.D.
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL LIVINGSTON and HEATHER LIVINGSTON
Defendant / Appellee: SOUTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES, MISTY PUCKETT, Richland County Deputy Sheriff, ANGELA SCOTT, DON ROBINSON, Richland County Lieutenant, RICHLAND COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT and KEVIN PRESTON
Case Number: 20-1552
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 18 ]. Number of days granted: 18.. Opening brief and appendix due 07/24/2020. Response brief due 08/24/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000765804] [20-1552] CB [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:20 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Heather Livingston and Michael Livingston to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until July 24, 2020.. Date and method of service: 06/29/2020 ecf. [1000765703] [20-1552] Eric Bland [Entered: 06/29/2020 01:21 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 17 OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Kevin Preston, Misty Puckett, Richland County Sheriff's Department and Don Robinson. [20-1552] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 06/08/2020 08:36 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Don Robinson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000746733] [20-1552] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 05/27/2020 11:59 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Richland County Sheriff's Department. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000746732] [20-1552] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 05/27/2020 11:58 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Misty Puckett. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000746731] [20-1552] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 05/27/2020 11:57 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kevin Preston. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000746730] [20-1552] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 05/27/2020 11:56 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew F. Lindemann for Kevin Preston, Misty Puckett, Richland County Sheriff's Department and Don Robinson. [1000746729] [20-1552] Andrew Lindemann [Entered: 05/27/2020 11:55 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert D. Garfield for Kevin Preston, Richland County Sheriff's Department, Don Robinson and Misty Puckett. [1000746594] [20-1552] Robert Garfield [Entered: 05/27/2020 03:44 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER filed. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 07/06/2020. Response Brief due 08/05/2020. [20-1552] CB [Entered: 05/27/2020 03:04 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott M. Mongillo for Heather Livingston and Michael Livingston. [1000746518] [20-1552] Scott Mongillo [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:38 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ronald L. Richter, Jr. for Heather Livingston and Michael Livingston. [1000746515] [20-1552] Ronald Richter [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:36 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eric S. Bland for Heather Livingston and Michael Livingston. [1000746511] [20-1552] Eric Bland [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:33 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Heather Livingston and Michael Livingston. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000746503] [20-1552] Eric Bland [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:30 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Heather Livingston and Michael Livingston. [20-1552] Eric Bland [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:28 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Angela Scott and South Carolina Department of Social Services. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000738452] [20-1552] Evan Gessner [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:45 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Evan M. Gessner for Angela Scott and South Carolina Department of Social Services. [1000738449] [20-1552] Evan Gessner [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:44 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-01985-JMC. [20-1552] CB [Entered: 05/13/2020 11:10 AM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-01985-JMC. Case manager: CBennett. [20-1552] CB [Entered: 05/13/2020 11:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Livingston v. SC Dept. of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL LIVINGSTON
Represented By: Eric Steven Bland
Represented By: Ronald L. Richter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Scott Michael Mongillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HEATHER LIVINGSTON
Represented By: Eric Steven Bland
Represented By: Ronald L. Richter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Scott Michael Mongillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOUTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES
Represented By: Evan Markus Gessner
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MISTY PUCKETT, Richland County Deputy Sheriff
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELA SCOTT
Represented By: Evan Markus Gessner
Represented By: Patrick John Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DON ROBINSON, Richland County Lieutenant
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHLAND COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN PRESTON
Represented By: Robert David Garfield
Represented By: Andrew Lindemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN LUBEROFF, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?