Sharon Whitehead v. Aurora Pump Company
Defendant: UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION, STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS USA LLC, f/k/a Peerless Pumps Co., MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, INC., successor-in-interest to NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS, JOHN CRANE INCORPORATED, CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC, PABST BREWING COMPANY, LLC, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, WARREN PUMPS, LLC, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, f/k/a Daniel Construction Company, Inc., TACO, INC., YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, Individually and as successor-in-interst to Buffalo Pumps, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., Sued as successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, BF Sturtevant, BW/IP, INC., Individually and as successor-in-interest to Byron Jackson Pumps, FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, BFK, INC., Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co., INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, CRANE CO, FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor to Edward Valves Co. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company, FMC CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER INC., E. I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, ASCO VALVE, INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, f/k/a Fluor Corporation, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co., GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co., FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co., ITT, LLC, f/k/a ITT Corporation, f/k/a ITT Industries Inc., f/k/a ITT FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., f/k/a Hoffman Specialty MFG. Corp., f/k/a Bell and Gossett Company, f/k/a ITT Marlow, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co., BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co. and RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC., a/k/a AWT Air Company, Inc., Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co.
Defendant / Appellee: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC, Wholly owned subsidiary of Emerson Electric Compnay, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED, COVIL CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, individually and as successor-in-interest to ANCHOR/DARLING VALVE COMPANY, BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY, CARRIER CORPORATION, RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC., a/k/a AWT Air Company, Inc., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, f/k/a Fluor Corporation, VIKING PUMP, INCORPORATED, THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, ITT, LLC, f/k/a ITT Corporation, f/k/a ITT Industries Inc., f/k/a ITT FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., f/k/a Hoffman Specialty MFG. Corp., f/k/a Bell and Gossett Company, f/k/a ITT Marlow and ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHARON K. WHITEHEAD, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of JAMES T. WHITEHEAD, Deceased
Case Number: 20-1676
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 24 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 09/18/2020. Response brief due 10/19/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000783049] [20-1676] DL [Entered: 07/28/2020 12:36 PM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION by Sharon K. Whitehead to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until September 18, 2020.. Date and method of service: 07/28/2020 ecf. [1000783015] [20-1676] Renee Melancon [Entered: 07/28/2020 12:10 PM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 23 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill for Aurora Pump Company. [1000775675] [20-1676] Mary O'Neill [Entered: 07/15/2020 04:00 PM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 22 Docket correction requested from Aurora Pump Company. Re: [ # 21 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. [20-1676] KH [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:19 AM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by M. Elizabeth O'Neill for Aurora Pump Company. [1000774978] [20-1676] Mary O'Neill [Entered: 07/14/2020 06:38 PM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices is required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/19/2020. Response Brief due 09/18/2020. [20-1676] KH [Entered: 07/10/2020 01:59 PM]
July 2, 2020 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Curtis J. Shipley for Covil Corporation. [1000768679] [20-1676] Curtis Shipley [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:41 PM]
July 2, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covil Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000768674] [20-1676] Leslie Packer [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:39 PM]
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Leslie C. Packer for Covil Corporation. [1000768672] [20-1676] Leslie Packer [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:37 PM]
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. [20-1676] KH [Entered: 07/02/2020 08:52 AM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William Starr for Flowserve Corporation. [1000767714] [20-1676] William Starr [Entered: 07/01/2020 01:37 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anchor Darling Valve Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000767712] [20-1676]--[Edited 07/10/2020 by KH-party filer modified] Tracy Tomlin [Entered: 07/01/2020 01:33 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tracy Tomlin for Flowserve Corporation. [1000767710] [20-1676] Tracy Tomlin [Entered: 07/01/2020 01:30 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Viking Pump, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000767627] [20-1676] Amy Drayton [Entered: 07/01/2020 12:23 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Amy C. Drayton for Viking Pump, Incorporated. [1000767622] [20-1676] Amy Drayton [Entered: 07/01/2020 12:21 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Pump Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000767620] [20-1676] Kimberly Sullivan [Entered: 07/01/2020 12:20 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kimberly Sullivan for Aurora Pump Company. [1000767615] [20-1676] Kimberly Sullivan [Entered: 07/01/2020 12:15 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa W. Shirley for Sharon K. Whitehead. [1000767458] [20-1676] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 07/01/2020 10:59 AM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sharon K. Whitehead. [20-1676] Renee Melancon [Entered: 07/01/2020 10:57 AM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sharon K. Whitehead. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000767450] [20-1676] Renee Melancon [Entered: 07/01/2020 10:55 AM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Renee M. Melancon for Sharon K. Whitehead. [1000767443] [20-1676] Renee Melancon [Entered: 07/01/2020 10:53 AM]
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The William Powell Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000767061] [20-1676] David Oakley [Entered: 06/30/2020 05:00 PM]
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David B. Oakley for The William Powell Company. [1000767057] [20-1676] David Oakley [Entered: 06/30/2020 04:56 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00091-LCB-JLW. Mailed to: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite, Jessica Michelle Dean, Amy C. Drayton, William Michael Starr, Sabrina G. Stone, Tracy Edward Tomlin. [20-1676] KH [Entered: 06/18/2020 03:34 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00091-LCB-JLW. Case manager: KHancock. [20-1676] KH [Entered: 06/18/2020 03:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sharon Whitehead v. Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC, Wholly owned subsidiary of Emerson Electric Compnay
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COVIL CORPORATION
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Curtis James Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, individually and as successor-in-interest to ANCHOR/DARLING VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC., a/k/a AWT Air Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Brooks Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, f/k/a Fluor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIKING PUMP, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Amy C. Drayton
Represented By: Amy Church Drayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY
Represented By: David Brandt Oakley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ITT, LLC, f/k/a ITT Corporation, f/k/a ITT Industries Inc., f/k/a ITT FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., f/k/a Hoffman Specialty MFG. Corp., f/k/a Bell and Gossett Company, f/k/a ITT Marlow
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED CONVEYOR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS USA LLC, f/k/a Peerless Pumps Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNALLY INDUSTRIES, INC., successor-in-interest to NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PABST BREWING COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, f/k/a Daniel Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TACO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, Individually and as successor-in-interst to Buffalo Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., Sued as successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, BF Sturtevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC., Individually and as successor-in-interest to Byron Jackson Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFK, INC., Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor to Edward Valves Co. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCO VALVE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, f/k/a Fluor Corporation, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT, LLC, f/k/a ITT Corporation, f/k/a ITT Industries Inc., f/k/a ITT FLUID PRODUCTS CORP., f/k/a Hoffman Specialty MFG. Corp., f/k/a Bell and Gossett Company, f/k/a ITT Marlow, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY, Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC., a/k/a AWT Air Company, Inc., Successor-in-interest to Buell Engineering Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHARON K. WHITEHEAD, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of JAMES T. WHITEHEAD, Deceased
Represented By: William Marc Graham
Represented By: Sabrina G. Stone
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Dean
Represented By: Charles W. Branham III
Represented By: Lisa White Shirley
Represented By: Renee Marie Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?